Kenneth Ray Bradshaw and Anna Ward Bradshaw
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2019-bk-00059 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
02/26/2019
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (Active Event)
02/26/2019
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/26/2019
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/26/2019
Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements) (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/26/2019
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/26/2019
Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements) (Text entry; no document attached.)
2
02/26/2019
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
3
02/26/2019
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
4
02/26/2019
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor
02/27/2019
Notice of Debtors Prior Filings (Active Event) (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/27/2019
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/27/2019
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 13 Individual) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/27/2019
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/27/2019
Meeting of Creditors Ch 13 (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
8
02/28/2019
Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing (With Db Atty) (Chambers Template-BNC Notice) (SA)
9
02/28/2019
Request for Special Notice
10
03/01/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
11
03/01/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
12
03/01/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
13
03/02/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing
14
03/04/2019
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)
15
03/18/2019
Financial Management Course Certificate
16
03/18/2019
Financial Management Course Certificate
17
03/20/2019
Entry of Appearance
18
03/25/2019
Notice of Hearing on UST Standing Mtn to Dismiss (CM14-COAwith)
19
03/25/2019
Amended Voluntary Petition
20
03/25/2019
Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 & 207)
21
03/25/2019
Ch 13 Statement of Monthly Income (Form 122C-1)/Calculation of Disposable Income (Form 122C-2)
03/25/2019
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/25/2019
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)
22
03/26/2019
Statement Concerning Payment Advices (LBF 38)
23
03/26/2019
Statement Concerning Payment Advices (LBF 38)
24
03/28/2019
Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum and 206Sum)
25
03/28/2019
Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 & 207)
04/02/2019
341 Meeting of Creditors Continued (pro-memo) (Text entry; no document attached.)
26
04/02/2019
Entry of Appearance
27
04/03/2019
Continue / Reschedule Hearing
28
04/04/2019
Continue / Reschedule Hearing
29
04/04/2019
Order (Generic) (SA)
30
04/04/2019
Audio File (Active Event)
31
04/05/2019
Proceeding Memo
32
04/06/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
33
04/06/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
34
04/10/2019
Declaration Regarding Debtor's Schedules (Form 106Dec or Form 202 )
35
04/10/2019
Convert Case From Chapter 13 to Chapter 7 (Fee) (CM11)
04/10/2019
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
36
04/10/2019
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
37
04/10/2019
Certificate of Service
04/14/2019
Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines) (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/01/2019
341 Meeting of Creditors Continued (pro-memo) (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/03/2019
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
38
05/07/2019
Certificate of No Objection
39
05/07/2019
Convert Case From Chapter 13 to Chapter 7 (BKCONV01)
05/07/2019
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/07/2019
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/07/2019
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/07/2019
Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Individual / Joint) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
43
05/07/2019
BR1019 Report of Post Petition Debts
44
05/07/2019
Statement of Intention for Individuals (Form 108)
45
05/07/2019
Ch 7 Stmt of Monthly Income Form 122A-1 / Stmt of Exemption Form 122A-1Supp / Means Test Form 122A-2
46
05/08/2019
Entry of Appearance
47
05/09/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
48
05/09/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
49
05/09/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
50
05/09/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
05/20/2019
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
51
05/22/2019
Relief from Stay (Fee) (CM03)
05/22/2019
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
52
05/22/2019
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
53
05/23/2019
Chapter 13 Trustees Final Report and Account

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.