Julius Boyd
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

2:2017-bk-04258 (alnb)

Order on Objection to Claim(s) 5 - Objection is Sustained and the balance of Claim #5 is Disallowed. Signed on 1/23/2018 (RE: related document(s)[22] Objection to Claim filed by Debtor Julius Boyd).

17-04258-TOM13 1 UNITED STATES BANKRUPTCY COURT NORTHERN DISTRICT OF ALABAMA - SOUTHERN DIVISION In the Matter of: Julius Boyd } Case No: 17-04258-TOM13 SSN: XXX-XX-2016 } DEBTOR(S). } } } ORDER SUSTAINING This matter came before the Court on Thursday, January 18, 2018 09:30 AM, for a hearing on the following: RE: Doc #22; Debtor's Objection to Claim #5 of World Omni Financial Corp. in the amount $15,567.65 Proper notice of the hearing was given and appearances were made by the following: Robert D. Reese, attorney for Julius Boyd (Debtor) Mary Frances Fallaw, Staff Attorney for the Chapter 13 Trustee It is therefore ORDERED, ADJUDGED and DECREED that: Based on arguments of counsel and the pleadings, the Objection is Sustained and the balance of claim number 5 is Disallowed. The Claimant has 45 days from the date of possession to file a deficiency balance claim if one is asserted. Further, in the event a deficiency balance claim is not filed timely and a discharge order is entered in this case, then the claimant's right to payment on any deficiency balance is hereby waived. Dated: 01/23/2018 /s/ TAMARA O. MITCHELL TAMARA O. MITCHELL United States Bankruptcy Judge Case 17-04258-TOM13 Doc 31 Filed 01/23/18 Entered 01/23/18 10:28:26 Desc Main Document Page 1 of 1

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 273 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
10/04/2017
Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual. Fee Amount $310 Filed by Julius Boyd
2
10/04/2017
Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Debtor Julius Boyd.
4
10/04/2017
Certificate of Credit Counseling for Debtor Filed Filed by Debtor Julius Boyd.
5
10/04/2017
Employee Income Records Filed by Debtor Julius Boyd.
6
10/04/2017
Tax Documents for the Year for 2016 Filed by Debtor Julius Boyd.
7
10/04/2017
Appraisal Filed by Debtor Julius Boyd.
10/04/2017
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)(17-04258-13) [misc,volp13] (310.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 21240656. Fee Amount 310.00 (re:Doc# 1) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
8
10/04/2017
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 11/15/2017 at 09:30 AM at Creditor Meeting Room Birmingham. Confirmation hearing to be held on 12/14/2017 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham. Proof of Claim due by 02/13/2018. Government Proof of Claim due by 04/02/2018 Objection to Dischargeability of Certain Debts due by 01/16/2018.
9
10/05/2017
Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management. (Admin)
10
10/06/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 8 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 13)). Notice Date 10/06/2017.
11
10/07/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan filed by Debtor Julius Boyd). Notice Date 10/07/2017.
12
10/07/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 9 Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management). Notice Date 10/07/2017.
13
10/09/2017
Statement of Financial Affairs for Individual Filed by Debtor Julius Boyd.
14
10/11/2017
Trustee's Direction for Deduction. (Ch13troffice, sf)
15
11/16/2017
Meeting of Creditors Held 11/15/2017. (Ch13troffice, jc)
16
11/28/2017
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by William C Poole Filed by Creditor Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. dba Wells Fargo Dealer Services.
17
11/28/2017
Objection to Confirmation of Plan Filed by Creditor Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. dba Wells Fargo Dealer Services (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Debtor Julius Boyd.).
18
11/28/2017
Hearing Scheduled (RE: related document(s) 17 Objection to Confirmation of the Plan filed by Creditor Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. dba Wells Fargo Dealer Services). Hearing scheduled 12/14/2017 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham.
19
12/07/2017
Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Chapter 13 Plan, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss. (Ch13troffice, ul)
20
12/08/2017
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 19 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss). Hearing scheduled 12/14/2017 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham.
21
12/10/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 20 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 12/10/2017.
22
12/13/2017
Debtor's Objection to Claim # 5 of World Omni Financial Corp. in the amount of $15,567.65 Filed by Debtor Julius Boyd.
23
12/13/2017
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 22 Objection to Claim filed by Debtor Julius Boyd). Hearing scheduled 1/18/2018 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham.
24
12/13/2017
Consent Order Filed By: Wells Fargo Bank NA dba Wells Fargo Dealer Services Signed on 12/13/2017 (RE: related document(s) 17 Objection to Confirmation of the Plan filed by Creditor Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. dba Wells Fargo Dealer Services).
25
12/15/2017
Bench Sheet from Confirmation Hearing
26
12/15/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 24 Consent Order). Notice Date 12/15/2017.
27
12/15/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 23 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 12/15/2017.
28
01/03/2018
Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan. Trustees Objection to Confirmation is overruled and Motion to Dismiss is denied. Signed on 1/3/2018 (RE: related document(s) 19 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss).
29
01/05/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 28 Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan). Notice Date 01/05/2018.
30
01/19/2018
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 1/18/2018 10:06:22 AM ]. File Size [ 116 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:00:19 ]. (RE: Doc #22; Debtor's Objection to Claim #5 of World Omni Financial Corp. in the amount $15,567.65). (adiuser).
31
01/23/2018
Order on Objection to Claim(s) 5 - Objection is Sustained and the balance of Claim #5 is Disallowed. Signed on 1/23/2018 (RE: related document(s)[22] Objection to Claim filed by Debtor Julius Boyd).
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.