Kayla Achante Brown
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

2:2018-bk-01763 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
23
07/15/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
24
07/29/2018
Amended Chapter 13 Plan
25
07/29/2018
Schedule I
33
09/16/2018
Amended Chapter 13 Plan
34
09/16/2018
Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedules
43
12/09/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
46
01/07/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.