Kibby v. Berryhill
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2017-cv-00228 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
25
05/23/2018
Reply to Response to Motion
26
12/28/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
27
12/31/2018
Judgment
28
02/18/2019
Attorney Fees
29
02/18/2019
Declaration
30
02/19/2019
Order on Motion for Attorney Fees
31
03/29/2019
Affidavit
32
03/29/2019
Attorney Fees
33
03/29/2019
Declaration
34
03/29/2019
Order on Motion for Attorney Fees

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.