KENACTIV INNOVATIONS, INC.

2:2013-bk-19096 (azb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
View docket sheet
Last full docket sheet refresh: 203 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
10/31/2013
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition. The mailing list of creditors if not uploaded when the petition was filed, must be uploaded no later than seven days from the date of the filing of the petition. Failure to timely upload the list of creditors, may result in dismissal of the case without further notice. Electronic Filing Declaration due 11/21/2013, Schedules A-J due 11/14/2013. Statement of Financial Affairs due 11/14/2013, Attorney Disclosure Statement due 11/14/2013, Chapter 7 Individual Debtor Statement of Current Monthly Income and Means Test Calculation Due by 11/14/2013, Payment Advices Declaration Required by 11 USC Section 521(a)(1)(B)(iv) due by 11/14/2013, filed by SHELTON L. FREEMAN of FREEMAN LAW PLLC on behalf of KENACTIV INNOVATIONS, INC. Modified on 11/1/2013
10/31/2013
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)(2:13-bk-19096) [other,volp7] (306.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 21894475. Fee amount 306.00. (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
2
10/31/2013
Meeting of Creditors scheduled for 12/02/2013 at 01:30 PM at US Trustee Meeting Room, 230 N. First Avenue, Suite 102, Phoenix, AZ (341-PHX).
3
11/01/2013
Chapter 7 Corp/Part--Notice of Meeting of Creditors. 341(a) meeting to be held on 12/2/2013 at 01:30 PM at US Trustee Meeting Room, 230 N. First Avenue, Suite 102, Phoenix, AZ (341-PHX)
4
11/01/2013
Deficiency Notice to Debtor and Attorney for Debtor That All Required Documents Were Not Filed.
5
11/01/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice - Notice of Meeting of Creditors (related document(s) 3 BNC Form Request--341 Notice--Chapter 7 Corp/Part)
6
11/01/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (related document(s) 4 Deficiency Notice to Debtor (Missing Documents Form))
7
11/14/2013
Notice of Appearance filed by JENNIFER BARKER LYDAY of WOMBLE CARLYLE SANDRIDGED RICE, LLP on behalf of East Dublin Investment LLC.
8
11/14/2013
Motion to Extend Time to File Schedules and Statements filed by SHELTON L. FREEMAN of FREEMAN LAW PLLC on behalf of KENACTIV INNOVATIONS, INC.
9
11/14/2013
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order filed by SHELTON L. FREEMAN of FREEMAN LAW PLLC on behalf of KENACTIV INNOVATIONS, INC. (related document(s) 8 Motion to Extend Time to File Schedules and Statements).
1
Order Approving
1 Attachment
10
11/14/2013
ORDER Granting Motion to Extend Time to File Schedules and Statements (Related Doc # 8) signed on 11/14/2013 Schedules/Statements due by 11/25/2013.
11
11/14/2013
Trustee Application to Employ Attorney/Declaration of Attorney filed by ADAM B. NACH of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA.
12
11/14/2013
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order Authorizing Case Trustee to Employ Attorney filed by ADAM B. NACH of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA (related document(s) 11 Application to Employ).
13
11/14/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document (related document(s) 10 Order on Motion to Extend Time to File Schedules and Statements)
14
11/15/2013
ORDER Granting Application to Employ (Related Doc # 11) signed on 11/15/2013.
15
11/18/2013
Notice of Appearance filed by PHILIP W PAINE of JORDAN PRICE WALL GRAY JONES & CARLTON PLLC on behalf of WHITE FLASH CONTROLS LLC. Modified on 11/19/2013
16
11/19/2013
Notice of Mandatory Electronic Filing (related document(s) 15 Notice of Appearance)
17
11/19/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (related document(s) 16 Notice of Mandatory Electronic Filing)
18
11/25/2013
Second Motion to Extend DEADLINE TO FILE SCHEDULES AND STATEMENT OF FINANCIAL AFFAIRS filed by SHELTON L. FREEMAN of FREEMAN LAW PLLC on behalf of KENACTIV INNOVATIONS, INC.
19
11/25/2013
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order filed by SHELTON L. FREEMAN of FREEMAN LAW PLLC on behalf of KENACTIV INNOVATIONS, INC.
1
Order Approving
1 Attachment
20
11/26/2013
Chapter 7 Trustee Notice of Continued 11 USC §341 Hearing [Location: Lane & Nach, PC, 2001 E Campbell Ave, #103, Phoenix, AZ 85016] filed by ADAM 1 NACH of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA (related document(s) 2 Meeting of Creditors 7 (Business No Asset)) Hearing set for 12/12/2013 at 10:00 AM (check with court for location).
21
11/26/2013
Notice of Appearance filed by WESLEY DENTON RAY of POLSINELLI PC on behalf of Gavin Garfield, Jed Scully, Glendalee Scully.
22
11/26/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document (related document(s) 20 Chapter 7 Trustee Notice)
23
12/05/2013
Trustee Motion to Reject the Unexpired Leases of Non-Residential Real Property Nunc Pro Tunc as of October 31, 2013 filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA.
24
12/05/2013
Chapter 7 Trustee Notice of Motion to Reject the Unexpired Leases of Non-Residential Real Property Nunc Pro Tunc as of October 31, 2013 and of Deadline to Object filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA (related document(s) 23 Motion to Reject).
25
12/05/2013
Certificate of Service filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA. (related document(s) 23 Motion to Reject, 24 Chapter 7 Trustee Notice)
26
12/06/2013
Application for Limited Admission filed by MARK ALAN GILBERT of COLEMAN TALLEY LLP on behalf of John Klobas, Charlie Battle, Bob Castle, Judy Castle, Bill Castle, Allen Taylor, Fredi Kronenberg, Honey Kronenberg, Eugene Goldman.
27
12/05/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document (related document(s) 24 Chapter 7 Trustee Notice)
28
12/06/2013
ORDER Granting Second Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules and Statement of Financial Affairs (Related Doc # 18) signed on 12/6/2013.
29
12/06/2013
ORDER Granting Application for Limited Admission (Related Doc # 26) signed on 12/6/2013.
30
12/09/2013
Schedules and Statements filed by SHELTON L. FREEMAN of FREEMAN LAW PLLC on behalf of KENACTIV INNOVATIONS, INC. Electronic Filing Declaration due by 12/16/2013
31
12/11/2013
Notice of Appearance filed by SCOTT W. HYDER of LAW OFFICE OF SCOTT W HYDER PLC on behalf of Mesa Cold Storage.
32
12/11/2013
Trustee Application to Employ Auctioneer/Appraiser and Approve Expenses Related Thereto filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA.
33
12/11/2013
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order Authorizing Trustee to Employ Auctioneer/Appraiser and Incur Expenses Related Thereto filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA (related document(s) 32 Application to Employ).
34
12/11/2013
ORDER Granting Application to Employ (Related Doc # 32) signed on 12/11/2013.
35
12/13/2013
The Trustee reports that he or she now holds funds of this bankruptcy estate or expects to receive funds which should result in a dividend to creditors who were previously instructed not to file claims. The Trustee hereby requests that the Court fix the last date for filing proofs of claim and that notice be given to creditors. (MANERA, S.)
36
12/13/2013
Deficiency Notice to Attorney RE: Non-Compliance With Local Rule 1007-1(c) for No Declaration of Electronic Filing.
37
12/13/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (related document(s) 36 Deficiency/Warning Notice to Attorney for No Declaration of Electronic Filing)
38
12/16/2013
Notice of Claims Bar Date. Proof of Claims due by 3/18/2014
39
12/16/2013
Debtor Declaration Re: Electronic Filing
40
12/16/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice - Notice of Claims Bar Date (related document(s) 38 BNC Form Request--Notice of Claims Bar Date)
41
12/19/2013
Trustee Application to Employ Auctioneer/Appraiser as to Snow Hill, North Carolina Property filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of MANERA, S. WILLIAM Modified filer on 12/30/2013
42
12/19/2013
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order Authorizing Trustee to Employ Auctioneer/Appraiser as to Snow Hill, North Carolina Property filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA (related document(s) 41 Application to Employ).
43
12/23/2013
Trustee Application to Employ Defusco & Udelman, P.L.C. as Special Counsel; Declaration of Randall S. Udelman filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA.
44
12/23/2013
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order Authorizing Trustee to Employ Special Counsel on a Contingency Fee Basis filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA (related document(s) 43 Application to Employ).
45
12/23/2013
ORDER Granting Application to Employ (Related Doc # 41) signed on 12/23/2013.
46
12/23/2013
ORDER Granting Application to Employ (Related Doc # 43) signed on 12/23/2013.
47
12/24/2013
Motion to Reject the Unexpired Lease of Non-Residential Real Property as of October 31, 2013 (Lease: Mosquito Creek Properties, LLLP; Property located in: Dodge County, Georgia) filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of MANERA, S. WILLIAM, Modified filer on 12/30/2013
48
12/24/2013
Chapter 7 Trustee Notice of Motion to Reject the Unexpired Lease of Non-Residential Real Porperty as of October 31, 2013 [Lease: Mosquito Creek, Properties, LLLP; Property located in: Dodge County, Georgia] filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA (related document(s) 47 Motion to Reject).
49
12/24/2013
Certificate of Service filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA. (related document(s) 47 Motion to Reject, 48 Chapter 7 Trustee Notice)
50
12/26/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document (related document(s) 48 Chapter 7 Trustee Notice)
51
01/14/2014
Certificate of Service and No Objections filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA. Related document(s) 23 Trustee Motion to Reject the Unexpired Leases of Non-Residential Real Property Nunc Pro Tunc as of October 31, 2013 filed by Trustee S. WILLIAM MANERA. Modified on 1/15/2014 to correct related entry.
52
01/14/2014
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order Authorizing Trustee to Reject the Unexpired Leases of Non-Residential Real Property Nunc Pro Tunc as of October 31, 2013 filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA (related document(s) 23 Motion to Reject).
53
01/15/2014
Trustee Application to Employ Accountant filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA.
54
01/15/2014
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order Authorizing Trustee to Employ Accountant filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA (related document(s) 53 Application to Employ).
55
01/15/2014
Trustee Motion to Approve Sale /Application to Approve Procedures to Auction Real Property and Personal Property in North Carolina Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 363(F) on an Expedited Basis [Request online auction to run February 28 through March 5, 2014 for real property and personal property including crops and equipment located at 3628 Highway 91, Snow Hill, Greene County, North Carolina subject to Trustee surcharge] [ filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA.
56
01/15/2014
Motion to Accelerate/Expedite Hearing on Trustee's Application to Approve Procedures to Auction Real Property and Personal Property in North Carolina Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 363(F) on an Expedited Basis [Request Hearing on or Before January 30 to enable onlie auction to run February 28 through March 5, 2014 for real property and personal property including crops and equipment located at 3628 Highway 91, Snow Hill, Greene County, North Carolina subject to Trustee surcharge] filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA (related document(s) 55 Motion to Approve Sale).
57
01/15/2014
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order Setting Accelerated Hearing on Trustee'sApplication to Approve Procedures to Auction Real Property and Personal Property in North Carolina Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 363(F) on an Expedited Basis [Re: real property and personal property including crops and equipment located at 3628 Highway 91, Snow Hill, Greene County, North Carolina subject to Trustee surcharge] filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA (related document(s) 56 Motion to Accelerate/Expedite).
58
01/15/2014
Objection to Motion/Application FOR ACCELERATED HEARING ON TRUSTEES APPLICATION TO APPROVE PROCEDURES TO AUCTION REAL PROPERTY AND PERSONAL PROPERTY IN NORTH CAROLINA PURSUANT TO 11 U.S.C. § 363(F) ON AN EXPEDITED BASIS (related to motions(s)55) filed by SCOTT W. HYDER of LAW OFFICE OF SCOTT W HYDER PLC on behalf of Mesa Cold Storage.
59
01/15/2014
Objection TO LODGED ORDER SETTING ACCELERATED HEARING ON TRUSTEES APPLICATION TO APPROVE PROCEDURES TO AUCTION REAL PROPERTY AND PERSONAL PROPERTY IN NORTH CAROLINA PURSUANT TO 11 U.S.C. § 363(F) ON AN EXPEDITED BASIS filed by SCOTT W. HYDER of LAW OFFICE OF SCOTT W HYDER PLC on behalf of Mesa Cold Storage (related document(s) 56 Motion to Accelerate/Expedite, 57 Notice of Lodging Proposed Order, 58 Objection).
60
01/15/2014
ORDER Granting Application to Employ (Related Doc # 53) signed on 1/15/2014.
61
01/15/2014
ORDER Authorizing Trustee to Reject the Unexpired Leases of Non-Residential Real Property Nunc Pro Tunc as of October 31, 2013 (Related Doc # 23) signed on 1/15/2014.
01/16/2014
Fee Due Motion for Sale of Property Free and Clear of Liens (176.00 fee) $ 176 (related document(s) 55 Motion to Approve Sale) (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/16/2014
Receipt of Motion for Sale of Property Free and Clear of Liens (176.00 fee)(2:13-bk-19096-GBN) [motion,mtnsale] (176.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 22384642. Fee amount 176.00. (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
62
01/16/2014
ORDER Setting Accelerated Hearing on Trustee's Application to Approve Procedures to Auction Real Property and Personal Property in North Carolina Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 363(F) on an Expedited Basis (Related Doc # 56) signed on 1/16/2014 Hearing on Emergency/Expedited Motion set for 1/28/2014 at 10:30 AM at 230 N. First Ave., 7th Floor, Courtroom 702, Phoenix, AZ (GBN).
63
01/17/2014
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order (Amended) Setting Accelerated Hearing on Trustee's Application to Approve Procedures to Auction Real Property and Personal Property in North Carolina Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 363(F) on an Expedited Basis [Re: real property and personal property including crops and equipment located at 3628 Highway 91, Snow Hill, Greene County, North Carolina subject to Trustee surcharge] filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA (related document(s) 55 Motion to Approve Sale).
64
01/17/2014
AMENDED ORDER Setting Accelerated Hearing signed on 1/17/2014 (related document(s) 56 Motion to Accelerate/Expedite, 62 Order on Motion to Accelerate/Expedite) Hearing set for 1/30/2014 at 02:30 PM at 230 N. First Ave., 7th Floor, Courtroom 702, Phoenix, AZ (GBN).
65
01/17/2014
Notice of Hearing on Trustee's Application to Approve Procedures to Auction Real Property and Personal Property in North Carolina Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 363(F) on an Expedited Basis, Sale to be Free and Clear of All Liens and Encumbrances [To enable online auction to run February 28 through March 5, 2014 for real property and personal property including crops and equipment located at 3628 Highway 91, Snow Hill, Greene County, North Carolina subject to Trustee surcharge] filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA (related document(s) 56 Motion to Accelerate/Expedite) Hearing set for 1/30/2014 at 02:30 PM at 230 N. First Ave., 7th Floor, Courtroom 702, Phoenix, AZ
66
01/23/2014
Notice of Filing Trustee's Schedule of Liens in Support of Trustee's Application to Approve Procedures to Auction Real Property and Personal Property in North Carolina Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 363(F) on an Expedited Basis [Re: real property and personal property including crops and equipment located at 3628 Highway 91, Snow Hill, Greene County, North Carolina subject to Trustee surcharge] filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA (related document(s) 55 Motion to Approve Sale).
