Kimberly Dale Stubbs
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

2:2018-bk-00413 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 248 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
02/01/2018
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Individuals. Fee Amount $335 Filed by Kimberly Dale Stubbs
3
02/01/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling for Debtor Filed by Debtor Kimberly Dale Stubbs.
4
02/01/2018
Employee Income Records Filed by Debtor Kimberly Dale Stubbs.
02/01/2018
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)(18-00413-7) [misc,volp7] (335.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 21672593. Fee Amount 335.00 (re:Doc# 1) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
5
02/01/2018
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 03/05/2018 at 03:00 PM at Creditor Meeting Room Birmingham. Objections for Discharge due by 05/04/2018.
6
02/02/2018
Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management (Admin adiuser)
7
02/02/2018
Order Appointing Trustee. Thomas E Reynolds added to the case. Signed on 2/2/2018.
8
02/03/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 5 Meeting of Creditors (Chapter 7)). Notice Date 02/03/2018.
9
02/04/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 6 Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management). Notice Date 02/04/2018.
10
02/17/2018
Personal Financial Management Course Certificate for Debtor
03/07/2018
Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution: I, Thomas E Reynolds, having been appointed trustee of the estate of the above-named debtor(s), report that I have neither received any property nor paid any money on account of this estate; that I have made a diligent inquiry into the financial affairs of the debtor(s) and the location of the property belonging to the estate; and that there is no property available for distribution from the estate over and above that exempted by law. Unless the Court orders otherwise, I deem abandoned any and all property of the estate that was scheduled in the petition and was unadministered as of the date of this report, and pursuant to Fed R Bank 5009, I hereby certify that the estate of the above-named debtor(s) has been fully administered. I request that I be discharged from any further duties as trustee. Key information about this case as reported in schedules filed by the debtor(s) or otherwise found in the case record: This case was pending for 1 months. Assets Abandoned (without deducting any secured claims): $ 34730.00, Assets Exempt: $ 16925.00, Claims Scheduled: $ 16118.00, Claims Asserted: Not Applicable, Claims scheduled to be discharged without payment (without deducting the value of collateral or debts excepted from discharge): $ 16118.00. Debtor appeared. (Text entry; no document attached.)
11
05/08/2018
Order Discharging Debtor Signed on 5/8/2018 (RE: related document(s) 5 Meeting of Creditors (Chapter 7)).
12
05/10/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 11 Order Discharging Debtor(s)). Notice Date 05/10/2018.
13
05/24/2018
Order Discharging Trustee, Releasing Bond Liability and Closing Case. The estate of the above named Debtor having been fully administered, it is ORDERED that: The accounts and report of the Trustee are hereby filed; the Trustee be and is hereby discharged as trustee of the estate of the above named debtor and the bond is cancelled; and the Chapter 7 case of the above named Debtor is closed. U.S. Bankruptcy Judge (Non-Image Entry)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.