Kenneth E Schacht
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00084 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/31/2018
Proceeding Memo
1
03/20/2018
Chapter 13 Bankruptcy Petition of Kenneth e Schacht
doc
06/01/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
26
06/25/2018
Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments (Hrg Rqd, FRBP2002(a)(4)) (CM12)
27
06/25/2018
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
06/26/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - CH 11, 12 & 13) (Text entry; no document attached.)
28
07/18/2018
Notice of Postpetition Mortgage Fees, Expenses, and Charges (Form 410S2)
29
07/18/2018
Proceeding Memo
30
07/19/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
07/19/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
31
07/20/2018
Notice of Confirmation Hearing With Objection Deadline
32
07/20/2018
Amended Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN04)
33
07/23/2018
Ch 13 Statement of Monthly Income (Form 122C-1)/Calculation of Disposable Income (Form 122C-2)
34
07/23/2018
Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum)
35
08/23/2018
Chapter 13 Plan Recommendation
36
08/29/2018
Withdrawal of Document / Motion
37
08/29/2018
Proceeding Memo
38
08/31/2018
Amended Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN04)
39
09/04/2018
Withdrawal of Document / Motion
40
09/04/2018
Chapter 13 Plan Recommendation
41
09/04/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
42
09/04/2018
Confirming Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN01) (SA)
43
09/05/2018
Notice of Requirement RE: Financial Management Course - Ch 7, 11 & 13 (BNC Notice)
46
03/04/2019
Notice of Mortgage Payment Change (Form 410S1)
47
04/05/2019
Request for Special Notice
48
04/24/2019
Relief from Stay (Fee) (CM03)
49
04/24/2019
Exhibit To
50
04/24/2019
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
51
04/24/2019
Certificate of Service
04/24/2019
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
52
04/25/2019
Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments (Hrg Rqd, FRBP2002(a)(4)) (CM12)
53
04/25/2019
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
54
04/26/2019
Notice of Mortgage Payment Change (Form 410S1)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.