Kathleen Jane Huggins
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00146 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
06/01/2018
Entry of Appearance
13
06/14/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate
06/15/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors Continued (pro-memo) (Text entry; no document attached.)
14
06/20/2018
Change of Address
06/21/2018
Update Matrix (Text entry; no document attached.)
15
06/27/2018
Generic Motion / Application
16
06/27/2018
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
17
06/27/2018
Certificate of Service
07/19/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/27/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - Ch 7 Only) (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/27/2018
Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds (BKTR01) (Text entry; no document attached.)
18
08/22/2018
Discharging Debtor(s) (SA) (BNC Notice)
19
08/24/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order of Discharge
08/27/2018
Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case (Text entry; no document attached.)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.