Judd v. Keypoint Government Solutions Incorporated
Court Docket Sheet

3:2017-cv-08050 (azd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 339 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
03/10/2017
COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-14004634 filed by Orson Judd. (submitted by Michael McKay)
1
Exhibit A
2
Exhibit B
3
Civil Cover Sheet)(REW
3 Attachments
2
03/10/2017
SUMMONS Submitted by Orson Judd. (submitted by Michael McKay)
3
03/10/2017
Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-14004634. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Steven P Logan. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 17-8050-PCT-SPL. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached.
4
03/13/2017
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: Pursuant to the Electronic Case Filing Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual Section II(B), attorneys are required to submit the automated Civil Cover Sheet when filing a new case. The form submitted was the old form. In the future, please use the new form. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
5
03/13/2017
Summons Issued as to Keypoint Government Solutions Incorporated. (REW). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
6
03/13/2017
PRELIMINARY ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Steven P. Logan on 3/13/17.
03/31/2017
Remark: Pro hac vice application approved for Joshua G Konecky on behalf of plaintiff Orson Judd 03/31/2017. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/07/2017
Remark: Pro hac vice motion granted for Leslie H Joyner on behalf of plaintiff Orson Judd. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (Text entry; no document attached.)
7
04/11/2017
SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Orson Judd: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on April 6, 2017 to Margaret Parnell Hogan.
8
04/14/2017
NOTICE re: Filing Consent to Join Collective Action by Orson Judd.
1
Exhibit 1
1 Attachment
9
04/17/2017
MOTION to Change Venue/Transfer Case to USDC Colorado or in the Alternative, Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and for a Stay of Litigation by Keypoint Government Solutions Incorporated.
1
Exhibit A
1 Attachment
10
04/17/2017
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Keypoint Government Solutions Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent KGS Holding Corp, Corporate Parent KGS Holding LLC for Keypoint Government Solutions Incorporated.
04/17/2017
Remark: Pro hac vice motion granted for Margaret Parnell Hogan on behalf of defendant KeyPoint Governmnet Solutions Incorporated. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (Text entry; no document attached.)
11
04/18/2017
MOTION to Certify Class Plaintiff's Motion for Conditional Certificate and to Facilitate Notice of Collective Action Pursuant to Section 216(b) of the Fair Labor Standards Act by Orson Judd.
1
Affidavit Declaration of Joshua G. Konecky in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Conditional Certificate and to Facilitate Notice of Collective Action Pursuant to Section 216(b) of the Fair Labor Standards Act
2
Exhibit A through B to Declaration of Joshua G. Konecky
3
Exhibit C through G to Declaration of Joshua G. Konecky
4
Exhibit H through I to Declaration of Joshua G. Konecky
5
Exhibit J Part 1 to Declaration of Joshua G. Konecky
6
Exhibit J Part 2 to Declaration of Joshua G. Konecky
7
Exhibit J Part 3 to Declaration of Joshua G. Konecky
8
Exhibit J Part 4 to Declaration of Joshua G. Konecky
9
Exhibit J Part 5 to Declaration of Joshua G. Konecky
10
Exhibit K through N to Declaration of Joshua G. Konecky
11
Exhibit O through Q to Declaration of Joshua G. Konecky
12
Exhibit R to Declaration of Joshua G. Konecky
13
Exhibit S to Declaration of Joshua G. Konecky
14
Exhibit T to Declaration of Joshua G. Konecky
15
Exhibit U to Declaration of Joshua G. Konecky
16
Exhibit V to Declaration of Joshua G. Konecky
17
Exhibit W Part 1 to Declaration of Joshua G. Konecky
18
Exhibit W Part 2 to Declaration of Joshua G. Konecky
19
Exhibit X to Declaration of Joshua G. Konecky
20
Exhibit Y to Declaration of Joshua G. Konecky
21
Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Conditional Certification and to Facilitate Notice of Collective Action
21 Attachments
12
04/25/2017
MOTION to Stay Defendant's Expedited Motion to Stay Pending Resolution of Defendant's Motion to Transfer Or in the Alternative Motion to Extending Briefing Schedule (First Request) by Keypoint Government Solutions Incorporated.
