Kerry L. Hawks and Maria L. Hawks
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2003-bk-01259 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
50
08/01/2018
Employ (CM41)
51
08/13/2018
Compensation / Professional Fees
52
08/31/2018
Compensation / Professional Fees
53
11/08/2018
Employ
54
11/09/2018
Certificate of Service of Prompt Determination of Tax Liability
55
11/10/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
56
11/12/2018
Compensation / Professional Fees
57
12/12/2018
Trustees Final Report (TFR)
58
01/14/2019
Notice of Trustees Final Report and Application for Compensation (NFR) (CM43-COAwith)
59
01/14/2019
Certificate of Service
03/06/2019
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
60
03/12/2019
Certificate of No Objection
61
03/19/2019
Approving Final Report Before Distribution (SA)
03/21/2019
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/05/2019
Receipt (Deferred Fees Only - Will Spread to Claims Register) (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.