Kenneth Eric Battle
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

2:2017-bk-04587 (alnb)

BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)[32] Order on Objection to Claim(s)). Notice Date 01/24/2018.

United States Bankruptcy Court Northern District of Alabama In re: Case No. 17-04587-DSC Kenneth Eric Battle Chapter 13 Debtor CERTIFICATE OF NOTICE District/off: 1126-2 User: rharless Page 1 of 1 Date Rcvd: Jan 22, 2018 Form ID: pdf000 Total Noticed: 4 Notice by first class mail was sent to the following persons/entities by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center on Jan 24, 2018. db +Kenneth Eric Battle, 2929 Steiner Court SW, Birmingham, AL 35211-3425 9536056 INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, 401 W PEACHTREE STREET NW, ROOM 1665, STOP 334-D, ATLANTA GA 30308 9536070 +US ATTORNEY, NORTHERN DISTRICT OF ALABAMA, 1801 FOURTH AVENUE NORTH, BIRMINGHAM AL 35203-2101 Notice by electronic transmission was sent to the following persons/entities by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center. 9536055 E-mail/Text: cio.bncmail@irs.gov Jan 23 2018 01:41:34 INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, CENTRALIZED INSOLVENCY OPS, PO BOX 7346, PHILADELPHIA PA 19101-7346 TOTAL: 1 ***** BYPASSED RECIPIENTS (undeliverable, * duplicate) ***** 9536057* ++INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, CENTRALIZED INSOLVENCY OPERATIONS, PO BOX 7346, PHILADELPHIA PA 19101-7346 (address filed with court: IRS SPECIAL PROCEDURES STAFF, COLLECTION DIVISION, 801 TOM MARTIN DRIVE STOP 126, BIRMINGHAM AL 35211) TOTALS: 0, * 1, ## 0 Addresses marked '+' were corrected by inserting the ZIP or replacing an incorrect ZIP. USPS regulations require that automation-compatible mail display the correct ZIP. Transmission times for electronic delivery are Eastern Time zone. Addresses marked '++' were redirected to the recipient's preferred mailing address pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 342(f)/Fed.R.Bank.PR.2002(g)(4). I, Joseph Speetjens, declare under the penalty of perjury that I have sent the attached document to the above listed entities in the manner shown, and prepared the Certificate of Notice and that it is true and correct to the best of my information and belief. Meeting of Creditor Notices only (Official Form 309): Pursuant to Fed. R. Bank. P. 2002(a)(1), a notice containing the complete Social Security Number (SSN) of the debtor(s) was furnished to all parties listed. This official court copy contains the redacted SSN as required by the bankruptcy rules and the Judiciary's privacy policies. Date: Jan 24, 2018 Signature: /s/Joseph Speetjens _ CM/ECF NOTICE OF ELECTRONIC FILING The following persons/entities were sent notice through the court's CM/ECF electronic mail (Email) system on January 22, 2018 at the address(es) listed below: Bradford W. Botes on behalf of Debtor Kenneth Eric Battle pn.igotnotices@gmail.com;bbrs.sort@gmail.com;bbrs.igotnotices@gmail.com;bbrs.sort2@gmail.com;aw.i gotnotices@gmail.com;bbrssort4@gmail.com;R62238@notify.bestcase.com;2941120420@filings.docketbird .com Bradford W. Caraway ctmail@ch13bham.com, bhamch13@ecf.epiqsystems.com J. Suzanne Shinn on behalf of Debtor Kenneth Eric Battle pn.igotnotices@gmail.com;bbrs.sort@gmail.com;bbrs.igotnotices@gmail.com;bbrs.sort2@gmail.com;aw.i gotnotices@gmail.com;bbrssort4@gmail.com;R62238@notify.bestcase.com;2941120420@filings.docketbird .com TOTAL: 3 Case 17-04587-DSC13 Doc 33 Filed 01/24/18 Entered 01/25/18 00:13:21 Desc Imaged Certificate of Notice Page 1 of 2 17-04587-DSC13 1 UNITED STATES BANKRUPTCY COURT NORTHERN DISTRICT OF ALABAMA - SOUTHERN DIVISION In the Matter of: Kenneth Eric Battle } Case No: 17-04587-DSC13 SSN: XXX-XX-5966 } DEBTOR(S). } } } ORDER WITHDRAWING This matter was scheduled for a hearing on Tuesday, January 23, 2018 09:30 AM on the following: RE: Doc #18; Debtor's Objection to Claim #3 of Internal Revenue Service in the amount of $25,183.43 It is hereby ORDERED, ADJUDGED and DECREED that: Based on representation of counsel, the Objection to claim number 3 is withdrawn. Dated: 01/22/2018 /s/ D. SIMS CRAWFORD D. SIMS CRAWFORD United States Bankruptcy Judge Case 17-04587-DSC13 Doc 33 Filed 01/24/18 Entered 01/25/18 00:13:21 Desc Imaged Certificate of Notice Page 2 of 2