1
Exhibit s A through H #
2
Exhibit s I through N #
3
Exhibit O
3 Attachments
67
01/23/2014
Certificate of Service filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA. (related document(s) 65 Notice of Hearing)
68
01/23/2014
Supplemental Certificate of Service filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA. (related document(s) 65 Notice of Hearing, 67 Certificate of Service)
69
01/27/2014
Objection to Motion/Application TO TRUSTEES APPLICATION TO APPROVE PROCEDURES TO AUCTION REAL PROPERTY AND PERSONAL PROPERTY IN NORTH CAROLINA PURSUANT TO 11 U.S.C. § 363(F) ON AN EXPEDITED BASIS (related to motions(s)55) filed by SCOTT W. HYDER of LAW OFFICE OF SCOTT W HYDER PLC on behalf of Mesa Cold Storage.
70
01/28/2014
Certificate of Service and No Objections [Lease: Mosquito Creek, Properties, LLLP; Property located in: Dodge County, Georgia] filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA. (related document(s) 48 Chapter 7 Trustee Notice)
71
01/28/2014
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order Authorizing Trustee to Reject the Unexpired Lease of Non-Residential Real Property as of October 31, 2013 filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA (related document(s) 47 Motion to Reject).
72
01/29/2014
ORDER Authorizing Trustee to Reject the Unexpired Lease of Non-Residential Real Property as of October 31, 2013 (Related Doc # 47) signed on 1/29/2014.
73
01/30/2014
Declaration of Tom Jordan filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA. (related document(s) 55 Motion to Approve Sale)
74
01/30/2014
Declaration of George Cunningham filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA. (related document(s) 55 Motion to Approve Sale)
75
01/30/2014
Notice of Filing Amended Schedule D filed by SHELTON L. FREEMAN of FREEMAN LAW PLLC on behalf of KENACTIV INNOVATIONS, INC.
1
Amended Schedule D
1 Attachment
76
01/30/2014
Amendment to Schedules (D,E,F/30.00 Fee) (Amended Schedule D) filed by SHELTON L. FREEMAN of FREEMAN LAW PLLC on behalf of KENACTIV INNOVATIONS, INC.
01/30/2014
Receipt of Amendment to Schedules (D,E,F/30.00 Fee)(2:13-bk-19096-GBN) [other,1229] (30.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 22473925. Fee amount 30.00. (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
77
01/30/2014
Minutes of Hearing held on: 01/30/2014 Subject: EXPEDITED HEARING ON TRUSTEE'S APPLICATION TO APPROVE PROCEDURES TO AUCTION REAL PROPERTY AND PERSONAL PROPERTY IN NORTH CAROLINA AND CREDITOR'S OBJECTION TO ACCELERATED NATURE OF THE HEARING. (vCal Hearing ID (1257403)). (related document(s) 56) Hearing on Motion set for 02/27/2014 at 10:45 AM at 230 N. First Ave., 7th Floor, Courtroom 702, Phoenix, AZ
78
01/30/2014
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 01/30/2014 02:30 PM ]. File Size [ 11,273 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:24:03 ]. (vCal Hearing ID (1257403)).
79
02/03/2014
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order Approving Trustee's Application to Approve Procedures to Auction Real Property and Personal Property in North Carolina Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 363(F) on an Expedited Basis [RE: personal property ONLY including crops and equipment located at 3628 Highway 91, Snow Hill, Greene County, North Carolina subject to Trustee surcharge] filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA (related document(s) 55 Motion to Approve Sale).
80
02/03/2014
ORDER Approving Application to Approve Procedures to Auction Real Property and Personal Property in North Carolina Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 363(F) on an Expedited Basis (Related Doc # 55) signed on 2/3/2014.
81
02/05/2014
Chapter 7 Trustee Notice of Procedures for Auction of Personal Property Located in Snow Hill, North Carolina [Online auction to run February 28 through March 5, 2014; Inspection inofrmation and Trustee's requirements for any offer prior to auction] filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA (related document(s) 80 Order on Motion to Approve Sale) Hearing set for 2/27/2014 at 10:45 AM at 230 N. First Ave., 7th Floor, Courtroom 702, Phoenix, AZ
82
02/05/2014
Trustee Motion for Sale of Property Free and Clear of Liens (176.00 fee) /Application to Approve Procedures to Add Arizona Personal Property and Georgia Personal Property to Scheduled Auction and Sell Same Free and Clear of Liens and Encumbrances Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 363 (f) [Online auction to run February 28 through March 5, 2014 for office furniture and equipment located in Arizona and personal property located at Eastman, Dodge County, Georgia subject to Trustee surcharge] filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA (related document(s) 80 Order on Motion to Approve Sale).
02/05/2014
Receipt of Motion for Sale of Property Free and Clear of Liens (176.00 fee)(2:13-bk-19096-GBN) [motion,mtnsale] (176.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 22511927. Fee amount 176.00. (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
83
02/05/2014
Motion to Accelerate/Expedite Hearing on Trustee's Application to Approve Procedures to Add Arizona Personal Property and Georgia Personal Property to Scheduled Auction and Sell Same Free and Clear of Liens and Encumbrances Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 363(f) [Request hearing on February 27, 2014 at 10:45 AM] filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA (related document(s) 82 Motion for Sale of Property Free and Clear of Liens (176.00 fee)).
84
02/05/2014
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order Setting Accelerated Hearing on Application to Approve Procedures to Add Arizona Personal Property and Georgia Personal Property to Scheduled Auction and Sell Same Free and Clear of Liens and Encumbrances Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 363(f) filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA (related document(s) 83 Motion to Accelerate/Expedite).
85
02/06/2014
Chapter 7 Trustee Notice of Hearing on Trustee's Application to Approve Procedures to Add Arizona Personal Property and Georgia Personal Property to Scheduled Auction and Sell Same Free and Clear of Liens and Encumbrances Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 363 (f) [Online auction to run February 28 through March 5, 2014 for office furniture and equipment located in Arizona and personal property located at Eastman, Dodge County, Georgia subject to Trustee surcharge] filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA (related document(s) 82 Motion for Sale of Property Free and Clear of Liens (176.00 fee)) Hearing set for 2/27/2014 at 10:45 AM at 230 N. First Ave., 7th Floor, Courtroom 702, Phoenix, AZ
86
02/06/2014
Certificate of Service Re: Notice of Procedures for Auction of Personal Property Located in Snow Hill, North Carolina filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA. (related document(s) 81 Chapter 7 Trustee Notice)
87
02/06/2014
Certificate of Service Re: Notice of Hearing on Trustee's Application to Approve Procedures to Add Arizona Personal Property and Georgia Personal Property to Scheduled Auction and Sell Same Free and Clear of Liens and Encumbrances Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 363(f) filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA. (related document(s) 85 Chapter 7 Trustee Notice)
88
02/06/2014
ORDER Setting Accelerated Hearing on Trustee's Application to Approve Procedures to Add Arizona Personal Property and Georgia Personal Property to Scheduled Auction and Sell Same Free and Clear of Liens and Encumbrances Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 363(f) (Related Doc # 83) signed on 2/6/2014 Hearing on Emergency/Expedited Motion set for 2/27/2014 at 10:45 AM at 230 N. First Ave., 7th Floor, Courtroom 702, Phoenix, AZ (GBN).
89
02/05/2014
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document (related document(s) 81 Chapter 7 Trustee Notice)
90
02/06/2014
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document (related document(s) 85 Chapter 7 Trustee Notice)
91
02/07/2014
Request for Notice filed by DAVID FOYIL of EqualJusticeLawGroup on behalf of DAVID DWYER.
92
02/07/2014
Certificate of Service filed by DAVID FOYIL of EqualJusticeLawGroup on behalf of DAVID DWYER. (related document(s) 91 Request for Notice)
93
02/11/2014
Trustee Notice of Filing Supplement to Trustee's Application to Approve Procedures to Add Arizona Personal Property and Georgia Personal Property to Scheduled Auction and Sell Same Free and Clear of Liens and Encumbrances Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 363 (f) [Online auction to run February 28 through March 5, 2014 for office furniture and equipment located in Arizona and personal property located at Eastman, Dodge County, Georgia subject to Trustee surcharge] filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA (related document(s) 82 Motion for Sale of Property Free and Clear of Liens (176.00 fee)).
94
02/11/2014
Chapter 7 Trustee Notice /AMENDED Notice of Procedures for Auction of Personal Property Located in Snow Hill, North Carolina [amended due to weather conditions] (Online auction to run February 28 through March 5, 2014; Inspection information and Trustee's requirements for any offer prior to auction) filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA (related document(s) 80 Order on Motion to Approve Sale) Hearing set for 2/27/2014 at 10:45 AM at 230 N. First Ave., 7th Floor, Courtroom 702, Phoenix, AZ
95
02/11/2014
Certificate of Service filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA. (related document(s) 94 Chapter 7 Trustee Notice)
96
02/11/2014
Change of Address for Creditor(s): SANDRA NELSON/NELSON TRUST CREATIVE CONSULTING.
97
02/13/2014
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notices filed by KEVIN C. MCCOY of KELLY McCOY, PLC on behalf of Mosquito Creek Properties, LLLP.
98
02/13/2014
Certificate of Service Re: Supplement to Trustee's Application to Approve Procedures to Add Arizona Personal Property and Georgia Personal Property to Scheduled Auction and Sell Same Free and Clear of Liens and Encumbrances Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 363 (f) filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA. (related document(s) 93 Notice of Filing)
99
02/11/2014
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document (related document(s) 94 Chapter 7 Trustee Notice)
100
02/13/2014
Change of Address for Creditor(s): THON GRIFFITH MARITAL TRUST.
101
02/14/2014
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice filed by MARK ALAN GILBERT of COLEMAN TALLEY LLP on behalf of Rosemary A. Tchobanoglous, George Tchobanoglous, Elisabeth O. Sutter, Bruce A. Sutter, Joanne E. Murphy, John P. Sullivan, Joanne Stephens, Muriel A. Vollum, Roopal Shah, Marjorie J. Reid, Delores Sentovich, Chris M. Sentovich, Virginia V. Neville, Paula K. Rogers, Ruth I. Rill, Joseph E. Rill, Rita M. Lukens, Abigail Langham, E. James Langham, Dana M. Vega, Rosalie Hays Miller, Barbara A. Langendorf, Kenneth E. Langendorf, Deanne A. Klages, Donald N. Klages, Twalla Haley, Mark Griner, John V. Russo, Laura S. Griffiths, Irving D. Gregersen, Vicki A. Giles, Sue S. Garcia, David Freker, James D. Fountain Jr., John Christopher Fountain, Mary Ann Fountain, Letitia E. Dolan, Natalie Cenovia Cummins, Marilyn C. Coyne, Erna M. Carnine, John G. Carnine, Christine N. Beck, James L. Beck, Hugh W. Baldwin, Alan L. Nuckolls, Debora J. Abbott-Nuckolls, Charlie Battle, Bill Castle, Bob Castle, Judy Castle, Eugene Goldman, John Klobas, Fredi Kronenberg, Honey Kronenberg, Allen Taylor.
102
02/14/2014
Application for Limited Admission of Edward B. Claxton III filed by KEVIN 2 MCCOY of KELLY McCOY, PLC on behalf of Mosquito Creek Properties, LLLP.
103
02/14/2014
ORDER Granting Application for Limited Admission (Related Doc # 102) signed on 2/14/2014.
104
02/24/2014
Objection to Motion/Application to Approve Procedures to Add Arizona Personal Property and Georgia Personal Property to Scheduled Auction and Sell Same Free and Clear of Liens and Encumbrances Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 363(f) (related to motions(s)82) filed by KEVIN 2 MCCOY of KELLY McCOY, PLC on behalf of Mosquito Creek Properties, LLLP.
105
02/25/2014
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice filed by STEVEN D NEMECEK of STEVE BROWN & ASSOCIATES LLC on behalf of Debora J. Abbott-Nuckolls, Hugh W. Baldwin, Charlie Battle, Christine N. Beck, James L. Beck, Erna M. Carnine, John G. Carnine, Bill Castle, Bob Castle, Judy Castle, Marilyn C. Coyne, Natalie Cenovia Cummins, Letitia E. Dolan, James D. Fountain Jr., John Christopher Fountain, Mary Ann Fountain, David Freker, Sue S. Garcia, Vicki A. Giles, Eugene Goldman, Irving D. Gregersen, Laura S. Griffiths, Mark Griner, Twalla Haley, Deanne A. Klages, Donald N. Klages, John Klobas, Fredi Kronenberg, Honey Kronenberg, Barbara A. Langendorf, Kenneth E. Langendorf, Abigail Langham, E. James Langham, Rita M. Lukens, Rosalie Hays Miller, Joanne E. Murphy, Virginia V. Neville, Alan L. Nuckolls, Marjorie J. Reid, Joseph E. Rill, Ruth I. Rill, Paula K. Rogers, John V. Russo, Chris M. Sentovich, Delores Sentovich, Roopal Shah, Joanne Stephens, John P. Sullivan, Bruce A. Sutter, Elisabeth O. Sutter, Allen Taylor, George Tchobanoglous, Rosemary A. Tchobanoglous.
106
02/24/2014
Request for Notice for Office of Unemployment Compensation Tax Services (UCTS), Department of Labor and Industry, Commonwealth of Pennsylvania Modified on 2/25/2014
107
02/27/2014
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 02/27/2014 10:45 AM ]. File Size [ 3,696 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:07:53 ]. (vCal Hearing ID (1258489)).
108
02/27/2014
Minutes of Hearing held on: 02/27/2014 Subject: STATUS HEARING ON TRUSTEE'S APPLICATION TO APPROVE PROCEDURES TO AUCTION REAL PROPERTY AND PERSONAL PROPERTY IN NORTH CAROLINA AND EXPEDITED HEARING ON TRUSTEE MOTION FOR SALE OF PROPERTY FREE AND CLEAR OF LIENS /APPLICATION TO APPROVE PROCEDURES TO ADD ARIZONA PERSONAL PROPERTY AND GEORGIA PERSONAL PROPERTY TO SCHEDULED AUCTION AND SELL SAME FREE AND CLEAR OF LIENS AND ENCUMBRANCES PURSUANT TO 11 U.S.C. 363 (F) [ONLINE AUCTION TO RUN FEBRUARY 28 THROUGH MARCH 5, 2014 FOR OFFICE FURNITURE AND EQUIPMENT LOCATED IN ARIZONA AND PERSONAL PROPERTY LOCATED AT EASTMAN, DODGE COUNTY, GEORGIA SUBJECT TO TRUSTEE SURCHARGE]. (vCal Hearing ID (1258489)). (related document(s) 56, 82) Hearing set for 03/27/2014 at 01:30 PM at 230 N. First Ave., 7th Floor, Courtroom 702, Phoenix, AZ (GBN) Hearing on Motion set for 03/27/2014 at 01:30 PM at 230 N. First Ave., 7th Floor, Courtroom 702, Phoenix, AZ
109
03/04/2014
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order Granting Trustee's Application to Approve Procedures to Add Arizona Personal Property to Scheduled Auction and Sell Same Fee and Clear of Liens and Encumbrances Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §363(F) as to Arizona Personal Property ONLY filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of KENACTIV INNOVATIONS, INC. (related document(s) 82 Motion for Sale of Property Free and Clear of Liens (176.00 fee)).
