Keating, et al., v. Nordstrom, Inc.
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2017-cv-00030 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
90
06/04/2018
Transcript
91
10/19/2018
Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
92
11/02/2018
Answer to Amended Complaint
93
11/13/2018
Order
94
12/13/2018
Expedite
95
12/13/2018
Expedite
96
12/13/2018
Compel
97
12/13/2018
Compel
98
12/13/2018
Compel
99
12/13/2018
Compel
100
12/13/2018
Compel
101
12/14/2018
Withdraw as Attorney
102
12/14/2018
Affidavit
103
12/14/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
12/17/2018
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney (Text entry; no document attached.)
105
12/19/2018
Order on Motion to Expedite
106
12/27/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
107
12/27/2018
Statement
108
01/07/2019
Reply to Response to Motion
109
01/11/2019
Strike
110
01/28/2019
Response in Opposition to Motion
111
01/28/2019
Response in Opposition to Motion
112
01/30/2019
Expedite
113
01/30/2019
Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
01/31/2019
Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/31/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/31/2019
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
114
01/30/2019
Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
116
01/31/2019
Response in Opposition to Motion
117
02/04/2019
Response in Opposition to Motion
118
02/04/2019
Response in Support of Motion
119
02/06/2019
Reply to Response to Motion
120
02/06/2019
Compel
121
02/19/2019
Order
122
02/20/2019
Response in Opposition to Motion
123
02/27/2019
Reply to Response to Motion
124
02/28/2019
Compel
125
02/28/2019
Compel
126
02/28/2019
Notice (Other)
127
03/06/2019
Compel
128
03/06/2019
Declaration
129
03/11/2019
Continue
130
03/11/2019
Expedite
131
03/11/2019
Declaration
132
03/12/2019
Order on Motion to Expedite
133
03/13/2019
Response in Support of Motion
134
03/14/2019
Response in Opposition to Motion
135
03/14/2019
Order on Motion to Continue
136
03/20/2019
Response in Opposition to Motion
137
03/20/2019
Response in Opposition to Motion
138
03/22/2019
Reply to Response to Motion
139
03/22/2019
Reply to Response to Motion
140
03/27/2019
Reply to Response to Motion
141
04/03/2019
Response to Order
142
04/03/2019
Response to Order
143
04/09/2019
Partial Summary Judgment
144
04/09/2019
Declaration
145
04/09/2019
Declaration
04/10/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/10/2019
Discovery Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/10/2019
~Util - Set Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/12/2019
Discovery Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/12/2019
~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/12/2019
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
148
04/19/2019
Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
149
04/26/2019
Response in Opposition to Motion
150
05/01/2019
Reply to Response to Motion
151
05/01/2019
Seal
152
05/01/2019
Compel
153
05/15/2019
Response in Opposition to Motion
154
05/17/2019
Response in Opposition to Motion
155
05/17/2019
Response in Opposition to Motion
156
05/17/2019
Response in Opposition to Motion
157
05/19/2019
Response in Opposition to Motion

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.