Kevin Lee Cotton and Angela Rae Cotton
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00411 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
12/04/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)
2
12/04/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
3
12/04/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
4
12/04/2018
Excepted from Electronic Filing
12/04/2018
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
5
12/04/2018
Generic Notice (NOT to be used if setting a deadline)
6
12/04/2018
Clerks Notice of Fees Due (Not Deferred)
12/04/2018
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/04/2018
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
7
12/04/2018
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7) (BNC Notice)
8
12/04/2018
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice)
12/05/2018
Notice of Debtors Prior Filings (Active Event) (Text entry; no document attached.)
9
12/04/2018
Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Individual / Joint) (BNC Notice)
10
12/04/2018
Order to be Excepted from Electronic Filing
11
12/06/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
12
12/06/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
13
12/06/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
14
12/06/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
15
12/06/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
16
12/07/2018
Declaration
17
12/10/2018
Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)
12/12/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.