Juanita Nechol Farris
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

2:2018-bk-01974 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
42
12/11/2018
Order Rescheduling Hearing
43
12/14/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
44
12/14/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
46
01/20/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
54
02/08/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
56
02/18/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
58
02/28/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
60
03/16/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.