Kelly Lenn Nyberg
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00286 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
08/31/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)
2
08/31/2018
Waive Chapter 7 Filing Fee (Form 103B) (BKM01)
3
08/31/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
08/31/2018
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
4
08/31/2018
Waive Filing Fee (BKO01)
08/31/2018
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
5
09/02/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
09/04/2018
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/04/2018
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/04/2018
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/04/2018
Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Individual / Joint) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
13
09/27/2018
Entry of Appearance
14
10/04/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate
10/07/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - Ch 7 Only) (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/07/2018
Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds (BKTR01) (Text entry; no document attached.)
15
10/11/2018
Amended Creditor Matrix AND Amended Schedules (Fee)
10/11/2018
Update Matrix (Text entry; no document attached.)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.