Katherine Renay Armon and Nicholas Michael Armon
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00228 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
07/20/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)
2
07/20/2018
Ch 7 Stmt of Monthly Income Form 122A-1 / Stmt of Exemption Form 122A-1Supp / Means Test Form 122A-2
07/20/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
3
07/20/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
4
07/20/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
5
07/20/2018
Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)
6
07/20/2018
Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)
7
07/20/2018
Statement Concerning Payment Advices (LBF 38)
07/20/2018
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/20/2018
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/20/2018
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
8
07/20/2018
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7) (BNC Notice)
9
07/20/2018
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice)
10
07/20/2018
Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Individual / Joint) (BNC Notice)
11
07/21/2018
Request for Notice by Creditor
12
07/22/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
13
07/22/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
14
07/22/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
15
07/23/2018
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)
16
08/10/2018
Amended Schedules A/B C G H I J (no fee)
17
08/10/2018
Amended Schedules D E/F (Fee)
08/10/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
18
08/10/2018
Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 & 207)
19
08/22/2018
Reaffirmation Agreement (Pro Se - No Atty Signature) (BKRA02)
20
08/24/2018
Notice of Reaffirmation Hearing (Chambers Template-BNC Notice)
21
08/26/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
22
09/12/2018
Proceeding Memo
23
09/12/2018
Regarding Reaffirmation Agreement (CM37-COAfter) (SA)
09/14/2018
Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines) (Text entry; no document attached.)
24
09/14/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
25
09/17/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
26
10/09/2018
Notice of Requirement RE: Financial Management Course - Ch 7, 11 & 13 (BNC Notice)
27
10/11/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
28
10/11/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
29
10/20/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate
30
10/20/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate
31
10/22/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate
32
10/22/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate
33
10/23/2018
Discharging Debtor(s) (SA) (BNC Notice)
34
10/25/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order of Discharge

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.