Katurah Lynn Humes
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

8:2018-bk-80790 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/21/2018
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
doc
08/28/2018
Notice of Postpetition Mortgage Fees, Expenses, and Charges
47
09/17/2018
Limit Notice
49
09/18/2018
Limit Notice
69
01/25/2019
Dismiss Case - Other
70
01/25/2019
Notice of Hearing - Van002
71
01/28/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.