Junior Nomani and Levestine M.M. Nomani
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00440 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
12/31/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)
2
12/31/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
12/31/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/31/2018
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/31/2018
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/31/2018
QC - Deficiency Notice Re: Fees (Text entry; no document attached.)
3
01/01/2019
Request for Notice by Creditor
01/02/2019
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
4
01/02/2019
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7) (BNC Notice)
5
01/02/2019
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice)
6
01/02/2019
Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Individual / Joint) (BNC Notice)
7
01/02/2019
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)
01/02/2019
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
8
01/04/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
9
01/04/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
10
01/04/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
11
01/08/2019
Generic Notice (NOT to be used if setting a deadline)
01/08/2019
341 Meeting of Creditors Continued (pro-memo) (Text entry; no document attached.)
12
01/14/2019
Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum and 206Sum)
13
01/14/2019
Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 & 207)
14
01/14/2019
Ch 7 Stmt of Monthly Income Form 122A-1 / Stmt of Exemption Form 122A-1Supp / Means Test Form 122A-2
15
01/14/2019
Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)
16
01/14/2019
Statement of Intention for Individuals (Form 108)
17
01/14/2019
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor
18
01/17/2019
Request for Special Notice
19
01/21/2019
Ch 7 Stmt of Monthly Income Form 122A-1 / Stmt of Exemption Form 122A-1Supp / Means Test Form 122A-2
20
01/22/2019
Amended Creditor Matrix (Fee)
01/22/2019
Update Matrix (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/22/2019
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
21
01/23/2019
Relief from Stay (Fee) (CM03)
22
01/23/2019
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
23
01/23/2019
Certificate of Service
01/23/2019
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/05/2019
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - Ch 7 Only) (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/05/2019
Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds (BKTR01) (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/13/2019
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
24
02/27/2019
Certificate of No Objection
25
02/27/2019
Certificate of Service
26
02/28/2019
Relief from Stay
27
03/02/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
28
03/04/2019
Document
29
03/10/2019
Financial Management Course Certificate
30
03/10/2019
Financial Management Course Certificate
31
03/11/2019
Document
03/15/2019
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)
32
04/02/2019
Notice of Deferral of Discharge (Reaffs Not Filed) (BNC Notice)
33
04/04/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.