Keehn et al v. Ingram et al
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2017-cv-00220 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
14
05/22/2018
Notice of Change of Address
15
06/19/2018
Extension of Time to File Document
16
06/20/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
17
06/22/2018
Notice of Change of Address
18
06/27/2018
Appoint Counsel
06/29/2018
Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel (Text entry; no document attached.)
20
09/17/2018
Notice of Change of Address
10/15/2018
Clerks Notice (Text entry; no document attached.)
22
10/15/2018
Order
23
10/17/2018
Judgment

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.