110
03/04/2014
Stipulated Motion to Approve Compromise/Settlement Under Rule 9019 and Sale Under 11 U.S.C. §363(F) [Settlement with Mesa Cold Storage regarding real property located at 3628 Highway 91, Snow Hill, Greene County, North Carolina] filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA.
111
03/05/2014
Chapter 7 Trustee Notice of Stipulated Application to Approve Settlement Under Rule 9019 and Sale Under 11 U.S.C. §363(F) and of Deadline to Object to Same [Settlement with Mesa Cold Storage regarding real property located at 3628 Highway 91, Snow Hill, Greene County, North Carolina] filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA (related document(s) 110 Motion to Approve Compromise/Settlement).
112
03/05/2014
ORDER Granting Trustee's Application to Approve Procedures to Add Arizona Personal Property and Georgia Personal Property to Scheduled Auction and Sell Same Free and Clear of Liens and Encumbrances Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 363(f) (Related Doc # 82) signed on 3/5/2014.
113
03/06/2014
Supplemental Certificate of Service filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA. (related document(s) 111 Chapter 7 Trustee Notice)
114
03/06/2014
Trustee Notice to Abandon Property [All personal property including but not limited to crops and equipment located on premises at 251 Industrial Boulevard SE, Eastman, Dodge County, Georgia 31023] filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA.
115
03/06/2014
Supplemental Certificate of Service filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA. (related document(s) 114 Trustee Notice to Abandon Property)
116
03/05/2014
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document (related document(s) 111 Chapter 7 Trustee Notice)
117
03/06/2014
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document (related document(s) 114 Trustee Notice to Abandon Property)
118
03/11/2014
Trustee Application to Employ Real Estate Broker to Market Snow Hill, North Carolina Real Property [Re: Real property located at 3628 Highway 91, Snow Hill, Greene County, North Carolina] filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA.
119
03/11/2014
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order Authorizing Trustee to Employ Real Estate Broker to Market Snow Hill, North Carolina Real Property [Re: Real property located at 3628 Highway 91, Snow Hill, Greene County, North Carolina] filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA (related document(s) 118 Application to Employ).
120
03/12/2014
ORDER Granting Application to Employ (Related Doc # 118) signed on 3/12/2014.
121
03/13/2014
Trustee Motion to Authorize Payment of Insurance Premiums [RE: Real property located at 3628 Highway 91, Snow Hill, Greene County, North Carolina] filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA.
122
03/13/2014
Trustee Motion to Limit Notice on Application to Authorize Payment of Insurance Premiums [RE: Real property located at 3628 Highway 91, Snow Hill, Greene County, North Carolina] filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA (related document(s) 121 Motion to Authorize).
123
03/13/2014
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order Approving Trustee's Application to Authorize Payment of Insurance Premiums [RE: Real property located at 3628 Highway 91, Snow Hill, Greene County, North Carolina] filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA (related document(s) 121 Motion to Authorize).
124
03/17/2014
ORDER Granting Motion to Authorize (Related Doc # 121) signed on 3/17/2014.
125
03/18/2014
Notice of Filing of Administrative Claim filed by EDWARD B CLAXTON III of EDWARD B CLAXTON III LLC on behalf of Mosquito Creek Properties, LLLP.
126
03/18/2014
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice filed by DANIEL PEARL of CIRCUIT, MCKELLOGG, KINNEY, & ROSS LLP on behalf of WESTBRIDGE AGRICULTURAL PRODUCTS.
127
03/26/2014
Trustee Report of Sale and Request to Pay Fees and Costs Associated Therewith; Request to Authorize Refund of Overpayment to Auctioneer filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA (related document(s) 81 Chapter 7 Trustee Notice).
128
03/26/2014
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order Approving Trustee's Report of Sale and Request to Pay Fees and Costs Associated Therewith; Request to Authorize Refund of Overpayment to Auctioneer filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA (related document(s) 127 Trustee Report of Sale).
129
03/27/2014
ENTERED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY - INCOMPLETE DOCUMENT - First Application for Compensation by Professional Employed by Trustee and Motion to Surcharge Secured Creditors for ADAM 1 NACH, Trustee's Attorney, Period: 11/18/2013 to 3/25/2014, Fees:$30,211.90, Expenses: $1,675.05. filed by ADAM 1 NACH. Modified on 3/27/2014
1
Exhibit A-Billing Statement-Kenactiv NC
1 Attachment
130
03/27/2014
Notice of Bar Date for First Application for Payment of Attorney's Fees and Costs and Motion to Surcharge Secured Creditors filed by ADAM 1 NACH of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA (related document(s) 132 Application for Compensation by Professional Employed by Chapter 7 or 11 Trustee). Modified on 3/27/2014
131
03/27/2014
Certificate of Mailing Notice of First Application for Payment of Attorney's Fees and Costs and Motion to Surcharge Secured Creditors filed by ADAM 1 NACH of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA. (related document(s) 130 Notice of Bar Date)
132
03/27/2014
First Application for Compensation by Professional Employed by Trustee and Motion to Surcharge Secured Creditors for ADAM 1 NACH, Trustee's Attorney, Period: 11/18/2013 to 3/25/2014, Fees:$30,211.90, Expenses: $1,675.05. filed by ADAM 1 NACH (related document(s) 130 Notice of Bar Date).
1
Exhibit A-Billing Statement-Kenactiv NC
1 Attachment
133
03/27/2014
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 03/27/2014 01:30 PM ]. File Size [ 1,789 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:03:49 ]. (vCal Hearing ID (1261058)).
134
03/27/2014
Minutes of Hearing held on: 03/27/2014 Subject: CONTINUED STATUS HEARING ON TRUSTEE'S APPLICATION TO APPROVE PROCEDURES TO AUCTION REAL PROPERTY AND PERSONAL PROPERTY IN NORTH CAROLINA (FR. 2/27) AND CONTINUED HEARING ON TRUSTEE MOTION FOR SALE OF PROPERTY FREE AND CLEAR OF LIENS /APPLICATION TO APPROVE PROCEDURES TO ADD ARIZONA PERSONAL PROPERTY AND GEORGIA PERSONAL PROPERTY TO SCHEDULED AUCTION AND SELL SAME FREE AND CLEAR OF LIENS AND ENCUMBRANCES PURSUANT TO 11 U.S.C. 363 (F) [ONLINE AUCTION TO RUN FEBRUARY 28 THROUGH MARCH 5, 2014 FOR OFFICE FURNITURE AND EQUIPMENT LOCATED IN ARIZONA AND PERSONAL PROPERTY LOCATED AT EASTMAN, DODGE COUNTY, GEORGIA SUBJECT TO TRUSTEE SURCHARGE] (FR. 2/27). (vCal Hearing ID (1261058)). (related document(s) 56, 82)
135
03/31/2014
Objection to Allowance and Payment of Mosquito Creek Properties Claim filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA (related document(s) 125 Notice of Filing).
136
04/01/2014
ORDER Approving Trustee's Report of Sale and Request to Pay Fees and Costs Associated Therewith; Request to Authorize Refund of Overpayment to Auctioneer signed on 4/1/2014 (related document(s) 127 Trustee Report of Sale).
137
04/01/2014
Trustee Application to Employ Expert; Declaration of Expert filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA.
138
04/01/2014
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order Authorizing Trustee to Employ Expert filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA (related document(s) 137 Application to Employ).
139
04/02/2014
ORDER Granting Application to Employ (Related Doc # 137) signed on 4/2/2014.
140
04/07/2014
Trustee Motion for Sale of Property Free and Clear of Liens (176.00 fee) /Application Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §363(F) for Order Approving Sale of Real Property and Related Relief [3628 Highway 91, Snow Hill, Greene County, North Carolina] filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA.
04/07/2014
Receipt of Motion for Sale of Property Free and Clear of Liens (176.00 fee)(2:13-bk-19096-GBN) [motion,mtnsale] (176.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 22939668. Fee amount 176.00. (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
141
04/07/2014
Motion to Accelerate/Expedite Hearing and to Approve Sale and Bidding Procedures on: Trustee's Application Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §363(F) for Order Approving Sale of Real Property and Related Relief [3628 Highway 91, Snow Hill, Greene County, North Carolina] filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA (related document(s) 140 Motion for Sale of Property Free and Clear of Liens (176.00 fee)).
142
04/07/2014
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order Setting Hearing and Approving Sale and Billing Procedures [Real Property located at 3628 Highway 91, Snow Hill, Greene County, North Carolina] filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA (related document(s) 141 Motion to Accelerate/Expedite).
143
04/07/2014
Objection to Motion/Application LIMITED OBJECTION TO TRUSTEES APPLICATION PURSUANT TO 11 U.S.C. §363(F) FOR ORDER (related to motions(s)140) filed by SCOTT W. HYDER of LAW OFFICE OF SCOTT W HYDER PLC on behalf of Mesa Cold Storage.
144
04/07/2014
ORDER Setting Hearing and Approving Sale and Bidding Procedures(Related Doc # 141) signed on 4/7/2014 Hearing on Emergency/Expedited Motion set for 4/29/2014 at 10:45 AM at 230 N. First Ave., 6th Floor, Courtroom 602, Phoenix, AZ (GBN/VJ).
145
04/08/2014
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order /Amended Stipulated Order Setting Hearing and Approving Sale and Bidding Procedures [Real Property located at 3628 Highway 91, Snow Hill, Greene County, North Carolina] (Amended to reflect additional language required by Mesa Cold Storage) filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA (related document(s) 140 Motion for Sale of Property Free and Clear of Liens (176.00 fee), 141 Motion to Accelerate/Expedite, 144 Order on Motion to Accelerate/Expedite).
146
04/08/2014
Chapter 7 Trustee Notice of Hearing and Notice of Sales and Bidding Procedures on: Trustee's Application Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §363(F) for Order Approving Sale of Real Property and Related Relief [NC Real Property located at 3628 Highway 91, Snow Hill, Greene County, North Carolina] filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA (related document(s) 140 Motion for Sale of Property Free and Clear of Liens (176.00 fee)) Hearing set for 4/29/2014 at 10:45 AM at 230 N. First Ave., 6th Floor, Courtroom 602, Phoenix, AZ (GBN/VJ).
147
04/08/2014
AMENDED STIPULATED ORDER Setting Hearing and Approving Sale and Bidding Procedures signed on 4/8/2014 (related document(s) 144 Order on Motion to Accelerate/Expedite) Hearing set for 4/29/2014 at 10:45 AM at 230 N. First Ave., 6th Floor, Courtroom 602, Phoenix, AZ (GBN/VJ).
148
04/08/2014
Certificate of Service filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA. (related document(s) 146 Chapter 7 Trustee Notice)
149
04/08/2014
Certificate of Service and No Objections filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA. (related document(s) 111 Chapter 7 Trustee Notice)
150
04/08/2014
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order Approving Stipulated Application to Approve Settlement Under Rule 9019 and Sale Under 11 U.S.C. §363(F) [Settlement with Mesa Cold Storage regarding real property located at 3628 Highway 91, Snow Hill, Greene County, North Carolina] filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA (related document(s) 110 Motion to Approve Compromise/Settlement).
151
04/09/2014
ORDER Granting Motion to Approve Compromise/Settlement (Related Doc # 110) signed on 4/9/2014.
152
04/08/2014
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document (related document(s) 146 Chapter 7 Trustee Notice)
153
04/14/2014
Response to Trustee's Objection to Allowance and Payment of Mosquito Creek Properties Claim filed by KEVIN 2 MCCOY of KELLY McCOY, PLC on behalf of Mosquito Creek Properties, LLLP (related document(s) 135 Objection).
154
04/15/2014
Trustee Application to Employ Accountant; Declaration of Accountant filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA.
155
04/15/2014
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order Authorizing Trustee to Employ Accountant filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA (related document(s) 154 Application to Employ).
156
04/16/2014
ORDER Granting Application to Employ (Related Doc # 154) signed on 4/16/2014.
157
04/22/2014
Certificate of Service and No Objections filed by ADAM 1 NACH of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA. (related document(s) 132 Application for Compensation by Professional Employed by Chapter 7 or 11 Trustee)
158
04/22/2014
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order Authorizing Payment of Attorney's Fees and Costs and Granting Motion to Surcharge Secured Creditors filed by ADAM 1 NACH of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA (related document(s) 132 Application for Compensation by Professional Employed by Chapter 7 or 11 Trustee).
159
04/28/2014
ORDER Granting Application for Compensation by Professional Employed by Trustee (Related Doc # 132) for ADAM 1 NACH, Fees Awarded: $30211.90, Expenses Awarded: $1675.05 signed on 4/28/2014.
160
04/30/2014
Statement of No Objection WITHDRAWAL OF LIMITED OBJECTION TO TRUSTEES APPLICATION PURSUANT TO 11 U.S.C. §363(F) FOR ORDER APPROVING SALE OF REAL PROPERTY AND RELATED RELIEF filed by SCOTT W. HYDER of LAW OFFICE OF SCOTT W HYDER PLC on behalf of Mesa Cold Storage (related document(s) 140 Motion for Sale of Property Free and Clear of Liens (176.00 fee), 143 Objection, 147 Order Setting Hearing).
161
04/29/2014
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 04/29/2014 10:45 AM ]. File Size [ 9,238 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:19:42 ]. (vCal Hearing ID (1263632)).
162
04/30/2014
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order Approving Trustee's Application Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §363(f) for Sale of Real Property [Real Property located at 3628 Highway 91, Snow Hill, Greene County, North Carolina] filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA (related document(s) 140 Motion for Sale of Property Free and Clear of Liens (176.00 fee)).
05/01/2014
Case reassigned to the Honorable Brenda K. Martin. If a hearing has been already scheduled, most matters will retain the initial hearing date and time before Judge Martin. If a date or time has changed, Judge Martin's courtroom deputy, Liz Irish, will re-notice the hearing or otherwise contact the parties. (admin) (Text entry; no document attached.)
163
04/29/2014
Minutes of Hearing held on: 04/29/2014 Subject: EXPEDITED HEARING ON TRUSTEE'S APPLICATION PURSUANT TO 11 U.S.C. 363(F) FOR ORDER APPROVING SALE OF REAL PROPERTY AND RELATED RELIEF [3628 HIGHWAY 91, SNOW HILL, GREENE COUNTY, NORTH CAROLINA]. (vCal Hearing ID (1263632)). (related document(s) 141)
164
05/01/2014
ORDER Granting Motion for Sale of Property Free and Clear of Liens (Related Doc # 140) signed on 5/1/2014.
165
05/05/2014
Change of Address for Creditor(s): Billy Heath Septic Tank Service.
166
05/07/2014
Stipulated Motion to Approve Compromise/Settlement Under Rule 9019 ["COLEMAN-TALLEY" CREDITORS; "NEBORSKY" CREDITORS] filed in conjunction with Trustee's Special Counsel, Randall S. Udelman, DEFUSCO & UDELMAN, P.L.C. filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA.
167
05/07/2014
Chapter 7 Trustee Notice of Stipulated Application to Approve Settlement Under Rule 9019 ["COLEMAN-TALLEY" CREDITORS; "NEBORSKY" CREDITORS] filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA (related document(s) 166 Motion to Approve Compromise/Settlement).
168
05/08/2014
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document (related document(s) 167 Chapter 7 Trustee Notice)
169
05/15/2014
Emergency Motion to Approve Administrative Claim to Auction Buyer in Accordance with Order Approving Sale (Real Property located at 3628 Highway 91, Snow Hill, Greene County, North Carolina) [request order be entered without further notice or hearing: Rule 9019] filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA.
