Kenneth Alan Larson
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2016-bk-00302 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/23/2018
Employ
05/23/2018
Add Party (Text entry; no document attached.)
doc
06/01/2018
Certificate of Service of Prompt Determination of Tax Liability
62
06/05/2018
Compensation / Professional Fees
63
08/08/2018
Trustees Final Report (TFR)
64
09/13/2018
Notice of Trustees Final Report and Application for Compensation (NFR) (CM43-COAwith)
65
09/13/2018
Certificate of Service
66
10/10/2018
Certificate of No Objection
10/11/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
67
10/22/2018
Approving Final Report Before Distribution (SA)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.