1
Exhibit Exhibit 1
2
Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
2 Attachments
13
04/26/2017
RESPONSE to Motion re: 12 MOTION to Stay Defendant's Expedited Motion to Stay Pending Resolution of Defendant's Motion to Transfer Or in the Alternative Motion to Extending Briefing Schedule (First Request) Plaintiff Orson Judd's Notice of Non Opposition filed by Orson Judd.
14
04/28/2017
ORDER That Defendant KeyPoint Government Solutions, Inc.'s Expedited Motion toStay 12 is granted, including briefing on the Motion for Conditional Certification 11. Plaintiff shall file a response to the Motion to Transfer 9 no later than May 1, 2017. Defendant may file a reply no later than May 8, 2017. Signed by Judge Steven P. Logan on 4/27/17.
15
05/01/2017
NOTICE re: Filing Consent to Join Collective Action by Orson Judd.
1
Exhibit 1
1 Attachment
16
05/01/2017
RESPONSE in Opposition re: 9 MOTION to Change Venue/Transfer Case to USDC Colorado or in the Alternative, Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and for a Stay of Litigation filed by Orson Judd.
1
Affidavit DECLARATION OF JOSHUA G. KONECKY IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AND FOR A STAY OF LITIGATION
2
Exhibit A to Declaration of Joshua G. Konecky
3
Exhibit B to Declaration of Joshua G. Konecky
4
Exhibit C to Declaration of Joshua G. Konecky
5
Exhibit D to Declaration of Joshua G. Konecky
6
Exhibit E to Declaration of Joshua G. Konecky
7
Exhibit F to Declaration of Joshua G. Konecky
8
Exhibit G to Declaration of Joshua G. Konecky
9
Exhibit H to Declaration of Joshua G. Konecky
10
Exhibit I to Declaration of Joshua G. Konecky
11
Exhibit J to Declaration of Joshua G. Konecky
12
Exhibit K to Declaration of Joshua G. Konecky
13
Exhibit L to Declaration of Joshua G. Konecky
14
Exhibit M to Declaration of Joshua G. Konecky
15
Exhibit N to Declaration of Joshua G. Konecky
15 Attachments
17
05/08/2017
REPLY to Response to Motion re: 9 MOTION to Change Venue/Transfer Case to USDC Colorado or in the Alternative, Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and for a Stay of Litigation filed by Keypoint Government Solutions Incorporated.
18
05/08/2017
DECLARATION of Margaret Parnell Hogan re: 17 Reply to Response to Motion to Transfer Venue, or in the Alternative, Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Defendant Keypoint Government Solutions Incorporated.
1
Exhibit A- Jennifer Boaz Depo Excerpts
2
Exhibit B-Orson Judd Depo Excerpts
2 Attachments
19
05/26/2017
NOTICE re: Filing Consent to Join Collective Action by Orson Judd.
1
Exhibit 1
1 Attachment
20
06/19/2017
NOTICE re: by Plaintiff of Filing of Consent to Join Collective Action by Orson Judd.
1
Exhibit 1 to Notice by Plaintiffs of Filing of Consent to Join Collective Action
1 Attachment
21
09/27/2017
NOTICE re: Filing Consent to Join Collective Action by Orson Judd.
1
Exhibit 1 - Consent to Join of Kristin Hettler
1 Attachment
22
11/06/2017
NOTICE re: Notice of Pending Motion by Keypoint Government Solutions Incorporated.
23
11/06/2017
ORDER denying [22] Motion for Status. Signed by Judge Steven P. Logan on 11/6/17.
24
02/09/2018
ORDER that Defendant's [9] Motion is granted in part as to transfer of venue, and denied in part without prejudice as to dismissal for failure to state a claim. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Clerk of Court transfer this matter to the United States District Court for the District of Colorado and terminate the case in the District of Arizona. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 2/8/2018.
02/09/2018
ACKNOWLEDGMENT of Receipt of Electronic Case Transfer from the District of Colorado. New Case Number: 1:18-cv-327. (Text entry; no document attached.)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.