Katrina Morningstar Schauer
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

4:2018-bk-00165 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/30/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)
doc
05/31/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
doc
05/31/2018
Waive Chapter 7 Filing Fee (Form 103B) (BKM01)
05/31/2018
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/31/2018
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
doc
05/31/2018
Waive Filing Fee (BKO01)
05/31/2018
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
doc
05/31/2018
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7) (BNC Notice)
doc
05/31/2018
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice)
doc
05/31/2018
Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Individual / Joint) (BNC Notice)
05/31/2018
Document Served Conventionally (Notes Service Through the Mail) (Text entry; no document attached.)
doc
06/02/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
doc
06/02/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
doc
06/02/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
doc
06/02/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
doc
06/02/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
07/03/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors Continued (pro-memo) (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/13/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - Ch 7 Only) (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/13/2018
Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds (BKTR01) (Text entry; no document attached.)
13
08/20/2018
Notice of Requirement RE: Financial Management Course - Ch 7, 11 & 13 (BNC Notice)
14
08/22/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
15
08/22/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
16
08/27/2018
Notice of Deferral of Discharge (Reaffs Not Filed) (BNC Notice)
17
08/29/2018
Final Notice of Intent to Close Case Without Discharge - Ch 7, 11 & 13 (BNC Notice)
18
08/29/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
19
08/31/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
20
09/10/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate
21
09/10/2018
Letter
22
09/10/2018
Discharging Debtor(s) (SA) (BNC Notice)
23
09/12/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order of Discharge
09/13/2018
Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case (Text entry; no document attached.)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.