Kay Ann Cooper
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2019-bk-00078 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
03/13/2019
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)
03/13/2019
Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements) (Text entry; no document attached.)
2
03/13/2019
Waive Chapter 7 Filing Fee (Form 103B) (BKM01)
03/13/2019
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/14/2019
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/14/2019
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/14/2019
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/14/2019
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/14/2019
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/14/2019
Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Individual / Joint) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
6
03/16/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
7
03/16/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
8
03/16/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
9
03/18/2019
Schedule H (Form 106H & 206H)
10
03/18/2019
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
03/18/2019
Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11
03/21/2019
Waive Filing Fee (BKO01)
12
03/23/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
13
03/25/2019
Financial Management Course Certificate
14
03/27/2019
Change of Address
03/27/2019
Update Matrix (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/19/2019
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - Ch 7 Only) (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/19/2019
Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds (BKTR01) (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.