170
05/15/2014
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order Granting Emergency Motion to Approve Administrative Claim to Auction Buyer in Accordance with Order Approving Sale (Real Property located at 3628 Highway 91, Snow Hill, Greene County, North Carolina) [request order be entered without further notice or hearing: Rule 9019] filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA (related document(s) 169 Motion to Approve).
171
05/15/2014
ORDER Denying Emergency Motion to Approve Administrative Claim to Auction Buyer in Accordance with Order Approving Sale (Related Doc 169) signed on 5/15/2014. Modified on 5/16/2014
172
05/21/2014
Trustee Report of Sale [Property address: 3628 Highway 91, Snow Hill, Greene County, North Carolina] filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA (related document(s) 164 Order on Motion for Sale of Property Free and Clear of Liens).
173
05/22/2014
Objection/Response / to Notice of Stipulated Application to Approve Settlement under Rule 9019 filed by BOBBY J WILLIAMS (related document(s) 111 Chapter 7 Trustee Notice). Modified on 5/23/2014
174
05/27/2014
Trustee Withdrawal of Stipulated Application to Approve Settlement Under Rule 9019 ["Coleman-Talley" Creditors; "Neborsky" Creditors] filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA (related document(s) 166 Motion to Approve Compromise/Settlement).
175
05/29/2014
Motion for Relief from Stay (176.00 fee) filed by EDWARD B CLAXTON III of EDWARD B CLAXTON III LLC on behalf of Mosquito Creek Properties, LLLP.
05/29/2014
Receipt of Motion for Relief from Stay (176.00 fee)(2:13-bk-19096-BKM) [motion,185] (176.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 23336131. Fee amount 176.00. (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
176
06/10/2014
Notice of Bar Date Regarding Motion for Relief from the Automatic Stay filed by KEVIN 2 MCCOY of KELLY McCOY, PLC on behalf of Mosquito Creek Properties, LLLP (related document(s) 175 Motion for Relief from Stay (176.00 fee)).
1
Exhibit A
1 Attachment
177
06/20/2014
Motion to Approve Compromise/Settlement /Motion Under Rule 9019 to Authorize Administrative Claim and Collect Sums Due to Resolve Claims Arising Out of Sale of Real Property Proceeds [Real Property located at 3628 Highway 91, Snow Hill, Greene County, North Carolina] filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA.
178
06/20/2014
Chapter 7 Trustee Notice of Motion Under Rule 9019 to Authorize Administrative Claim and Collect Sums Due to Resolve Claims Arising Out of Sale of Real Property Proceeds and of Deadline to Object [Real Property located at 3628 Highway 91, Snow Hill, Greene County, North Carolina] filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA (related document(s) 177 Motion to Approve Compromise/Settlement).
179
06/20/2014
Stipulated Motion to Approve Compromise/Settlement Under Rule 9019 with "Opt-In" Provision ["Coleman-Talley" Creditors; "Neborsky" Creditors] filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA.
180
06/20/2014
Chapter 7 Trustee Notice of Stipulated Application to Approve Settlement Under Rule 9019 with "Opt-In" Provision and of Deadline to Object ["Coleman-Talley" Creditors; "Neborsky" Creditors] filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA (related document(s) 179 Motion to Approve Compromise/Settlement).
181
06/20/2014
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document (related document(s) 178 Chapter 7 Trustee Notice)
182
06/23/2014
Certificate of Service filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA. (related document(s) 177 Motion to Approve Compromise/Settlement, 178 Chapter 7 Trustee Notice)
183
06/23/2014
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document (related document(s) 180 Chapter 7 Trustee Notice)
184
06/30/2014
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order filed by KEVIN 2 MCCOY of KELLY McCOY, PLC on behalf of Mosquito Creek Properties, LLLP (related document(s) 175 Motion for Relief from Stay (176.00 fee), 176 Notice of Bar Date).
1
Exhibit A
1 Attachment
185
07/07/2014
Certificate of Service and No Objections filed by KEVIN 2 MCCOY of KELLY McCOY, PLC on behalf of Mosquito Creek Properties, LLLP. (related document(s) 175 Motion for Relief from Stay (176.00 fee), 176 Notice of Bar Date)
186
07/07/2014
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order filed by KEVIN 2 MCCOY of KELLY McCOY, PLC on behalf of Mosquito Creek Properties, LLLP (related document(s) 175 Motion for Relief from Stay (176.00 fee), 176 Notice of Bar Date).
1
Exhibit A
1 Attachment
187
07/11/2014
Trustee Motion to Authorize Payment of Storage Fees of $1,000 filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA.
188
07/11/2014
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order Approving Trustee's Application to Authroize Payment of Storage Fees of $1,000 filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA (related document(s) 187 Motion to Authorize).
189
07/14/2014
Chapter 7 Trustee Notice (Letter) to Creditors of Kenactive and other Parties-In-Interest of Pleadings filed with the Court filed by ADAM 1 NACH of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA.
190
07/14/2014
Trustee Motion to Authorize Interim Distribution from Estate and Motion to Surcharge Real Property Secured Creditors filed by ADAM 1 NACH of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA.
1
Exhibit A-Trustee Application
1 Attachment
191
07/14/2014
Chapter 7 Trustee Notice of Trustee's Application for Authority to Make Interim Distribution from Estate and Motion to Surcharge Real Property Secured Creditors filed by ADAM 1 NACH of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA (related document(s) 190 Motion to Authorize).
192
07/14/2014
Trustee Application for Administrative Expenses for Fees to Accountant and Motion to Surcharge Real Property Secured Creditors filed by ADAM 1 NACH of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA.
1
Exhibit A- Accountant Statement
1 Attachment
193
07/14/2014
Chapter 7 Trustee Notice of Trustee's Application to Pay Fees to Accountant as an Administrative Expense and Motion to Surcharge Real Property Secured Creditors filed by ADAM 1 NACH of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA (related document(s) 192 Application for Administrative Expenses).
194
07/14/2014
Application for Compensation by Professional Employed by Trustee and Motion to Surcharge Real Property Secured Creditors for ADAM 1 NACH, Trustee's Attorney, Period: 11/25/2013 to 7/9/2014, Fees:$26,639.00, Expenses: $846.12. filed by ADAM 1 NACH.
1
Exhibit A-Billing Statement-Kenactiv RP
1 Attachment
195
07/14/2014
Notice of Bar Date of Trustee's Application for Payment of Attorney's Fees and Costs and Motion to Surcharge Real Property Secured Creditors filed by ADAM 1 NACH of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA (related document(s) 194 Application for Compensation by Professional Employed by Chapter 7 or 11 Trustee).
196
07/14/2014
Certificate of Mailing Notice of Trustee's Application for Payment of Attorney's Fees and Costs and Motion to Surcharge Real Property Secured Creditors filed by ADAM 1 NACH of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA. (related document(s) 195 Notice of Bar Date)
197
07/14/2014
Trustee Motion to Approve Surcharge of Real Property for Expenses and Distribute Net Proceeds from Sale of Snow Hill, North Carolina Real Property filed by ADAM 1 NACH of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA.
1
Exhibit A-Title Commitment
1 Attachment
198
07/14/2014
Chapter 7 Trustee Notice of Motion to Surcharge Real Property for Expenses and Distribute Net Proceeds from Sale of Snow Hill, North Carolina Real Property filed by ADAM 1 NACH of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA (related document(s) 197 Motion to Approve).
199
07/14/2014
Certificate of Service filed by ADAM 1 NACH of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA. (related document(s) 190 Motion to Authorize, 191 Chapter 7 Trustee Notice, 192 Application for Administrative Expenses, 193 Chapter 7 Trustee Notice, 197 Motion to Approve, 198 Chapter 7 Trustee Notice)
200
07/14/2014
Certificate of Mailing filed by ADAM 1 NACH of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA. (related document(s) 189 Chapter 7 Trustee Notice)
201
07/16/2014
ORDER Granting Motion to Authorize (Related Doc # 187) signed on 7/16/2014.
202
07/15/2014
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document (related document(s) 189 Chapter 7 Trustee Notice)
203
07/15/2014
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document (related document(s) 191 Chapter 7 Trustee Notice)
204
07/15/2014
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document (related document(s) 193 Chapter 7 Trustee Notice)
205
07/15/2014
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document (related document(s) 198 Chapter 7 Trustee Notice)
206
07/23/2014
ORDER Granting Motion for Relief from Stay (Related Doc # 175) signed on 7/23/2014.
207
07/24/2014
BNC Certificate of Notice (related document(s) 206 Order on Motion for Relief from Stay)
208
07/24/2014
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document (related document(s) 206 Order on Motion for Relief from Stay)
209
07/28/2014
Trustee Notice to Abandon Property [Personal property located in Storage Unit in Matthews, North Carolina] filed by ADAM B. NACH of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA.
210
07/29/2014
Supplemental Certificate of Service filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of KENACTIV INNOVATIONS, INC. (related document(s) 209 Trustee Notice to Abandon Property)
211
07/30/2014
Certificate of Service and No Objections filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of KENACTIV INNOVATIONS, INC. (related document(s) 180 Chapter 7 Trustee Notice)
212
07/30/2014
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order Approving Stipulated Application to Approve Settlement Under Rule 9019 with "Opt-In" Provision ["Coleman-Talley" Creditors; "Neborsky" Creditors] filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA (related document(s) 179 Motion to Approve Compromise/Settlement).
213
07/30/2014
Trustee Motion to Approve Fees to Expert as an Administrative Expense and Litigation Cost and for Related Relief filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA.
1
Invoice
1 Attachment
214
07/30/2014
Chapter 7 Trustee Notice of Application to Approve Fees to Expert as an Administrative Expense and Litigation Cost and for Related Relief filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA (related document(s) 213 Motion to Approve).
215
07/30/2014
Certificate of Service and No Objections filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA. (related document(s) 178 Chapter 7 Trustee Notice)
216
07/30/2014
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order Approving Motion Under Rule 9019 to Authorize Administrative Claim and Collect Sums Due to Resolve Claims Arising Out of Sale of Real Property Proceeds [Real Property located at 3628 Highway 91, Snow Hill, Greene County, North Carolina] filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA (related document(s) 177 Motion to Approve Compromise/Settlement).
217
07/29/2014
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document (related document(s) 209 Trustee Notice to Abandon Property)
218
07/31/2014
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document (related document(s) 214 Chapter 7 Trustee Notice)
219
08/07/2014
ORDER Approving Motion Under Rule 9019 to Authorize Administrative Claim and Collect Sums Due to Resolve Claims Arising Out of Sale of Real Property Proceeds (Related Doc # 177) signed on 8/7/2014.
220
08/07/2014
ORDER Approving Stipulated Application to Approve Settlement Under Rule 9019 with "Opt-In" Provision ["Coleman-Talley" Creditors; "Neborsky" Creditors] (Related Doc # 179) signed on 8/7/2014.
221
08/08/2014
Certificate of Service and No Objections filed by ADAM 1 NACH of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA. (related document(s) 194 Application for Compensation by Professional Employed by Chapter 7 or 11 Trustee)
222
08/08/2014
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order Authorizing Payment of Attorney's Fees and Costs and Granting Motion to Surcharge Real Property Secured Creditors filed by ADAM 1 NACH of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA (related document(s) 194 Application for Compensation by Professional Employed by Chapter 7 or 11 Trustee).
223
08/07/2014
Change of Address for Creditor(s): ROSALIE HAYS MILLER.
224
08/11/2014
Deficiency Memo (related document(s) 221 Certificate of Service and No Objections, 222 Notice of Lodging Proposed Order)
225
08/11/2014
Certificate of Service and No Objections filed by ADAM 1 NACH of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA (related document(s) 194 Application for Compensation by Professional Employed by Chapter 7 or 11 Trustee). Modified on 8/12/2014 to correct text
226
08/11/2014
Certificate of Service and No Objections filed by ADAM 1 NACH of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA. (related document(s) 194 Application for Compensation by Professional Employed by Chapter 7 or 11 Trustee)
227
08/11/2014
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order Authorizing Payment of Attorney's Fees and Costs and Grantingh Motion to Surcharge Real Property Secured Creditors filed by ADAM 1 NACH of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA (related document(s) 194 Application for Compensation by Professional Employed by Chapter 7 or 11 Trustee).
228
08/11/2014
Certificate of Service and No Objections filed by ADAM 1 NACH of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA. (related document(s) 190 Motion to Authorize)
229
08/11/2014
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order Approving Application and Authorizing Trustee to Make an Interim Distribution from Estate and Granting Motion to Surcharge Real Property Secured Creditors filed by ADAM 1 NACH of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA (related document(s) 190 Motion to Authorize).
230
08/11/2014
Certificate of Service and No Objections filed by ADAM 1 NACH of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA. (related document(s) 192 Application for Administrative Expenses)
231
08/11/2014
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order Authorizing Payment of Fees to Philip Bayouth of Levinson, Smith & Huffman, P.C. as an Administrative Expense and Granting Motion to Surcharge Real Property Secured Creditors filed by ADAM 1 NACH of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA (related document(s) 192 Application for Administrative Expenses).
232
08/11/2014
Certificate of Service and No Objections filed by ADAM 1 NACH of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA. (related document(s) 197 Motion to Approve)
233
08/11/2014
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order Approving Trustee's Motion to Surcharge Real Property for Expenses and Distribute Net Proceeds from Sale of Snow Hill, North Carolina Real Property filed by ADAM 1 NACH of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA (related document(s) 197 Motion to Approve).
234
08/17/2014
ORDER Authorizing Payment of Attorney's Fees and Costs and Granting Motion to Surcharge Real Property Secured Creditors (Related Doc # 194) for ADAM 1 NACH, Fees Awarded: $26639.00, Expenses Awarded: $846.12 signed on 8/17/2014.
235
08/19/2014
ORDER Approving Application and Authorizing Trustee to Make an Interim Distribution from Estate and Granting Motion to Surcharge Real Property Secured Creditors (Related Doc # 190) signed on 8/19/2014.
236
08/19/2014
ORDER Authorizing Payment of Fees to Philip Bayouth of Levinson, Smith & Huffman, P.C. as an Administrative Expense and Granting Motion to Surcharge Real Property Secured Creditors (Related Doc # 192) signed on 8/19/2014.
237
08/19/2014
ORDER Approving Trustee's Motion to Surcharge Real Property for Expenses and Distribute Net Proceeds from Sale of Snow Hill, North Carolina Real Property (Related Doc # 197) signed on 8/19/2014.
238
08/20/2014
Trustee Notice to Abandon Property filed by S. WILLIAM MANERA on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA.(MANERA, S.)
239
08/20/2014
Change of Address for Creditor(s): SANDRA NELSON & NELSON TRUST.
240
08/20/2014
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document (related document(s) 238 Trustee Notice to Abandon Property)
241
10/08/2014
Certificate of Service and No Objections filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA. (related document(s) 214 Chapter 7 Trustee Notice)
242
10/08/2014
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order Granting Trustee's Application to Approve Fees to Expert as an Administrative Expense and Litigation Cost and for Related Relief filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA (related document(s) 213 Motion to Approve).
243
10/14/2014
ORDER Granting Trustee's Application to Approve Fees to Expert as an Administrative Expense and Litigation Cost and for Related Relief (Related Doc # 213) signed on 10/14/2014.
