Kenny Lee Smedly
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00188 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
06/18/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (Active Event)
06/18/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
2
06/18/2018
Ch 13 Statement of Monthly Income (Form 122C-1)/Calculation of Disposable Income (Form 122C-2)
3
06/18/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
4
06/18/2018
Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)
06/18/2018
Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements) (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/18/2018
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/18/2018
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/19/2018
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/19/2018
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 13 Individual) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/19/2018
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/19/2018
Meeting of Creditors Ch 13 (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
8
06/20/2018
Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing (With Db Atty) (Chambers Template-BNC Notice) (SA)
9
06/21/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
10
06/21/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
11
06/21/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
12
06/22/2018
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)
13
06/22/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing
14
07/02/2018
Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN02)
15
07/02/2018
Notice of Confirmation Hearing With Objection Deadline
16
07/20/2018
Certification of Domestic Support Payments
07/24/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - CH 11, 12 & 13) (Text entry; no document attached.)
17
08/15/2018
Chapter 13 Plan Recommendation
18
08/16/2018
Proceeding Memo
08/16/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
19
08/17/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
20
08/23/2018
Entry of Appearance
21
08/30/2018
Proceeding Memo
22
09/04/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
23
09/13/2018
Proceeding Memo
24
09/17/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
25
09/19/2018
Stipulation
26
09/26/2018
Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments (Hrg Rqd, FRBP2002(a)(4)) (CM12)
27
09/26/2018
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
28
09/28/2018
Approving Stipulation (SA)
29
09/30/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
30
10/03/2018
Proceeding Memo
31
10/10/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
32
10/18/2018
Certificate of No Objection
33
10/18/2018
Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments
34
11/07/2018
Notice of Dismissal Without Prejudice (BNC Notice)
35
11/09/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Notice of Dismissal
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.