Juan P. Estrada
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

4:2018-bk-00136 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
14
07/02/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate
15
07/06/2018
Reaffirmation Agreement (Pro Se - No Atty Signature) (BKRA02)
16
07/06/2018
Reaffirmation Agreement (Pro Se - No Atty Signature) (BKRA02)
17
07/06/2018
Reaffirmation Agreement (Pro Se - No Atty Signature) (BKRA02)
18
07/06/2018
Reaffirmation Agreement (Pro Se - No Atty Signature) (BKRA02)
19
07/10/2018
Notice of Reaffirmation Hearing (Chambers Template-BNC Notice)
20
07/10/2018
Notice of Reaffirmation Hearing (Chambers Template-BNC Notice)
21
07/12/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
22
07/12/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
23
07/31/2018
Notice of Deferral of Discharge (Reaffs Not Filed) (BNC Notice)
24
08/01/2018
Proceeding Memo
25
08/02/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
26
08/03/2018
Regarding Reaffirmation Agreement (CM37-COAfter) (SA)
27
08/03/2018
Regarding Reaffirmation Agreement (CM37-COAfter) (SA)
28
08/03/2018
Regarding Reaffirmation Agreement (CM37-COAfter) (SA)
29
08/03/2018
Regarding Reaffirmation Agreement (CM37-COAfter) (SA)
08/03/2018
Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines) (Text entry; no document attached.)
30
08/03/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
31
08/05/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
32
08/05/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
33
08/05/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
34
08/05/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
35
08/21/2018
Discharging Debtor(s) (SA) (BNC Notice)
36
08/23/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order of Discharge
08/24/2018
Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case (Text entry; no document attached.)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.