Kaci Lee Bishop
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00225 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
07/17/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (Active Event)
07/17/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
2
07/17/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
3
07/17/2018
Creditor Matrix (Only Use When PDF Image Omitted From Petition - Not An Amended Matrix)
07/17/2018
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/17/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/17/2018
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/17/2018
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
4
07/17/2018
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 13 Individual) (BNC Notice)
5
07/17/2018
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice)
07/18/2018
Notice of Debtors Prior Filings (Active Event) (Text entry; no document attached.)
6
07/17/2018
Meeting of Creditors Ch 13 (BNC Notice)
7
07/18/2018
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)
8
07/19/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
9
07/19/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
10
07/19/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
11
07/20/2018
Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing (With Db Atty) (Chambers Template-BNC Notice) (SA)
12
07/22/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing
13
07/31/2018
Employ (CM41)
14
07/31/2018
Certificate of Service
15
07/31/2018
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor
16
07/31/2018
Notice to Individual Consumer Debtors (Form B201)
17
07/31/2018
Statement Concerning Payment Advices (LBF 38)
18
07/31/2018
Employ
19
07/31/2018
Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 & 207)
20
07/31/2018
Ch 13 Statement of Monthly Income (Form 122C-1)/Calculation of Disposable Income (Form 122C-2)
21
07/31/2018
Schedules A-J
22
07/31/2018
Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN02)
08/01/2018
QC Remark Re: Summary, Stat & Declaration (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/01/2018
Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements) (Text entry; no document attached.)
23
08/01/2018
Declaration About an Individual Debtor's Schedules (Form 106Dec)
08/02/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
24
08/14/2018
Undeliverable Mail
25
08/14/2018
Amended Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN04)
26
08/14/2018
Notice of Confirmation Hearing With Objection Deadline
27
08/14/2018
Certificate of Service
08/15/2018
Update Matrix (Text entry; no document attached.)
28
08/16/2018
Entry of Appearance
08/17/2018
Add Party (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/17/2018
QC Remark (generic) (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/21/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - CH 11, 12 & 13) (Text entry; no document attached.)
30
09/10/2018
Entry of Appearance
31
09/10/2018
Objection / Opposition (Generic - use when specific objection event not listed)
32
09/11/2018
Certification of Domestic Support Payments
33
09/12/2018
Objection to Claim (CM44-COAwith)
34
09/12/2018
Corrective Entry (File Correct Image ONLY - No Changes to Document)
35
09/12/2018
Memorandum in Support
36
09/12/2018
Corrective Entry (File Correct Image ONLY - No Changes to Document)
37
09/12/2018
Proceeding Memo
38
09/17/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
39
10/17/2018
Objection to Confirmation of Plan (CM45-COAwith)
40
10/18/2018
Objection to Confirmation of Plan (CM45-COAwith)
41
10/22/2018
Relief from Co-Debtor Stay (CM03)
42
10/22/2018
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
10/23/2018
Set Court Fees Due (Use When ECF Filer Filed the Event Needing the Fee) (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/23/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/05/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/13/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
43
11/13/2018
Certificate of No Objection
44
11/13/2018
Certificate of Service
45
11/15/2018
Proceeding Memo
46
11/15/2018
Denying Confirmation of Chapter 13 Plan (SA)
47
11/15/2018
Claims (SA)
48
11/16/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
49
11/17/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
11/20/2018
Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines) (Text entry; no document attached.)
50
11/26/2018
Amended Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN04)
51
11/30/2018
Notice of Postpetition Mortgage Fees, Expenses, and Charges (Form 410S2)
52
11/30/2018
Notice of Mortgage Payment Change (Form 410S1)
53
12/08/2018
Notice of Confirmation Hearing With Objection Deadline
54
12/10/2018
Certificate of Service
55
12/11/2018
Relief from Co-Debtor Stay
56
12/11/2018
Relief from Stay (Fee) (CM03)
57
12/11/2018
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
12/11/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.