Karl Robert Hermann
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

1:2018-bk-00378 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
10/30/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)
2
10/30/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
10/30/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/31/2018
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/31/2018
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/01/2018
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/01/2018
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/01/2018
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
5
11/01/2018
Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Individual / Joint) (BNC Notice)
6
11/03/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
7
11/03/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
8
11/03/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
9
11/03/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
10
11/06/2018
Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)
11/07/2018
Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11
11/07/2018
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)
12
11/27/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate
12/01/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - Ch 7 Only) (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/01/2018
Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds (BKTR01) (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.