Ken L. King
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

2:2018-bk-01657 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/25/2018
Notice of Hearing - Van002
doc
05/27/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
39
08/01/2018
Amended Chapter 13 Plan
60
09/11/2018
Confirming Chapter 13 Plan
70
02/22/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
74
03/16/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.