Kevin Thomas Duffy and Haley MeLynn Duffy
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

2:2017-bk-04318 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
View docket sheet
Last full docket sheet refresh: 103 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
10/06/2017
Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual. Receipt Number O, Fee Amount $310 Filed by Kevin Thomas Duffy, Haley MeLynn Duffy
2
10/06/2017
Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Joint Debtor Haley MeLynn Duffy, Debtor Kevin Thomas Duffy.
3
10/06/2017
Application to Pay Filing Fee in Installments Through the Chapter 13 Trustee Assigned to the Case Filed by Joint Debtor Haley MeLynn Duffy, Debtor Kevin Thomas Duffy
5
10/06/2017
Certificate of Credit Counseling for Debtor and Joint Debtor Filed Filed by Joint Debtor Haley MeLynn Duffy, Debtor Kevin Thomas Duffy.
6
10/06/2017
Employee Income Records Filed by Joint Debtor Haley MeLynn Duffy, Debtor Kevin Thomas Duffy.
7
10/06/2017
Notice of Intent to Pay Chapter 13 Case Filing Fee through Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Joint Debtor Haley MeLynn Duffy, Debtor Kevin Thomas Duffy.
8
10/06/2017
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 11/15/2017 at 09:30 AM at Creditor Meeting Room Birmingham. Confirmation hearing to be held on 12/05/2017 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham. Proof of Claim due by 02/13/2018. Government Proof of Claim due by 04/04/2018 Objection to Dischargeability of Certain Debts due by 01/16/2018.
9
10/07/2017
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Creditor PRA Receivables Management, LLC.
10
10/07/2017
Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management. (Admin)
11
10/08/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 8 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 13)). Notice Date 10/08/2017.
12
10/10/2017
Order Approving Application for Payment of Filing Fees In Installments: IT IS ORDERED that the Debtor may pay the filing fee in installments as proposed in the application. A discharge shall not be granted until the filing fee has been paid in full. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all installments of the filing fee must be paid in full before the Debtor or Trustee may make further payments to an attorney or any other person who renders services to the Debtor in connection with the case. (Fee Amount $310.00) (RE: related document(s) 3 Application to Pay Filing Fees in Installments filed by Debtor Kevin Thomas Duffy, Joint Debtor Haley MeLynn Duffy).
13
10/11/2017
Amended Order Denying Application for Payment of Filing Fees in Installments: IT IS ORDERED that the Debtor's Application to pay the filing fee in installments is hereby DENIED because 25 percent minimum installment payment within 30 days of petition date not specified. All filing fees in the current case are due and payable. This case will be set for show cause why the case should not be dismissed for failure to pay fees by separate notice of this Court. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the filing fee must be paid in full before the Debtor or Trustee may make further payments to an attorney or any other person who renders services to the Debtor in connection with the case. (Fee Amount $310.00) (Non-Image Order) (RE: related document(s) 3 Application to Pay Filing Fees in Installments filed by Debtor Kevin Thomas Duffy, Joint Debtor Haley MeLynn Duffy).
14
10/12/2017
Amended Application to Pay Filing Fee in Installments Through the Chapter 13 Trustee Assigned to the Case Filed by Joint Debtor Haley MeLynn Duffy, Debtor Kevin Thomas Duffy
15
10/12/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan filed by Debtor Kevin Thomas Duffy, Joint Debtor Haley MeLynn Duffy). Notice Date 10/12/2017.
16
10/12/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 10 Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management). Notice Date 10/12/2017.
17
10/13/2017
Order Approving Amended Application for Payment of Filing Fees In Installments: IT IS ORDERED that the Debtor may pay the filing fee in installments as proposed in the application. A discharge shall not be granted until the filing fee has been paid in full. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all installments of the filing fee must be paid in full before the Debtor or Trustee may make further payments to an attorney or any other person who renders services to the Debtor in connection with the case. (Fee Amount $310.00) (RE: related document(s) 14 Amended Application to Pay Filing Fees in Installments filed by Debtor Kevin Thomas Duffy, Joint Debtor Haley MeLynn Duffy).
18
10/13/2017
Trustee's Direction for Deduction. (Ch13troffice, sf)
19
10/16/2017
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Enslen Crowe Filed by Creditor PennyMac Loan Services, LLC.
20
11/16/2017
Meeting of Creditors Held 11/15/2017. (Ch13troffice, jc)
21
11/17/2017
Trustee Objection to Debtor's Claim of Exemptions. (Ch13troffice, km)
22
11/17/2017
Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Chapter 13 Plan, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss. (Ch13troffice, km)
23
11/17/2017
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 21 Objection to Debtor's Claim of Exemptions, 22 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss). Hearing scheduled 12/5/2017 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
24
11/19/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 23 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 11/19/2017.
25
11/26/2017
Tax Documents for the Year for 2016 Filed by Joint Debtor Haley MeLynn Duffy, Debtor Kevin Thomas Duffy.
26
12/07/2017
Bench Sheet from Confirmation Hearing
27
01/05/2018
Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan; Trustee's Objection to Confirmation and Motion to Dismiss are Withdrawn.; Trustee 's Objection to Claim of Exemptions is sustained and any claim of exemption that exceeds the amount by applicable law is disallowed. Signed on 1/5/2018 (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan filed by Debtor Kevin Thomas Duffy, Joint Debtor Haley MeLynn Duffy, 21 Trustee Objection to Claim of Exemptions 22 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss).
28
01/07/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 27 Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan). Notice Date 01/07/2018.
02/07/2018
Payment of Full Filing Fee. Fee Amount $ 310 Filed by Trustee Bradford W. Caraway. (Ch13troffice, ct) (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/07/2018
Receipt of Payment of Fee(17-04318-DSC13) [misc,feepay] (310.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 21695054. Fee Amount 310.00 (re:Doc# ) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
29
02/07/2018
Case Filing Fee Paid in Full (RE: related document(s) 12 Order to Pay Filing Fees in Installments, 17 Order to Pay Filing Fees in Installments).
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.