Keith A Davis, Jr
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

2:2018-bk-01599 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/24/2018
Meeting of Creditors Held
doc
05/29/2018
Dismiss Case - Other
doc
05/29/2018
Dismiss Case for Failure to File Documents under 521(i)
doc
05/29/2018
Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments
doc
05/29/2018
Trustee Objection to Confirmation of Plan
32
06/18/2018
Amended Chapter 13 Plan
40
06/26/2018
Summary of Assets and Liabilities
57
09/17/2018
Dismissing Debtor(s)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.