Kelly Michael Kaiser
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00386 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
11/05/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)
11/05/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
2
11/05/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
3
11/05/2018
Schedule J-2 (Form 106J-2)
4
11/05/2018
Statement Concerning Payment Advices (LBF 38)
11/05/2018
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/05/2018
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/06/2018
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/06/2018
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/06/2018
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/06/2018
Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Individual / Joint) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
8
11/06/2018
Request for Notice by Creditor
9
11/08/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
10
11/08/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
11
11/08/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
12
11/19/2018
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)
12/14/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - Ch 7 Only) (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/14/2018
Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds (BKTR01) (Text entry; no document attached.)
13
01/28/2019
Notice of Requirement RE: Financial Management Course - Ch 7, 11 & 13 (BNC Notice)
14
01/29/2019
Financial Management Course Certificate
15
01/30/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
16
01/30/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
17
02/07/2019
Reaffirmation Agreement (With Atty Signature) (BKRA01)
18
02/07/2019
Reaffirmation Agreement (With Atty Signature) (BKRA01)
02/07/2019
Court Remark Regarding Reaffirmation Agreement (Text entry; no document attached.)
19
02/11/2019
Defer Entry of Discharge (Do Not Use to Extend Discharge or Dischargeability Deadline)
20
02/11/2019
Extend Entry of Discharge
21
02/21/2019
Defer Entry of Discharge (Do Not Use to Extend Discharge or Dischargeability Deadline)
22
02/21/2019
Extend Entry of Discharge
23
03/04/2019
Reaffirmation Agreement (With Atty Signature) (BKRA01)
03/08/2019
Court Remark Regarding Real Property Reaffirmation Agreements (Text entry; no document attached.)
24
03/08/2019
Discharging Debtor(s) (SA) (BNC Notice)
25
03/10/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order of Discharge
03/11/2019
Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.