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 266 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
10/24/2017
Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual. Fee Amount $310 Filed by Kenneth Eric Battle
2
10/24/2017
Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Debtor Kenneth Eric Battle.
4
10/24/2017
Certificate of Credit Counseling for Debtor Filed Filed by Debtor Kenneth Eric Battle.
5
10/24/2017
Employee Income Records Filed by Debtor Kenneth Eric Battle.
10/24/2017
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)(17-04587-13) [misc,volp13] (310.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 21318535. Fee Amount 310.00 (re:Doc# 1) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
6
10/24/2017
Tax Documents for the Year for 2016 Filed by Debtor Kenneth Eric Battle.
7
10/24/2017
Motion to Determine Value of 2013 Nissan Altima S financed by Santander Consumer USA d/b/a Chrysler Capital Filed by Debtor Kenneth Eric Battle
8
10/24/2017
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 12/06/2017 at 09:30 AM at Creditor Meeting Room Birmingham. Confirmation hearing to be held on 01/09/2018 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham. Proof of Claim due by 03/06/2018. Government Proof of Claim due by 04/23/2018 Objection to Dischargeability of Certain Debts due by 02/05/2018.
9
10/25/2017
Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management. (Admin)
10/25/2017
Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings for debtor Kenneth Eric Battle Case Number 94-03566, Chapter 13 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 06/20/1994, Dismissed for Other Reason on 06/30/1995; Case Number 99-00597, Chapter 13 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 01/29/1999, Dismissed for Other Reason on 05/30/2000; Case Number 97-07455, Chapter 13 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 10/03/1997, Dismissed for Other Reason on 01/14/1999; Case Number 00-08064, Chapter 13 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 12/26/2000, Dismissed for Other Reason on 07/31/2001; Case Number 95-04130, Chapter 13 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 07/14/1995, Dismissed for Other Reason on 10/21/1996.(Admin) (Text entry; no document attached.)
10
10/25/2017
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 7 Motion to Determine Value filed by Debtor Kenneth Eric Battle). Hearing scheduled 1/9/2018 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
11
10/26/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 8 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 13)). Notice Date 10/26/2017.
12
10/27/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan filed by Debtor Kenneth Eric Battle). Notice Date 10/27/2017.
13
10/27/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 9 Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management). Notice Date 10/27/2017.
14
10/27/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 10 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 10/27/2017.
15
11/02/2017
Trustee's Direction for Deduction. (Ch13troffice, sf)
16
11/13/2017
Financial Management Course Certificate for Debtor Filed Filed by Debtor Kenneth Eric Battle.
17
12/11/2017
Meeting of Creditors Held 12/6/2017. (Ch13troffice, bc)
18
12/11/2017
Debtor's Objection to Claim # 3 of Internal Revenue Service in the amount of $25,183.43 Filed by Debtor Kenneth Eric Battle. (Shinn, J.)
19
12/12/2017
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 18 Objection to Claim filed by Debtor Kenneth Eric Battle). Hearing scheduled 1/23/2018 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
20
12/13/2017
Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Chapter 13 Plan, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss. (Ch13troffice, km)
21
12/14/2017
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 20 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss). Hearing scheduled 1/9/2018 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
22
12/14/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 19 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 12/14/2017.
23
12/16/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 21 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 12/16/2017.
24
12/20/2017
Order Rescheduling Hearing Signed on 12/20/2017 (RE: related document(s) 7 Motion to Determine Value filed by Debtor Kenneth Eric Battle, 8 Confirmation Hearing, 20 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss). Hearing scheduled 1/16/2018 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
25
12/22/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 24 Order Rescheduling Hearing). Notice Date 12/22/2017.
26
01/16/2018
Order Rescheduling Hearing Confirmation Hearing. Hearing scheduled 02/06/2018 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham
27
01/16/2018
Order Rescheduling Hearing RE: Doc #7; Debtor's Motion to Determine Value of Collateral - 2013 Nissan Altima S - Santander Consumer USA dba Chrysler Capital. Hearing scheduled 02/06/2018 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham
28
01/16/2018
Order Rescheduling Hearing RE: Doc #20; Trustee's Objection to Confirmation and Motion to Dismiss Case. Hearing scheduled 02/06/2018 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham
29
01/18/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 26 Order Rescheduling Hearing). Notice Date 01/18/2018.
30
01/18/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 27 Order Rescheduling Hearing). Notice Date 01/18/2018.
31
01/18/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 28 Order Rescheduling Hearing). Notice Date 01/18/2018.
32
01/22/2018
Order on Objection to Claim(s) 3 Signed on 1/22/2018 (RE: related document(s) 18 Withdrawing Objection to Claim filed by Debtor Kenneth Eric Battle).
33
01/24/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)[32] Order on Objection to Claim(s)). Notice Date 01/24/2018.
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.