Kelly Ann Shanklin
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

4:2019-bk-00025 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
01/28/2019
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (Active Event)
2
01/28/2019
Entry of Appearance
01/28/2019
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/28/2019
Terminate Attorney (Text entry; no document attached.)
3
01/28/2019
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
4
01/28/2019
Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)
01/28/2019
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/28/2019
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/29/2019
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/29/2019
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
5
01/29/2019
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 13 Individual) (BNC Notice)
6
01/29/2019
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice)
7
01/29/2019
Meeting of Creditors Ch 13 (BNC Notice)
8
01/29/2019
Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing (With Db Atty) (Chambers Template-BNC Notice) (SA)
9
01/31/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing
10
01/31/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
11
01/31/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
12
01/31/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
13
01/31/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
14
02/01/2019
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)
15
02/11/2019
Certification of Domestic Support Payments
16
02/11/2019
Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN02)
17
02/11/2019
Notice of Confirmation Hearing With Objection Deadline
18
02/21/2019
Change of Address
02/21/2019
Update Debtor Information (Text entry; no document attached.)
19
02/22/2019
Entry of Appearance
03/06/2019
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - CH 11, 12 & 13) (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/15/2019
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
20
03/22/2019
Chapter 13 Plan Recommendation
21
03/28/2019
Proceeding Memo
22
04/02/2019
Audio File (Active Event)
23
05/02/2019
Proceeding Memo
24
05/03/2019
Audio File (Active Event)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.