244
10/23/2014
Trustee Motion to Approve Compromise/Settlement of Claims to Proceeds from Personal Property and to Authorize Distribution of Net Proceeds from Sale of Personal Property [Rule 9019] filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA.
245
10/23/2014
Chapter 7 Trustee Notice of Motion to Approve Compromise of Claims to Proceeds from Personal Property and to Authorize Distribution of Net Proceeds from Sale of Personal Property and of Deadline to Object [Rule 9019] filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA (related document(s) 244 Motion to Approve Compromise/Settlement).
246
10/23/2014
Chapter 7 Trustee Notice (Letter) to Creditors of Kenactiv and other Parties-in-Interest of Pleadings filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA.
247
10/24/2014
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document (related document(s) 245 Chapter 7 Trustee Notice)
248
10/24/2014
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document (related document(s) 246 Chapter 7 Trustee Notice)
249
11/03/2014
Objection to Motion/Application Creditor Andrew Brand's Objection to Trustee's Motion To Approve Compromise Of Claims To Proceeds From Personal Property And To Authorize Distribution Of Net Proceeds From Sale of Personal Property (related to motions(s)244) filed by DAVID A. FITZGERALD of TITUS BRUECKNER & LEVINE PLC on behalf of Andrew Brand.
250
11/07/2014
Chapter 7 Trustee Notice of Hearing on Motion to Approve Compromise of Claims to Proceeds from Personal Property and to Authorize Distribution of Net Proceeds from Sale of Personal Property and of Deadline to Object filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA (related document(s) 244 Motion to Approve Compromise/Settlement, 249 Objection) Hearing set for 12/3/2014 at 10:00 AM at 230 N. First Ave., 7th Floor, Courtroom 701, Phoenix, AZ (BKM) Objections/Responses due by 11/17/2014.
251
11/07/2014
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document (related document(s) 250 Chapter 7 Trustee Notice)
252
12/02/2014
Notice of Appearance for Eugene Goldman filed by TERESA H FOSTER of Teresa H. Foster, PLLC on behalf of Eugene Goldman.
253
12/02/2014
Objection to Motion/Application to Approve Compromise of Claims to Proceeds (related to motions(s)244) filed by TERESA H FOSTER of Teresa H. Foster, PLLC on behalf of Eugene Goldman.
1
Exhibit Ex 1 - 4
1 Attachment
254
12/03/2014
Minutes of Hearing held on: 12/03/2014 Subject: TRUSTEE MOTION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE/SETTLEMENT OF CLAIMS TO PROCEEDS FROM PERSONAL PROPERTY AND TO AUTHORIZE DISTRIBUTION OF NET PROCEEDS FROM SALE OF PERSONAL PROPERTY [RULE 9019] FILED BY LISA PERRY BANEN ON BEHALF OF S. WILLIAM MANERA. (vCal Hearing ID (1286139)). (related document(s) 244) Hearing set for 02/03/2015 at 11:00 AM at 230 N. First Ave., 7th Floor, Courtroom 701, Phoenix, AZ
255
12/03/2014
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 12/03/2014 10:00 AM ]. File Size [ 8,706 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:18:34 ]. (vCal Hearing ID (1286139)).
256
12/29/2014
Second Motion for Payment of Administrative Expenses /Application to Pay Fees to Accountant as an Administrative Expense and Motion to Surcharge Real Property Secured Creditors filed by ADAM B. NACH of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA.
257
12/29/2014
Chapter 7 Trustee Notice of Second Application to Pay Fees to Accountant as an Adminstrative Expense and Motion to Surcharge Real Property Secured Creditors filed by ADAM B. NACH of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA (related document(s) 256 Motion for Payment of Administrative Expenses).
258
12/30/2014
Certificate of Service filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA. (related document(s) 256 Motion for Payment of Administrative Expenses, 257 Chapter 7 Trustee Notice)
259
12/30/2014
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document (related document(s) 257 Chapter 7 Trustee Notice)
260
01/28/2015
Certificate of Service and No Objections filed by ADAM B. NACH of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA. (related document(s) 257 Chapter 7 Trustee Notice)
261
01/28/2015
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order Authorizing Payment of Fees to Philip Bayouth of Levinson, Smith & Huffman, P.C. as an Administrative Expense and Granting Motion to Surcharge Real Property Secured Creditors filed by ADAM B. NACH of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA (related document(s) 256 Motion for Payment of Administrative Expenses).
262
01/29/2015
ORDER Granting Motion for Payment of Administrative Expenses (Related Doc # 256) signed on 1/29/2015.
263
01/30/2015
Trustee Motion to Authorize Distribution of Net Proceeds from Sale of Personal Property filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA (related document(s) 244 Motion to Approve Compromise/Settlement, 254 Minute Entry).
264
01/30/2015
Motion to Withdraw Document Objection and Joinder in Trustee's Application filed by TERESA H FOSTER of Teresa H. Foster, PLLC on behalf of Eugene Goldman (related document(s) 253 Objection).
265
02/03/2015
Objection to Motion/Application To Trustee's Authorize Distribution Of Net Proceeds From Sale Of Personal Property (related to motions(s)263) filed by DAVID A. FITZGERALD of TITUS BRUECKNER & LEVINE PLC on behalf of Andrew Brand Reply due by 2/12/2015.
1
Exhibit 1 #
2
Exhibit 2
2 Attachments
266
02/03/2015
Minutes of Hearing held on: 02/03/2015 Subject: CONTINUED HEARING RE: TRUSTEE MOTION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE/SETTLEMENT OF CLAIMS TO PROCEEDS FROM PERSONAL PROPERTY AND TO AUTHORIZE DISTRIBUTION OF NET PROCEEDS FROM SALE OF PERSONAL PROPERTY [RULE 9019] FILED BY LISA PERRY BANEN ON BEHALF OF S. WILLIAM MANERA. (vCal Hearing ID (1289019)). (related document(s) 244)
267
02/04/2015
Declaration /Corrected Declaration of Tom Jordan [Corrects Declaration filed January 30, 2015 at docket #263] filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA. (related document(s) 263 Motion to Authorize)
02/20/2015
Adversary case 2:15-ap-00128. Adversary Proceeding Opened. (Text entry; no document attached.)
268
02/03/2015
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 02/03/2015 11:00 AM ]. File Size [ 9,964 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:21:15 ]. (vCal Hearing ID (1289019)).
269
02/20/2015
Chapter 7 Trustee Notice of Withdrawal of Trustee's Motion to Approve Compromise of Claims to Proceeds from Personal Property and to Authorize Distribution of Net Proceeds from Sale of Personal Property [Rule 9019] (Docket #244) and Withdrawal of Trustee's Application to Authorize Distribution of Net Proceeds from Sale of Personal Property (Docket #263) and Notice of Same filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA (related document(s) 244 Motion to Approve Compromise/Settlement, 263 Motion to Authorize).
270
02/20/2015
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document (related document(s) 269 Chapter 7 Trustee Notice)
271
03/12/2015
Trustee Motion to Authorize Second Interim Distribution from Estate and Motion to Surcharge Real Property Secured Creditors and Pay Remaining Proceeds to Real Property Secured Creditors filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA.
272
03/12/2015
Chapter 7 Trustee Notice of Trustee's Application for Authority to Make Second Interim Distribution from Estate and Motion to Surcharge Real Property Secured Creditors and Pay Remaining Proceeds to Real Property Secured Creditors and of Deadline to Object filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA (related document(s) 271 Motion to Authorize).
273
03/12/2015
Second Application for Administrative Expenses /Application to Pay Fees and Costs to Accountant as an Administrative Expense (North Carolina Real Property Proceeds) filed by ADAM B. NACH of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA.
274
03/12/2015
Chapter 7 Trustee Notice of Second Application to Pay Fees and Costs to Accountant as an Administrative Expense (North Carolina Real Property Proceeds) filed by ADAM B. NACH of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA (related document(s) 273 Application for Administrative Expenses).
275
03/12/2015
Second Application for Compensation by Professional Employed by Trustee for Payment of Attorney's Fees and Costs (North Carolina Real Property Proceeds) for ADAM B. NACH, Trustee's Attorney, Period: 7/10/2014 to 3/5/2015, Fees:$6,599.50, Expenses: $263.97. filed by ADAM B. NACH.
1
Exhibit A - Billing Statement - Kenactiv
1 Attachment
276
03/12/2015
Notice of Bar Date Re: Notice of Trustee's Second Application for Payment of Attorney's Fees and Costs (North Carolina Real Property Proceeds) filed by ADAM B. NACH of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA (related document(s) 275 Application for Compensation by Professional Employed by Chapter 7 or 11 Trustee).
277
03/13/2015
Certificate of Service filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA. (related document(s) 276 Notice of Bar Date)
278
03/13/2015
Certificate of Service filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA. (related document(s) 271 Motion to Authorize, 272 Chapter 7 Trustee Notice)
279
03/13/2015
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document (related document(s) 272 Chapter 7 Trustee Notice)
280
03/13/2015
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document (related document(s) 274 Chapter 7 Trustee Notice)
281
03/31/2015
Joint Motion for Relief from Stay (176.00 fee) to Allow for the Payment of Defense Costs from Applicable Director & Officer Insurance Policies filed by JENNIFER HADLEY DIOGUARDI of SNELL & WILMER on behalf of Richard W. Elsey, Billy Styles, Cameron Adair, P. Douglas MacMillan, Thomas C. Rowland, III, Michael J. Sinnwell, Jr., David Querciagrossa, Christopher E. Galvin.
03/31/2015
Receipt of Motion for Relief from Stay (176.00 fee)(2:13-bk-19096-BKM) [motion,185] (176.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 25156058. Fee amount 176.00. (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
282
03/31/2015
Notice of Motion for Relief from Stay to Allow for the Payment of Defense Costs from Applicable Director & Officer Insurance Policies filed by JENNIFER HADLEY DIOGUARDI of SNELL & WILMER on behalf of Cameron Adair, Richard W. Elsey, Christopher E. Galvin, P. Douglas MacMillan, David Querciagrossa, Thomas C. Rowland, III, Michael J. Sinnwell, Jr., Billy Styles (related document(s) 281 Motion for Relief from Stay (176.00 fee)) Objections/Responses due by 4/17/2015.
283
04/09/2015
Certificate of Service and No Objections filed by ADAM 1 NACH of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA. (related document(s) 271 Motion to Authorize)
284
04/09/2015
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order Approving Trustee's Application for Authority to Make Second Interim Distribution from Estate and Motion to Surcharge Real Property Secured Creditors and Pay Remaining Proceeds to Real Property Secured Creditors filed by ADAM 1 NACH of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA (related document(s) 271 Motion to Authorize).
285
04/09/2015
Certificate of Service and No Objections filed by ADAM 1 NACH of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA. (related document(s) 273 Application for Administrative Expenses)
286
04/09/2015
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order Approving Second Application and Authorizing Payment of Fees to Philip Bayouth of Levinson, Smith & Huffman, P.C. as an Administrative Expense [North Carolina Real Property Proceeds] filed by ADAM 1 NACH of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA (related document(s) 273 Application for Administrative Expenses).
287
04/09/2015
Certificate of Service and No Objections filed by ADAM 1 NACH of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA. (related document(s) 275 Application for Compensation by Professional Employed by Chapter 7 or 11 Trustee)
288
04/09/2015
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order Approving Second Application and Authorizing Payment of Attorney's Fees and Costs filed by ADAM 1 NACH of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA (related document(s) 275 Application for Compensation by Professional Employed by Chapter 7 or 11 Trustee).
289
04/15/2015
ORDER Granting Motion to Authorize (Related Doc # 271) signed on 4/15/2015.
290
04/15/2015
ORDER Granting Application for Administrative Expenses (Related Doc # 273) signed on 4/15/2015.
291
04/15/2015
ORDER Granting Application for Compensation by Professional Employed by Trustee (Related Doc # 275) for ADAM B. NACH, Fees Awarded: $6599.50, Expenses Awarded: $263.97 signed on 4/15/2015.
292
04/15/2015
Trustee Response to Joint Motion for Stay Relief to Allow for the Payment of Defense Costs from Applicable Director & Officer Insurance Policies filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA (related document(s) 281 Motion for Relief from Stay (176.00 fee)).
1
Exhibit s A through F
1 Attachment
293
04/15/2015
Certificate of Service filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA. (related document(s) 292 Response)
294
04/23/2015
Notice of Hearing /Notice of Preliminary Hearing on Movants' Joint Motion for Stay Relief to Allow for the Payment of Defense Costs from Applicable Director & Officer Insurance Policies filed by JENNIFER HADLEY DIOGUARDI of SNELL & WILMER on behalf of Cameron Adair, Richard W. Elsey, Christopher E. Galvin, P. Douglas MacMillan, David Querciagrossa, Thomas C. Rowland, III, Michael J. Sinnwell, Jr., Billy Styles (related document(s) 281 Motion for Relief from Stay (176.00 fee)) Hearing set for 5/13/2015 at 01:30 PM at 230 N. First Ave., 7th Floor, Courtroom 701, Phoenix, AZ
295
04/24/2015
Notice of Appearance filed by MAUREEN BEYERS of OSBORN MALEDON, PA on behalf of Cameron Adair, P. Douglas MacMillan, Thomas C. Rowland, III.
296
04/30/2015
ORDER OF RECUSAL signed on 4/30/2015.
297
04/30/2015
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document (related document(s) 296 Recusal Order-Case or Adversary)
298
05/04/2015
Reply to Motion/Application Reply in Support of Movants' Joint Motion for Stay Relief to Allow for the Payment of Defense Costs from Applicable Director & Officer Insurance Policies (related to motions(s)281) filed by JENNIFER HADLEY DIOGUARDI of SNELL & WILMER on behalf of Cameron Adair, Richard W. Elsey, Christopher E. Galvin, P. Douglas MacMillan, David Querciagrossa, Thomas C. Rowland, III, Michael J. Sinnwell, Jr., Billy Styles.
299
05/05/2015
Minutes of Hearing held on: 05/13/2015 Subject: PRELIMINARY HEARING RE: JOINT MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM STAY TO ALLOW FOR THE PAYMENT OF DEFENSE COSTS FROM APPLICABLE DIRECTOR & OFFICER INSURANCE POLICIES FILED BY JENNIFER HADLEY DIOGUARDI ON BEHALF OF RICHARD W. ELSEY, BILLY STYLES, CAMERON ADAIR, P. DOUGLAS MACMILLAN, THOMAS C. ROWLAND, III, MICHAEL J. SINNWELL, JR., DAVID QUERCIAGROSSA, CHRISTOPHER E. GALVIN. Appearances: NONE. Proceedings: VACATED: ORDER OF RECUSAL SIGNED ON 04-30-2015, DOCKET #296. CASE REASSIGNED TO JUDGE WANSLEE. (vCal Hearing ID (1302310)). (related document(s) 281)
300
05/05/2015
Notice of Hearing /Notice of Preliminary Hearing on Movants' Joint Motion for Stay Relief to Allow for the Payment of Defense Costs from Applicable Director & Officer Insurance Policies filed by JENNIFER HADLEY DIOGUARDI of SNELL & WILMER on behalf of Cameron Adair, Richard W. Elsey, Christopher E. Galvin, P. Douglas MacMillan, David Querciagrossa, Thomas C. Rowland, III, Michael J. Sinnwell, Jr., Billy Styles (related document(s) 281 Motion for Relief from Stay (176.00 fee)) Hearing set for 6/4/2015 at 02:30 PM at 230 N. First Ave., 7th Floor, Courtroom 702, Phoenix, AZ (MCW).
