Kimberley Anne Greenough
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2019-bk-00021 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
01/24/2019
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (Active Event)
2
01/24/2019
Ch 13 Statement of Monthly Income (Form 122C-1)/Calculation of Disposable Income (Form 122C-2)
01/24/2019
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
3
01/24/2019
Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)
4
01/24/2019
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
01/24/2019
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/24/2019
Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements) (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/24/2019
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/24/2019
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/24/2019
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 13 Individual) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/24/2019
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/24/2019
Meeting of Creditors Ch 13 (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
8
01/25/2019
Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing (Pro Se) (Chambers Template-BNC Notice) (SA)
9
01/26/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
10
01/26/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
11
01/26/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
12
01/27/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
13
01/27/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
14
01/31/2019
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)
15
02/05/2019
Amended Schedules A/B C G H I J (no fee)
16
02/12/2019
Request for Special Notice
17
02/14/2019
Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN02)
18
02/14/2019
Notice of Confirmation Hearing With Objection Deadline
19
02/14/2019
Certificate of Service
20
02/14/2019
Amended Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN04)
21
02/14/2019
Notice of Confirmation Hearing With Objection Deadline
22
02/14/2019
Certificate of Service
23
02/14/2019
Continue / Reschedule Hearing
24
02/15/2019
Continue / Reschedule Hearing
02/19/2019
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - CH 11, 12 & 13) (Text entry; no document attached.)
25
02/20/2019
Entry of Appearance
26
03/14/2019
Ch 13 Statement of Monthly Income (Form 122C-1)/Calculation of Disposable Income (Form 122C-2)
03/15/2019
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/19/2019
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
27
03/19/2019
Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum and 206Sum)
28
03/22/2019
Chapter 13 Plan Recommendation
29
03/28/2019
Proceeding Memo
30
04/02/2019
Audio File (Active Event)
31
04/17/2019
Certification of Domestic Support Payments
32
04/17/2019
Denying Confirmation of Chapter 13 Plan (SA)
33
04/18/2019
Proceeding Memo
04/18/2019
Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines) (Text entry; no document attached.)
34
04/19/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
35
04/22/2019
Audio File (Active Event)
36
04/29/2019
Dismiss Case (No Hrg Rqd for Ch 13, Hrg Rqd for Ch 7,11,12 - FRBP2002(a)(4)) (CM15)
37
04/29/2019
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
38
04/29/2019
Certificate of Service

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.