K.M. et al v. Liese et al
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2016-cv-00100 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
38
07/20/2018
Extension of Time to File Document
39
07/20/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
40
07/25/2018
Witness List
41
07/25/2018
Witness List
42
10/30/2018
Order
43
11/14/2018
Status Report
44
11/14/2018
Order
45
01/30/2019
Extension of Time to File Document
46
01/31/2019
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
47
02/25/2019
In Limine
48
02/25/2019
Affidavit
03/01/2019
Notice Re: Chamber Copy (Text entry; no document attached.)
50
03/11/2019
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
51
03/11/2019
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
52
03/19/2019
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
53
03/20/2019
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
54
03/28/2019
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
55
03/28/2019
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
56
04/07/2019
Response in Opposition to Motion
57
04/15/2019
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
04/15/2019
Docket Annotation re no Proposed Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
58
04/15/2019
Notice (Other)
59
04/16/2019
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
60
04/26/2019
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
61
04/29/2019
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
62
05/03/2019
Reply to Response to Motion
63
05/06/2019
Affidavit
64
05/06/2019
Leave to File Document
65
05/07/2019
Amend/Correct
66
05/07/2019
Reply to Response to Motion
67
05/08/2019
Order on Motion to Amend/Correct
68
05/14/2019
Notice (Other)
69
05/16/2019
Order
70
05/17/2019
Errata
71
05/17/2019
Reply to Response to Motion
05/20/2019
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/20/2019
~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.