1
Exhibit A - Order Continuing Stay in Effect Pending Preliminary Hearing and Establishing Procedures for Resolution of Stay Relief Motions
1 Attachment
301
05/05/2015
Certificate of Service re Notice of Preliminary Hearing filed by JENNIFER HADLEY DIOGUARDI of SNELL & WILMER on behalf of Cameron Adair, Richard W. Elsey, Christopher E. Galvin, P. Douglas MacMillan, David Querciagrossa, Thomas C. Rowland, III, Michael J. Sinnwell, Jr., Billy Styles. (related document(s) 300 Notice of Hearing)
302
05/19/2015
Trustee Motion to Continue Preliminary Hearing from June 4 to June 9 [Request hearing June 9 after 10:30 AM or as convenient to the Court] filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA (related document(s) 300 Notice of Hearing).
303
05/19/2015
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA (related document(s) 302 Motion to Continue).
304
05/20/2015
ORDER Granting Motion to Continue (Related Doc # 302) signed on 5/20/2015 Motion for Relief from Stay Hearing set for 6/9/2015 at 03:30 PM at 230 N. First Ave., 7th Floor, Courtroom 702, Phoenix, AZ (MCW).
305
06/04/2015
Minutes of Hearing held on: 06/04/2015 Subject: JOINT MOTION FOR STAY RELIEF TO ALLOW FOR THE PAYMENT OF DEFENSE COSTS FROM APPLICABLE DIRECTOR & OFFICER INSURANCE POLICIES FILED BY JENNIFER DIOGUARDI OF SNELL & WILMER ON BEHALF OF THE D&O PARTIES. (vCal Hearing ID (1303306)). (related document(s) 281) Preliminary Hearing set for 06/09/2015 at 03:30 PM at 230 N. First Ave., 7th Floor, Courtroom 702, Phoenix, AZ
306
06/08/2015
Notice of Appearance filed by TIMOTHY M. STRONG of STEPTOE & JOHNSON LLP on behalf of Billy Styles.
307
06/09/2015
Certificate of Service filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA. (related document(s) 304 Order on Motion to Continue)
308
06/09/2015
Minutes of Hearing held on: 06/09/2015 Subject: JOINT MOTION FOR STAY RELIEF TO ALLOW FOR THE PAYMENT OF DEFENSE COSTS FROM APPLICABLE DIRECTOR & OFFICER INSURANCE POLICIES FILED BY JENNIFER DIOGUARDI OF SNELL & WILMER ON BEHALF OF THE D&O PARTIES. (vCal Hearing ID (1304932)). (related document(s) 281) Oral Argument set for 07/01/2015 at 01:30 PM at 230 N. First Ave., 7th Floor, Courtroom 702, Phoenix, AZ
309
06/09/2015
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 06/09/2015 03:30 PM ]. File Size [ 22,045 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:47:01 ]. Additional Audio Files Attached. (vCal Hearing ID (1304932)).
310
06/11/2015
Transcript of Hearing or Trial on, 6/9/2015, and Notice of Filing Transcript and Opportunity to Request Redaction of Personal Data Identifiers. Pursuant to Judicial Conference Policy, the transcript will not be electronically available for 90 days from the date of filing of the transcript. During this 90 day period, copies of the transcript may be purchased from the transcription service AV Tranz. The transcript may also be viewed, but not printed, at the public terminals at the office of the clerk. (related document(s) 308 Minute Entry) Transcript access will be restricted through 9/9/2015.
311
06/11/2015
BNC Certificate of Notice (related document(s) 310 Transcript and Notice of Filing)
312
06/24/2015
Stipulation /Joint Stipulation of the Debtor, Trustee S. William Manera, Movants, and AIG Claims, Inc. Lifting the Automatic Stay to Permit Payment of Defense Costs from Applicable Director and Officer Insurance Policies filed by JENNIFER HADLEY DIOGUARDI of SNELL & WILMER on behalf of Cameron Adair, Richard W. Elsey, Christopher E. Galvin, S. WILLIAM MANERA, P. Douglas MacMillan, David Querciagrossa, Thomas C. Rowland, III, Michael J. Sinnwell, Jr., Billy Styles. (related document(s) 281 Motion for Relief from Stay (176.00 fee))
313
06/24/2015
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order Approving Joint Stipulation of the Debtor, Trustee S. William Manera, Movants, and AIG Claims, Inc. Lifting the Automatic Stay to Permit Payment of Defense Costs From Applicable Director and Officer Insurance Policies filed by JENNIFER HADLEY DIOGUARDI of SNELL & WILMER on behalf of Cameron Adair, Richard W. Elsey, Christopher E. Galvin, S. WILLIAM MANERA, P. Douglas MacMillan, David Querciagrossa, Thomas C. Rowland, III, Michael J. Sinnwell, Jr., Billy Styles (related document(s) 312 Stipulation).
314
06/27/2015
ORDER Granting the Parties' Stipulation to Lift Automatic Stay to Permit Payment of Defense Costs signed on 6/27/2015 (related document(s) 312 Stipulation).
315
07/01/2015
Minutes of Hearing held on: 07/01/2015 Subject: ORAL ARGUMENT. (vCal Hearing ID (1306564)). (related document(s) 281)
316
07/14/2015
Stipulated Motion to Approve Compromise/Settlement Under Rule 9019 [Interpleader Adversary Case No. 2:15-ap-00128-MCW] filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA.
317
07/14/2015
Chapter 7 Trustee Notice of Stipulated Application to Approve Settlement Under Rule 9019 and of Deadline to Object to Same [Interpleader Adversary Case No. 2:15-00128-MCW] filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA (related document(s) 316 Motion to Approve Compromise/Settlement).
318
07/14/2015
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document (related document(s) 317 Chapter 7 Trustee Notice)
319
08/06/2015
Trustee Application for FRBP 2004 Examination (Production of Documents only as to Branch Banking and Trust dba BB&T) filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA.
320
08/06/2015
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order Granting Trustee's Application for Production of Documents Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure, Rule 2004 (as to Branch Banking and Trust Company dba BB&T) filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA (related document(s) 319 Application for FRBP 2004 Examination).
321
08/06/2015
Trustee Application for FRBP 2004 Examination (Production of Documents only as to JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association) filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA.
322
08/06/2015
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order Granting Trustee's Application for Production of Documents Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure, Rule 2004 (as to JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association) filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA (related document(s) 321 Application for FRBP 2004 Examination).
323
08/06/2015
ORDER Granting Application for FRBP 2004 Examination (Related Doc # 319) signed on 8/6/2015.
324
08/06/2015
ORDER Granting Application for FRBP 2004 Examination (Related Doc # 321) signed on 8/6/2015.
325
08/10/2015
Certificate of Mailing (as to Branch Banking and Trust dba BB&T) filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA. (related document(s) 323 Order on Application for FRBP 2004 Examination)
326
08/10/2015
Certificate of Mailing (as to JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association) filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA. (related document(s) 324 Order on Application for FRBP 2004 Examination)
327
08/10/2015
Change of Address for Creditor(s): Stanley Farms, dba Triple Nickel Company Modified on 8/13/2015
328
08/26/2015
Certificate of Service and No Objections filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA. (related document(s) 317 Chapter 7 Trustee Notice)
329
08/26/2015
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order Approving Stipulated Application to Approve Settlement Under Rule 9019 [Interpleader Adversary Case No. 2:15-ap-00128-MCW] filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA (related document(s) 316 Motion to Approve Compromise/Settlement).
330
08/27/2015
Amended Notice of Lodging Proposed Order Approving Stipulated Application to Approve Settlement Under Rule 9019 [Interpleader Adversary Case No. 2:15-ap-00128-MCW] filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA (related document(s) 316 Motion to Approve Compromise/Settlement).
331
08/31/2015
Change of Address for Creditor(s): Joanne Chamberlain Stephens.
332
09/09/2015
ORDER Approving Stipulated Application to Approve Settlement under Rule 9019 signed on 9/9/2015 (related document(s) 316 Motion to Approve Compromise/Settlement). Modified on 9/10/2015
333
09/16/2015
Trustee Motion to Approve Compromise/Settlement Under Rule 9019 ["D&O/Insurance Claims"] filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA.
334
09/16/2015
Motion to Accelerate/Expedite Hearing on Application to Approve Settlement Under Rule 9019 ["D&O/Insurance Claims"] (Request hearing between October 1, 2015 and October 6, 2015) filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA (related document(s) 333 Motion to Approve Compromise/Settlement).
335
09/16/2015
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order Setting Accelerated Hearing on Application to Approve Settlement Under Rule 9019 ["D&O/Insurance Claims"] filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA (related document(s) 334 Motion to Accelerate/Expedite).
336
09/22/2015
ORDER Setting Accelerated Hearing On Application To Approve Settlement Under Rule 9019 ["D&O/Insurance Claims"] (Related Doc # 334) signed on 9/22/2015 Hearing on Emergency/Expedited Motion set for 10/6/2015 at 03:00 PM at 230 N. First Ave., 7th Floor, Courtroom 702, Phoenix, AZ (MCW).
337
09/22/2015
Chapter 7 Trustee Notice of Accelerated Hearing on Trustee's Application to Approve Settlement Under Rule 9019 ["D&O/Insurance Claims"] and of Deadline to Object filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA (related document(s) 333 Motion to Approve Compromise/Settlement, 336 Order on Motion to Accelerate/Expedite) Hearing set for 10/6/2015 at 03:00 PM at 230 N. First Ave., 7th Floor, Courtroom 702, Phoenix, AZ (MCW) Objections/Responses due by 10/1/2015.
338
09/22/2015
Certificate of Service filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA. (related document(s) 337 Chapter 7 Trustee Notice)
339
09/22/2015
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document (related document(s) 337 Chapter 7 Trustee Notice)
340
10/06/2015
Minutes of Hearing held on: 10/06/2015 Subject: ACCELERATED HEARING ON TRUSTEE'S APPLICATION TO APPROVE SETTLEMENT UNDER RULE 9019 ["D&O/INSURANCE CLAIMS"]. (vCal Hearing ID (1314913)). (related document(s) 334)
341
10/06/2015
Amended Minutes of Hearing held on: 10/06/2015 Subject: ACCELERATED HEARING ON TRUSTEE'S APPLICATION TO APPROVE SETTLEMENT UNDER RULE 9019 ["D&O/INSURANCE CLAIMS"]. (vCal Hearing ID (1314913)). (related document(s) 334) Modified on 10/6/2015 to reflect parties
342
10/06/2015
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order Approving Application to Approve Settlement under Rule 9019 ["D&O/Insurance Claims"] filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA (related document(s) 333 Motion to Approve Compromise/Settlement).
343
10/06/2015
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 10/06/2015 03:00 PM ]. File Size [ 5,827 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:12:25 ]. (vCal Hearing ID (1314913)).
344
10/07/2015
ORDER Granting Motion to Approve Settlement Under Rule 9019 (Related Doc # 333) signed on 10/7/2015.
345
10/07/2015
Notice of Entry of Judgment/Order (related document(s) 344 Order on Motion to Approve Compromise/Settlement)
346
10/09/2015
Trustee Objection to Claim 1 and Notice of Deadline to Respond with Certificate of Service filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA Objections/Responses due by 10/23/2015.
347
10/09/2015
Trustee Objection to Claim 5 and Notice of Deadline to Respond with Certificate of Service filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA Objections/Responses due by 10/23/2015.
348
10/09/2015
Trustee Objection to Claim 6 and Notice of Deadline to Respond with Certificate of Service filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA Objections/Responses due by 10/23/2015.
349
10/09/2015
Notice of Filing Exhibit "A" to Objection to Claim and Notice of Deadline to Respond with Certificate of Service (Claim #6) filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA (related document(s) 348 Trustee Objection to Claim).
350
10/09/2015
Trustee Objection to Claim 24 and Notice of Deadline to Respond with Certificate of Service filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA Objections/Responses due by 10/23/2015.
351
10/09/2015
Trustee Objection to Claim 128 and Notice of Deadline to Respond with Certificate of Service filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA Objections/Responses due by 10/23/2015.
352
10/09/2015
Trustee Objection to Claim 134 and Notice of Deadline to Respond with Certificate of Service filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA Objections/Responses due by 10/23/2015.
353
10/09/2015
Trustee Objection to Claim 136 and Notice of Deadline to Respond with Certificate of Service filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA Objections/Responses due by 10/23/2015.
354
10/09/2015
Amended Trustee Objection to Claim 136 and Notice of Deadline to Respond with Certificate of Service filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA Objections/Responses due by 10/23/2015.
355
10/09/2015
Certificate of Service filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA. (related document(s) 350 Trustee Objection to Claim)
356
10/07/2015
BNC Certificate of Notice (related document(s) 345 Notice of Entry of Judgment/Order)
357
10/07/2015
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document (related document(s) 345 Notice of Entry of Judgment/Order)
358
11/05/2015
Motion to Allow Claims filed by DAVID D. CLEARY of GREENBERG TRAURIG on behalf of MKM OPPORTUNITY MASTER FUND, LTD.
1
Exhibit A #
2
Exhibit B #
3
Exhibit C #
4
Exhibit D #
5
Exhibit E
5 Attachments
359
11/05/2015
Response to Trustee's Amended Objection to Claim filed by DAVID D. CLEARY of GREENBERG TRAURIG on behalf of MKM OPPORTUNITY MASTER FUND, LTD. (related document(s) 354 Trustee Objection to Claim).
1
Exhibit A #
2
Exhibit B #
3
Exhibit C #
4
Exhibit D #
5
Exhibit E #
6
Exhibit F
6 Attachments
360
11/05/2015
Notice of Hearing on Motion filed by DAVID D. CLEARY of GREENBERG TRAURIG on behalf of MKM OPPORTUNITY MASTER FUND, LTD. (related document(s) 358 Motion to Allow Claims) Hearing on Motion set for 12/15/2015 at 02:30 PM at 230 N. First Ave., 7th Floor, Courtroom 702, Phoenix, AZ (MCW).
1
Exhibit 1
1 Attachment
361
11/12/2015
First Application for Compensation by Professional Employed by Trustee and for Payment of NON-SURCHAGE Attorney's Fees and Costs for ADAM 1 NACH, Trustee's Attorney, Period: 11/14/2013 to 10/6/2015, Fees:$119,858.00, Expenses: $2,226.39. filed by ADAM 1 NACH.
1
Exhibit A-Billing Statement-Kenactiv Nonsurcharge #
2
Exhibit A-Billing Statement Pt 2-Kenactive Nonsurcharge
2 Attachments
362
11/12/2015
Notice of Bar Date of First Application for Payment of NON-SURCHARGE Attorney's Fees and Costs filed by ADAM 1 NACH of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA (related document(s) 361 Application for Compensation by Professional Employed by Chapter 7 or 11 Trustee).
363
11/12/2015
Certificate of Mailing Notice of First Application for Payment of NON-SURCHARGE Attorney's Fees and Costs filed by ADAM 1 NACH of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA. (related document(s) 362 Notice of Bar Date)
364
11/12/2015
Application for Administrative Expenses for Payment of Special Counsel's Attorney's Fees and Costs and Supporting Affidavit filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA.
