Karyl Dyan Dyer
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00423 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
12/13/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)
2
12/13/2018
Ch 7 Stmt of Monthly Income Form 122A-1 / Stmt of Exemption Form 122A-1Supp / Means Test Form 122A-2
12/13/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
3
12/13/2018
Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)
4
12/13/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
5
12/13/2018
Statement Concerning Payment Advices (LBF 38)
12/13/2018
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/13/2018
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/14/2018
Notice of Debtors Prior Filings (Active Event) (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/14/2018
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/14/2018
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/14/2018
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/14/2018
Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Individual / Joint) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
9
12/14/2018
Request for Notice by Creditor
10
12/16/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
11
12/16/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
12
12/16/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
13
12/18/2018
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)
01/11/2019
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - Ch 7 Only) (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/11/2019
Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds (BKTR01) (Text entry; no document attached.)
14
01/17/2019
Statement of Intention for Individuals (Form 108)
01/18/2019
Statement of Presumed Abuse (ST1) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
16
01/20/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - USTs Statement of Presumed Abuse
17
02/07/2019
Dismiss Case for Abuse (Under 11 USC 707(b)) (CM13)
18
02/07/2019
Declaration
19
02/07/2019
Hearing
20
02/07/2019
Exhibit To
21
02/08/2019
Certificate of Service
22
02/26/2019
Notice of Requirement RE: Financial Management Course - Ch 7, 11 & 13 (BNC Notice)
23
02/28/2019
Non-Opposition
24
02/28/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
25
02/28/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
26
03/14/2019
Proceeding Memo
27
03/14/2019
Dismiss Case for Abuse Under 11 USC 707(b)
03/14/2019
Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines) (Text entry; no document attached.)
28
03/15/2019
Audio File (Active Event)
29
03/16/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.