Kenton David Allen Campbell and Erica Delain Campbell
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2019-bk-00123 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
04/18/2019
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (Active Event)
04/18/2019
Credit Counseling Waiver Requested (109(h)) (Text entry; no document attached.)
2
04/18/2019
Pay Filing Fee in Installments (Form 103A) (BKM01)
3
04/18/2019
Pay Filing Fees in Installments (BKO01)
04/18/2019
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/18/2019
Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements) (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/18/2019
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/19/2019
Notice of Debtors Prior Filings (Active Event) (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/19/2019
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/19/2019
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 13 Individual) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/19/2019
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/19/2019
Meeting of Creditors Ch 13 (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/19/2019
Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements) (Text entry; no document attached.)
7
04/20/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
8
04/21/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
9
04/21/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
10
04/21/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
11
04/26/2019
Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing (Pro Se) (Chambers Template-BNC Notice) (SA)
12
04/28/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
13
04/28/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
14
05/03/2019
Show Cause for Dismissal of Case (with hrg) (CM48-COAfterHrg) (SA)
15
05/03/2019
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
16
05/03/2019
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
17
05/03/2019
Schedules A-J
18
05/03/2019
Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 & 207)
19
05/03/2019
Ch 13 Statement of Monthly Income (Form 122C-1)/Calculation of Disposable Income (Form 122C-2)
20
05/03/2019
Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)
21
05/03/2019
Statement Concerning Payment Advices (LBF 38)
22
05/03/2019
Certification of Domestic Support Payments
23
05/03/2019
Amended Creditor Matrix (Fee)
05/03/2019
Update Matrix (Text entry; no document attached.)
24
05/03/2019
Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN02)
05/03/2019
Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements) (Text entry; no document attached.)
25
05/05/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
26
05/08/2019
Entry of Appearance
27
05/15/2019
Proceeding Memo
28
05/15/2019
Audio File (Active Event)
29
05/15/2019
Order (Generic) (SA)
30
05/17/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
05/20/2019
Receipt of Installment Payment (Use FINAL if this payment will pay off balance) (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/23/2019
Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines) (Text entry; no document attached.)
31
05/23/2019
Financial Management Course Certificate
32
05/23/2019
Financial Management Course Certificate

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.