365
11/12/2015
Chapter 7 Trustee Notice of Application for Payment of Special Counsel's Attorney's Fees and Costs filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA (related document(s) 364 Application for Administrative Expenses).
366
11/12/2015
Motion to Approve Stipulation to Re-Classify "Coleman-Talley" and Neborsky Claims as General Unsecured and Approve Distribution of Premium to Coleman-Talley Creditors and Neborsky Creditors from Settlement Proceeds filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA.
367
11/12/2015
Chapter 7 Trustee Notice of Application to Approve Stipulation to Re-Classify "Coleman-Talley" and Neborsky Claims as General Unsecured and Approve Distribution of Premium to Coleman-Talley Creditors and Neborsky Creditors from Settlement Proceeds filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA (related document(s) 366 Motion to Approve).
368
11/13/2015
Notice of Hearing on Trustee's Amended Objection to Claim and MKM Opportunity Master Fund, LTD's Response Thereto; Certificate of Service filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA (related document(s) 354 Trustee Objection to Claim, 359 Response) Hearing set for 12/15/2015 at 02:30 PM at 230 N. First Ave., 7th Floor, Courtroom 702, Phoenix, AZ
369
11/13/2015
Notice of Filing of Consent by Coleman-Talley Creditors and Neborsky Creditors to Application to Approve Stipulation to Re-Classify "Coleman-Talley" and Neborsky Claims as General Unsecured and Approve Distribution of Premium to Coleman-Talley Creditors and Neborsky Creditors from Settlement Proceeds filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA (related document(s) 366 Motion to Approve).
370
11/13/2015
Deficiency Memo (related document(s) 365 Chapter 7 Trustee Notice)
371
11/13/2015
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document (related document(s) 367 Chapter 7 Trustee Notice)
372
11/17/2015
Notice of Filing /Notice of Receipt of Funds filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA (related document(s) 344 Order on Motion to Approve Compromise/Settlement).
373
11/18/2015
Final Application for Administrative Expenses to Pay Fees and Costs to Accountant (Bayouth) filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA.
374
11/18/2015
Chapter 7 Trustee Notice of Fourth and Final Application to Pay Fees and Costs to Accountant as an Administrative Expense filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA (related document(s) 373 Application for Administrative Expenses).
375
11/18/2015
Trustee Application for Administrative Expenses for Payment of Fees and Costs to Accountant as an Administrative Expense filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA.
376
11/18/2015
Chapter 7 Trustee Notice of Application for Payment of Fees and Costs to Accountant as an Administrative Expense (Sumpter) filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA (related document(s) 375 Application for Administrative Expenses).
377
11/19/2015
Certificate of Service filed by DAVID D. CLEARY of GREENBERG TRAURIG on behalf of MKM OPPORTUNITY MASTER FUND, LTD. (related document(s) 358 Motion to Allow Claims, 359 Response, 360 Notice of Hearing on Motion)
378
11/19/2015
Certificate of Service filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA. (related document(s) 365 Chapter 7 Trustee Notice)
379
11/19/2015
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document (related document(s) 374 Chapter 7 Trustee Notice)
380
11/19/2015
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document (related document(s) 376 Chapter 7 Trustee Notice)
381
12/04/2015
Certificate of Service and No Objections filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA. (related document(s) 350 Trustee Objection to Claim)
382
12/04/2015
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order Sustaining Objection to Claim #24 filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA (related document(s) 350 Trustee Objection to Claim).
383
12/04/2015
Certificate of Service and No Objections filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA. (related document(s) 348 Trustee Objection to Claim)
384
12/04/2015
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order Sustaining Objection to Claim #6 filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA (related document(s) 348 Trustee Objection to Claim).
385
12/04/2015
Certificate of Service and No Objections filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA. (related document(s) 347 Trustee Objection to Claim)
386
12/04/2015
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order Sustaining Objection to Claim #5 filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA (related document(s) 347 Trustee Objection to Claim).
387
12/04/2015
Certificate of Service and No Objections filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA. (related document(s) 346 Trustee Objection to Claim)
388
12/04/2015
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order Sustaining Objection to Claim #1 filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA (related document(s) 346 Trustee Objection to Claim).
389
12/04/2015
Certificate of Service and No Objections filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA. (related document(s) 352 Trustee Objection to Claim)
390
12/04/2015
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order Sustaining Objection to Claim #134 filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA (related document(s) 352 Trustee Objection to Claim).
391
12/04/2015
Certificate of Service and No Objections filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA. (related document(s) 351 Trustee Objection to Claim)
392
12/04/2015
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order Sustaining Objection to Claim #128 filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA (related document(s) 351 Trustee Objection to Claim).
393
12/07/2015
Trustee Objection to Claim 10 and Notice of Deadline to Respond with Certificate of Service filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA.
394
12/07/2015
Trustee Objection to Claim 26 and Notice of Deadline to Respond with Certificate of Service filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA Objections/Responses due by 12/21/2015.
395
12/07/2015
Trustee Objection to Claim 23 and Notice of Deadline to Respond with Certificate of Service filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA Objections/Responses due by 12/21/2015.
396
12/07/2015
ORDER Ruling on Objection to Claim 24 signed on 12/7/2015 (related document(s) 350 Trustee Objection to Claim).
397
12/07/2015
ORDER Ruling on Objection to Claim 128 signed on 12/7/2015 (related document(s) 351 Trustee Objection to Claim).
398
12/07/2015
ORDER Ruling on Objection to Claim 1 signed on 12/7/2015 (related document(s) 346 Trustee Objection to Claim).
399
12/07/2015
ORDER Ruling on Objection to Claim 5 signed on 12/7/2015 (related document(s) 347 Trustee Objection to Claim).
400
12/07/2015
ORDER Ruling on Objection to Claim 6 signed on 12/7/2015 (related document(s) 348 Trustee Objection to Claim).
401
12/07/2015
ORDER Ruling on Objection to Claim 134 signed on 12/7/2015 (related document(s) 352 Trustee Objection to Claim).
402
12/14/2015
Trustee Objection to Claim 12 and Notice of Deadline to Respond with Certificate of Service filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA Objections/Responses due by 12/28/2015.
403
12/14/2015
Trustee Objection to Claim 13 and Notice of Deadline to Respond with Certificate of Service filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA Objections/Responses due by 12/28/2015.
404
12/14/2015
Trustee Objection to Claim 14 and Notice of Deadline to Respond with Certificate of Service filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA Objections/Responses due by 12/28/2015.
405
12/14/2015
Trustee Objection to Claim 15 and Notice of Deadline to Respond with Certificate of Service filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA Objections/Responses due by 12/28/2015.
406
12/14/2015
Trustee Objection to Claim 118 and Notice of Deadline to Respond with Certificate of Service filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA Objections/Responses due by 12/28/2015.
407
12/14/2015
Trustee Objection to Claim 120 and Notice of Deadline to Respond with Certificate of Service filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA Objections/Responses due by 12/28/2015.
408
12/14/2015
Trustee Objection to Claim 121 and Notice of Deadline to Respond with Certificate of Service filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA Objections/Responses due by 12/28/2015.
409
12/14/2015
Trustee Objection to Claim 36 and Notice of Deadline to Respond with Certificate of Service filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA Objections/Responses due by 12/28/2015.
410
12/14/2015
Trustee Objection to Claim 60 and Notice of Deadline to Respond with Certificate of Service filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA Objections/Responses due by 12/28/2015.
411
12/15/2015
Certificate of Service and No Objections filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA. (related document(s) 364 Application for Administrative Expenses)
412
12/15/2015
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order Approving Trustee's Applikcation for Payment of Special Counsel's Attorney's Fees and Costs filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA (related document(s) 364 Application for Administrative Expenses).
413
12/15/2015
ORDER Granting Application for Administrative Expenses (Related Doc # 364) signed on 12/15/2015.
414
12/15/2015
Minutes of Hearing held on: 12/15/2015 Subject: MKM'S MOTION FOR ORDER: (I) FINDING THAT MKM OPPORTUNITY MASTER FUND, LTD. ASSERTED INFORMAL PROOF OF CLAIM SUBJECT TO AMENDMENT; OR (II) ALLOWING LATE FILED PROOF OF CLAIM AND TRUSTEE'S AMENDED OBJECTION TO CLAIM #136 AND RESPONSE THERETO. (vCal Hearing ID (1319825)). (related document(s) 354, 358)
415
12/16/2015
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order /Stipulated Order [MKM Opportunity Fund Claim] filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA (related document(s) 354 Trustee Objection to Claim, 358 Motion to Allow Claims).
416
12/16/2015
Notice of Withdrawal of Local Counsel to Coleman Talley LLP and Request to be Removed from Electronic Notifications filed by STEVEN D NEMECEK of STEVE BROWN & ASSOCIATES LLC on behalf of Debora J. Abbott-Nuckolls, Hugh W. Baldwin, Charlie Battle, Christine N. Beck, James L. Beck, Erna M. Carnine, John G. Carnine, Bill Castle, Bob Castle, Judy Castle, Marilyn C. Coyne, Natalie Cenovia Cummins, Letitia E. Dolan, James D. Fountain Jr., John Christopher Fountain, Mary Ann Fountain, David Freker, Sue S. Garcia, Vicki A. Giles, Irving D. Gregersen, Laura S. Griffiths, Mark Griner, Twalla Haley, Deanne A. Klages, Donald N. Klages, John Klobas, Fredi Kronenberg, Honey Kronenberg, Barbara A. Langendorf, Kenneth E. Langendorf, Abigail Langham, E. James Langham, Rita M. Lukens, Rosalie Hays Miller, Joanne E. Murphy, Virginia V. Neville, Alan L. Nuckolls, Marjorie J. Reid, Joseph E. Rill, Ruth I. Rill, Paula K. Rogers, John V. Russo, Chris M. Sentovich, Delores Sentovich, Roopal Shah, Joanne Stephens, John P. Sullivan, Bruce A. Sutter, Elisabeth O. Sutter, Allen Taylor, George Tchobanoglous, Rosemary A. Tchobanoglous, Dana M. Vega, Muriel A. Vollum.
417
12/16/2015
ORDER Ruling on Objection to Claim 136 signed on 12/16/2015 (related document(s) 354 Trustee Objection to Claim). Modified on 12/17/2015 to link to claim
418
12/17/2015
Certificate of Service and No Objections filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA. (related document(s) 367 Chapter 7 Trustee Notice)
419
12/17/2015
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order Approving Application to Approve Stipulation to Re-Classify "Coleman-Talley" and Neborsky Claims as General Unsecured and Approve Distribution of Premium to Coleman-Talley Creditors and Neborsky Creditors from Settlement Proceeds filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA (related document(s) 366 Motion to Approve).
420
12/17/2015
ENTERED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY - INCORRECT JUDGE'S INITIALS - Certificate of Service and No Objections filed by ADAM 1 NACH of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA. (related document(s) 361 Application for Compensation by Professional Employed by Chapter 7 or 11 Trustee) Modified on 12/18/2015
421
12/17/2015
ENTERED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY - INCORRECT JUDGE'S INITIALS - Notice of Lodging Proposed Order Approving First Application and Authorizing Payment of Non-Surcharge Attorney's Fees and Costs filed by ADAM 1 NACH of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA (related document(s) 361 Application for Compensation by Professional Employed by Chapter 7 or 11 Trustee). Modified on 12/18/2015
422
12/18/2015
Certificate of Service and No Objections filed by ADAM 1 NACH of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA. (related document(s) 361 Application for Compensation by Professional Employed by Chapter 7 or 11 Trustee)
423
12/18/2015
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order Approving First Application and Authorizing Payment of Non-Surcharge Attorney's Fees and Costs filed by ADAM 1 NACH of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA (related document(s) 361 Application for Compensation by Professional Employed by Chapter 7 or 11 Trustee).
424
12/18/2015
Trustee Objection to Claim 126 and Notice of Deadline to Respond with Certificate of Service filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA Objections/Responses due by 1/4/2016.
425
12/18/2015
Trustee Objection to Claim 123 and Notice of Deadline to Respond with Certificate of Service filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA Objections/Responses due by 1/4/2016.
426
12/18/2015
Amended Trustee Objection to Claim 60 and Notice of Deadline to Respond with Certificate of Service (Amended to identify claim) filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA Objections/Responses due by 1/4/2016.
427
12/18/2015
Certificate of Service and No Objections filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA. (related document(s) 374 Chapter 7 Trustee Notice)
428
12/18/2015
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order Approving Fourth and Final Application and Authorizing Payment of Fees to Philip Bayouth of Levinson, Smith & Huffman, P.C. as an Administrative Expense filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA (related document(s) 373 Application for Administrative Expenses).
429
12/18/2015
ORDER Granting Application for Compensation by Professional Employed by Trustee (Related Doc # 361) for ADAM 1 NACH, Fees Awarded: $119858.00, Expenses Awarded: $2226.39 signed on 12/18/2015.
430
12/18/2015
ORDER Granting Motion to Approve (Related Doc # 366) signed on 12/18/2015.
431
12/15/2015
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 12/15/2015 02:30 PM ]. File Size [ 2,399 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:05:07 ]. (vCal Hearing ID (1319825)).
432
12/21/2015
Trustee Objection to Claim 129 and Notice of Deadline to Respond with Certificate of Service filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA Objections/Responses due by 1/4/2016.
433
12/21/2015
Trustee Objection to Claim 130 and Notice of Deadline to Respond with Certificate of Service filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA Objections/Responses due by 1/4/2016.
434
12/21/2015
Trustee Objection to Claim 131 and Notice of Deadline to Respond with Certificate of Service filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA Objections/Responses due by 1/4/2016.
435
12/21/2015
Trustee Objection to Claim 132 and Notice of Deadline to Respond with Certificate of Service filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA Objections/Responses due by 1/4/2016.
436
12/21/2015
Trustee Objection to Claim 133 and Notice of Deadline to Respond with Certificate of Service filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA Objections/Responses due by 1/4/2016.
437
12/21/2015
ORDER Allowing Fees and Expenses for PHILIP BAYOUTH, Accountant, Fees Awarded: $1365.00, Expenses Awarded: $23.00; Awarded on 12/22/2015 signed on 12/21/2015.
438
12/22/2015
Certificate of Service and No Objections filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA. (related document(s) 376 Chapter 7 Trustee Notice)
439
12/22/2015
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order Approving Trustee's Application and Authorizing Payment of Accountant's Fees as an Administrative Expense filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA (related document(s) 375 Application for Administrative Expenses).
440
12/23/2015
ORDER Allowing Fees and Expenses for JEFFREY SUMPTER, Accountant, Period: 12/23/2013 to 10/12/2015, Fees Awarded: $50000.00 Awarded on 12/24/2015 signed on 12/23/2015.
441
12/24/2015
Trustee Motion to Authorize Third Interim Distribution from Estate filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA.
442
12/24/2015
Chapter 7 Trustee Notice of Trustee's Application for Authority to Make Third Interim Distribution from Estate filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA (related document(s) 441 Motion to Authorize).
443
12/28/2015
Notice of Filing "Request to be Removed from ECF Notifications" filed by JENNIFER HADLEY DIOGUARDI of SNELL & WILMER on behalf of Christopher E. Galvin, David Querciagrossa, Michael J. Sinnwell, Jr.
444
12/29/2015
Trustee Objection to Claim 127 and Notice of Deadline to Respond with Certificate of Service filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA Objections/Responses due by 1/12/2016.
445
12/28/2015
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document (related document(s) 442 Chapter 7 Trustee Notice)
446
01/20/2016
Certificate of Service and No Objections filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA. (related document(s) 402 Trustee Objection to Claim)
447
01/20/2016
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order Sustaining Objection to Claim filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA (related document(s) 402 Trustee Objection to Claim).
448
01/20/2016
Certificate of Service and No Objections filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA. (related document(s) 403 Trustee Objection to Claim)
449
01/20/2016
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order Sustaining Objection to Claim filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA (related document(s) 403 Trustee Objection to Claim).
450
01/20/2016
Certificate of Service and No Objections filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA. (related document(s) 404 Trustee Objection to Claim)
451
01/20/2016
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order Sustaining Objection to Claim filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA (related document(s) 404 Trustee Objection to Claim).
452
01/20/2016
Certificate of Service and No Objections filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA. (related document(s) 405 Trustee Objection to Claim)
453
01/20/2016
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order Sustaining Objection to Claim filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA (related document(s) 405 Trustee Objection to Claim).
454
01/20/2016
Certificate of Service and No Objections filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA. (related document(s) 409 Trustee Objection to Claim)
455
01/20/2016
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order Sustaining Objection to Claim filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA (related document(s) 409 Trustee Objection to Claim).
456
01/20/2016
Certificate of Service and No Objections filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA. (related document(s) 406 Trustee Objection to Claim)
457
01/20/2016
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order Sustaining Objection to Claim filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA (related document(s) 406 Trustee Objection to Claim).
458
01/20/2016
Certificate of Service and No Objections filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA. (related document(s) 407 Trustee Objection to Claim)
459
01/20/2016
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order Sustaining Objection to Claim filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA (related document(s) 407 Trustee Objection to Claim).
460
01/20/2016
Certificate of Service and No Objections filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA. (related document(s) 408 Trustee Objection to Claim)
461
01/20/2016
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order Sustaining Objection to Claim filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA (related document(s) 408 Trustee Objection to Claim).
462
01/20/2016
Certificate of Service and No Objections filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA. (related document(s) 393 Trustee Objection to Claim)
463
01/20/2016
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order Sustaining Objection to Claim filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA (related document(s) 393 Trustee Objection to Claim).
464
01/20/2016
Trustee Motion to Authorize Payment of Fees Related to Storage of Records filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA.
465
01/20/2016
Certificate of Service and No Objections filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA. (related document(s) 394 Trustee Objection to Claim)
466
01/20/2016
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order Approving Trustee's Application to Authorize Payment of Fees Related to Storage of Records filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA (related document(s) 464 Motion to Authorize).
467
01/20/2016
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order Sustaining Objection to Claim filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA (related document(s) 394 Trustee Objection to Claim).
468
01/20/2016
Certificate of Service and No Objections filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA. (related document(s) 425 Trustee Objection to Claim)
469
01/20/2016
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order Sustaining Objection to Claim filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA (related document(s) 425 Trustee Objection to Claim).
470
01/20/2016
Certificate of Service and No Objections filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA. (related document(s) 424 Trustee Objection to Claim)
471
01/20/2016
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order Sustaining Objection to Claim filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA (related document(s) 424 Trustee Objection to Claim).
472
01/20/2016
ORDER Granting Motion to Authorize (Related Doc # 464) signed on 1/20/2016.
473
01/22/2016
ORDER Ruling on Objection to Claim 12 signed on 1/22/2016 (related document(s) 402 Trustee Objection to Claim).
474
01/22/2016
ORDER Ruling on Objection to Claim 13 signed on 1/22/2016 (related document(s) 403 Trustee Objection to Claim).
475
01/22/2016
ORDER Ruling on Objection to Claim 14 signed on 1/22/2016 (related document(s) 404 Trustee Objection to Claim).
476
01/22/2016
ORDER Ruling on Objection to Claim 15 signed on 1/22/2016 (related document(s) 405 Trustee Objection to Claim).
477
01/22/2016
ORDER Ruling on Objection to Claim 36 signed on 1/22/2016 (related document(s) 409 Trustee Objection to Claim).
478
01/22/2016
ORDER Ruling on Objection to Claim 118 signed on 1/22/2016 (related document(s) 406 Trustee Objection to Claim).
479
01/22/2016
ORDER Ruling on Objection to Claim 120 signed on 1/22/2016 (related document(s) 407 Trustee Objection to Claim).
480
01/22/2016
ORDER Ruling on Objection to Claim 121 signed on 1/22/2016 (related document(s) 408 Trustee Objection to Claim).
481
01/22/2016
ORDER Ruling on Objection to Claim 10 signed on 1/22/2016 (related document(s) 393 Trustee Objection to Claim).
482
01/22/2016
ORDER Ruling on Objection to Claim 26 signed on 1/22/2016 (related document(s) 394 Trustee Objection to Claim).
483
01/22/2016
ORDER Ruling on Objection to Claim 123 signed on 1/22/2016 (related document(s) 425 Trustee Objection to Claim).
484
01/22/2016
ORDER Ruling on Objection to Claim 126 signed on 1/22/2016 (related document(s) 424 Trustee Objection to Claim).
485
01/26/2016
Certificate of Service and No Objections filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA. (related document(s) 444 Trustee Objection to Claim)
486
01/26/2016
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order Sustaining Objection to Claim #127 filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA (related document(s) 444 Trustee Objection to Claim).
487
01/26/2016
Certificate of Service and No Objections filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA. (related document(s) 436 Trustee Objection to Claim)
488
01/26/2016
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order Sustaining Objection to Claim #133 filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA (related document(s) 436 Trustee Objection to Claim).
489
01/26/2016
Certificate of Service and No Objections filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA. (related document(s) 435 Trustee Objection to Claim)
490
01/26/2016
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order Sustaining Objection to Claim #132 filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA (related document(s) 435 Trustee Objection to Claim).
491
01/26/2016
Certificate of Service and No Objections filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA. (related document(s) 434 Trustee Objection to Claim)
492
01/26/2016
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order Sustaining Objection to Claim #131 filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA (related document(s) 434 Trustee Objection to Claim).
493
01/26/2016
Certificate of Service and No Objections filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA. (related document(s) 433 Trustee Objection to Claim)
494
01/26/2016
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order Sustaining Objection to Claim #130 filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA (related document(s) 433 Trustee Objection to Claim).
495
01/26/2016
Certificate of Service and No Objections filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA. (related document(s) 432 Trustee Objection to Claim)
496
01/26/2016
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order Sustaining Objection to Claim #129 filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA (related document(s) 432 Trustee Objection to Claim).
497
01/26/2016
Certificate of Service and No Objections filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA. (related document(s) 426 Trustee Objection to Claim)
498
01/26/2016
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order Sustaining Amended Objection to Claim #60 filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA (related document(s) 354 Trustee Objection to Claim).
499
01/27/2016
Certificate of Service and No Objections filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA. (related document(s) 442 Chapter 7 Trustee Notice)
500
01/27/2016
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order Approving Trustee's Application for Authority to Make Third Interim Distribution from Estate filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA (related document(s) 441 Motion to Authorize).
501
01/27/2016
ORDER Ruling on Objection to Claim 127 signed on 1/27/2016 (related document(s) 444 Trustee Objection to Claim).
502
01/27/2016
ORDER Ruling on Objection to Claim 133 signed on 1/27/2016 (related document(s) 436 Trustee Objection to Claim).
503
01/27/2016
ORDER Ruling on Objection to Claim 132 signed on 1/27/2016 (related document(s) 435 Trustee Objection to Claim).
504
01/27/2016
ORDER Ruling on Objection to Claim 131 signed on 1/27/2016 (related document(s) 434 Trustee Objection to Claim).
505
01/27/2016
ORDER Ruling on Objection to Claim 130 signed on 1/27/2016 (related document(s) 130 Notice of Bar Date). Related document(s) 433 Trustee Objection to Claim filed by Trustee S. WILLIAM MANERA. Modified on 1/28/2016
506
01/27/2016
ORDER Ruling on Objection to Claim 129 signed on 1/27/2016 (related document(s) 432 Trustee Objection to Claim).
507
01/27/2016
ORDER Ruling on Objection to Claim 60 signed on 1/27/2016 (related document(s) 426 Trustee Objection to Claim).
508
01/29/2016
Notice of Filing Request to be Removed from ECF Notifications filed by TIMOTHY M. STRONG of STEPTOE & JOHNSON LLP on behalf of Billy Styles.
509
01/28/2016
ORDER Allowing Fees and Expenses for S. WILLIAM MANERA, Trustee Chapter 7, Fees Awarded: $22847.70, Awarded on 1/29/2016 signed on 1/28/2016. Related document(s) 441 Trustee Motion to Authorize Third Interim Distribution from Estate filed by Trustee S. WILLIAM MANERA. Modified on 1/29/2016
510
02/16/2016
Certificate of Service and No Objections [Objection to Claim #23 - First Trust of Onaga FTB] filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA. (related document(s) 395 Trustee Objection to Claim)
511
02/16/2016
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order Sustaining Trustee's Objection to Claim #23 by First Trust of Onaga FTB filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA (related document(s) 395 Trustee Objection to Claim).
512
02/20/2016
ORDER Ruling on Objection to Claim 23 signed on 2/20/2016 (related document(s) 395 Trustee Objection to Claim).
513
02/22/2016
Trustee Motion to Authorize 1) Secure Destruction of Records and 2) Payment of Additional Fees for Secure Destruction of Computer Hard Drives filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA.
514
02/22/2016
Chapter 7 Trustee Notice of Trustee's Motion to Authorize 1) Secure Destruction of Records and 2) Payment of Additional Fees for Secure Destruction of Computer Hard Drives and of Deadline to Object filed by LISA PERRY BANEN of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA (related document(s) 513 Motion to Authorize).
515
02/22/2016
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document (related document(s) 514 Chapter 7 Trustee Notice)
516
03/22/2016
Certificate of Service and No Objections filed by ADAM B. NACH of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA. (related document(s) 513 Motion to Authorize)
517
03/22/2016
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order Granting Trustee's Motion to Authorize 1) Secure Destruction of Records and 2) Payment of Additional Fees for Secure Destruction of Computer Hard Drives filed by ADAM B. NACH of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA (related document(s) 513 Motion to Authorize).
518
03/22/2016
ORDER Granting Motion to Authorize (Related Doc # 513) signed on 3/22/2016.
519
03/25/2016
Application for Compensation by Professional Employed by Trustee / Second and Final Application for Payment of Non-Surcharge Attorney's Fees and Costs and Request for Noticing Through Trustee's Final Report for ADAM 1 NACH, Trustee's Attorney, Period: 10/7/2015 to 3/24/2016, Fees:$26,030.75, Expenses: $1,581.41. filed by ADAM 1 NACH.
1
Exhibit A-Billing Statement-Kenactiv Nonsurcharge2
1 Attachment
520
05/04/2016
Trustee Notice to Abandon Property of the Bankruptcy Estate filed by ADAM 1 NACH of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA.
521
05/04/2016
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document (related document(s) 520 Trustee Notice to Abandon Property)
522
05/25/2016
Trustee Application for Compensation for S. WILLIAM MANERA, Trustee Chapter 7, Period: 10/31/2013 to 5/25/2016, Fees:$6,897.30, Expenses: $1,000.00. filed by S. WILLIAM MANERA.(MANERA, S.)
523
06/20/2016
NOTICE OF DEATH AND REQUEST FOR NOTICE filed by Aaron Williams (related document(s) 393 Trustee Objection to Claim). Modified on 6/21/2016
524
08/05/2016
Trustee Motion to Authorize Closing Interpleader Adversary Case No. 2:15-ap-00128-MCW filed by ADAM 1 NACH of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA.
525
08/05/2016
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order Granting Motion to Close Interpleader Adversary Case No. 2:15-ap-00128-MCW filed by ADAM 1 NACH of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA (related document(s) 524 Motion to Authorize).
526
08/12/2016
ORDER Granting Motion to Authorize Close Interpleader Adversary (Related Doc # 524) signed on 8/12/2016.
527
08/19/2016
Trustee Chapter 7 Final Report and Account.
528
08/19/2016
Notice of Trustee's Final Report and Applications for Compensation.
529
08/19/2016
The United States Trustee has reviewed the Chapter 7 Trustee's Final Report, Application for Compensation and Application(s) for Compensation of Professionals. Filed by the U.S Trustee's Office.
530
08/19/2016
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document (related document(s) 528 Notice of Trustee's Final Report and Applications for Compensation (batch))
531
09/07/2016
Change of Address for Creditor(s): LETITIA E. DOLAN.
532
12/22/2016
Amended Trustee Proposed Distribution filed by S. WILLIAM MANERA on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA.(MANERA, S.)
533
12/22/2016
Chapter 7 Trustee Notice of Amended Proposed Distribution filed by S. WILLIAM MANERA on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA.(MANERA, S.)
534
12/23/2016
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document (related document(s) 533 Chapter 7 Trustee Notice)
535
01/18/2017
Trustee Report of No Objection filed by S. WILLIAM MANERA on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA.(MANERA, S.)
536
01/18/2017
Trustee Notice of Lodging Proposed Order filed by S. WILLIAM MANERA on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA.(MANERA, S.)
537
01/18/2017
ORDER Granting Application for Compensation by Professional Employed by Trustee (Related Doc 519) for ADAM 1 NACH, Fees Awarded: $26030.75, Expenses Awarded: $1581.41, Granting Trustee Application for Compensation (Related Doc 522) for S. WILLIAM MANERA, Fees Awarded: $6897.30, Expenses Awarded: $1000.00 signed on 1/18/2017. Modified on 1/19/2017
538
01/24/2017
Trustee Application to Pay Unclaimed Funds or Dividends to the Court filed by S. WILLIAM MANERA on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA.(MANERA, S.)
539
01/24/2017
Trustee Notice of Lodging Proposed Order filed by S. WILLIAM MANERA on behalf of S. WILLIAM MANERA.(MANERA, S.)
01/25/2017
Receipt for Unclaimed Funds - $1.18 from S WILLIAM MANERA. Receipt Number 20086852. (Text entry; no document attached.)
540
01/26/2017
ORDER to Pay Unclaimed Funds to Court signed on 1/26/2017 (related document(s) 538 Trustee Application to Pay Unclaimed Funds or Dividends to the Court).
541
10/27/2017
Trustee's Report of Final Account and Distribution Report and Application to be Discharged.
542
10/27/2017
The United States Trustee has reviewed the Chapter 7 Trustee's Final Report, Certification that the Estate has been Fully Administered and Application of Trustee to be Discharged. The United States Trustee does not object to the relief requested. Filed by the U.S Trustee's Office.
543
10/30/2017
The estate having been fully administered, further administration of the reopened case having been completed, or the case reopened for the filing of further proceedings which either have been filed and no further court action is required or were not filed within 90 days of the reopening; IT IS ORDERED that the case is closed and if a trustee has been appointed, the trustee is discharged from and relieved of his trust. Jurisdiction is retained over any pending adversary(s). Judge Madeleine C. Wanslee
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.