King County v. Chevron Corporation et al
Court Docket Sheet

Western District of Washington

2:2018-cv-00758 (wawd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: 217 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
2 Attachments
2
05/25/2018
DECLARATION of William E. Thomson re 1 Notice of Removal, by Defendant Chevron Corporation
3
05/25/2018
NOTICE TO ADVERSE PARTY OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT re 1 Notice of Removal, ; filed by Defendant Chevron Corporation.
4
05/25/2018
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Chevron Corporation
5
05/25/2018
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Theodore J. Boutrous, Jr. FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Chevron Corporation (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5332866
6
05/25/2018
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Joshua S. Lipshutz FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Chevron Corporation (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5332879
8
05/25/2018
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Herbert J. Stern FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Chevron Corporation (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5332901
9
05/25/2018
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Neal S. Manne FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Chevron Corporation (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5332902
10
05/25/2018
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Erica Harris FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Chevron Corporation (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5332903
11
05/25/2018
NOTICE of Pendency of Other Action in Multiple Courts, case number in other court Multiple Case Numbers ; filed by Defendant Chevron Corporation.
12
05/28/2018
ORDER re 5 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Theodore J. Boutrous, Jr for Defendant Chevron Corporation, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only. NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).
13
05/28/2018
ORDER re 6 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Joshua S Lipshutz for Defendant Chevron Corporation, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only. NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).
14
05/28/2018
ORDER re 7 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Joel M. Silverstein for Defendant Chevron Corporation, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only. NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).
15
05/28/2018
ORDER re 8 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Herbert J Stern for Defendant Chevron Corporation, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only. NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).
16
05/28/2018
ORDER re 9 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Neal S. Manne for Defendant Chevron Corporation, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only. NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).
17
05/28/2018
ORDER re 10 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Erica Harris for Defendant Chevron Corporation, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only. NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).
18
05/30/2018
NOTICE TO FILER: Notice of Filing Deficiency ** Action Required ** See Attached Letter for More Information and Instructions.
05/30/2018
Judge Robert S. Lasnik added. (Text entry; no document attached.)
19
05/30/2018
LETTER from Clerk to counsel re: receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment.
20
05/30/2018
PRAECIPE to attach document Complaint re 1 Notice of Removal, by Defendant Chevron Corporation
21
06/08/2018
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Benjamin A. Krass FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff King County (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5349027
22
06/08/2018
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Matthew F. Pawa FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff King County (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5349033
23
06/08/2018
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Wesley Kelman FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff King County (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5349038
24
06/08/2018
ORDER re 21 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Benjamin A Krass for King County, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only. NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).
25
06/08/2018
ORDER re 22 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Matthew F Pawa for King County, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only. NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).
26
06/08/2018
ORDER re 23 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Wesley Kelman for King County, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only. NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).
27
06/08/2018
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Katherine A Christofilis on behalf of Defendant ConocoPhillips.
28
06/08/2018
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by ConocoPhillips
29
06/08/2018
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Jameson Reece Jones FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant ConocoPhillips (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5350219 Modified on 6/12/2018 **Local counsel contacted and will file corrected application**
30
06/08/2018
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Sean C. Grimsley FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant ConocoPhillips (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5350223 Modified on 6/12/2018 **local counsel contacted and will file corrected application **
06/08/2018
Attorney Marshall L Ferguson for ConocoPhillips added; per 27 Notice of Appearance. (Text entry; no document attached.)
31
06/11/2018
Stipulated MOTION Regarding Briefing Schedule for Defendants' Motions to Dismiss, filed by Defendant Chevron Corporation. Noting Date 6/11/2018
1
Proposed Order
1 Attachment
32
06/11/2018
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Angelo J Calfo on behalf of Defendant Exxon Mobil Corporation.
33
06/11/2018
CORRECTED APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Jameson Reece Jones FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE by Defendant ConocoPhillips Receipt No. 0981-5350219 Modified on 6/12/2018 to correct title of document
34
06/11/2018
CORRECTED APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Sean C. Grimsley FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE by Defendant ConocoPhillips Receipt No. 0981-5350223 Modified on 6/12/2018 to correct title of document
06/11/2018
NOTICE REGARDING LACK OF PROPER SIGNATURE. The 32 Notice of Appearance was improperly signed by Gabriel Reilly-Bates. As such, one or more attorneys were not added to the case and will not receive future notices until corrected. Signatures must be in accordance with FRCP 11 and LCR 83.2(a) and must comply with ECF Filing Procedures. Please file corrected signature page using Praecipe to Attach event and link to original filing. (Text entry; no document attached.)
35
06/12/2018
ORDER re 33 Corrected Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Jameson R Jones for ConocoPhillips, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only. NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).
36
06/12/2018
ORDER granting parties' 31 Stipulated Motion Regarding Briefing Schedule for Defendants' Motions to Dismiss, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.
37
06/12/2018
ORDER re 34 Corrected Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Sean C Grimsley for ConocoPhillips, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only. NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).
38
06/12/2018
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Kemper P Diehl on behalf of Defendant Chevron Corporation.
39
06/12/2018
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Johnny W. Carter FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Chevron Corporation (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5353583
40
06/12/2018
PRAECIPE to attach document AMENDED Signature page re 32 Notice of Appearance by Defendant Exxon Mobil Corporation
1
Supplement Amended Signature Page
1 Attachment
41
06/12/2018
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Carol M. Wood FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant ConocoPhillips (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5353847
42
06/12/2018
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Tracie J. Renfroe FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant ConocoPhillips (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5353869
43
06/12/2018
ORDER re 39 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Johnny W Carter for Chevron Corporation, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only. NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).
44
06/12/2018
ORDER re 41 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Carol M Wood for ConocoPhillips, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only. NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).
45
06/12/2018
ORDER re 42 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Tracie J Renfroe for ConocoPhillips, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only. NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).
06/12/2018
Attorney Gabriel Reilly-Bates for Exxon Mobil Corporation added; per 40 Praecipe to Attach Document, 32 Notice of Appearance. (Text entry; no document attached.)
46
06/13/2018
ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT Joint Status Report due by 7/11/2018, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (KERR)
47
06/13/2018
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Theodore V. Wells, Jr. FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Exxon Mobil Corporation (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5355769
48
06/13/2018
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Jaren Janghorbani FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Exxon Mobil Corporation (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5355799
49
06/13/2018
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Daniel J. Toal FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Exxon Mobil Corporation (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5355800
50
06/13/2018
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Ralph H Palumbo on behalf of Defendant BP PLC.
51
06/13/2018
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by BP PLC
06/13/2018
Attorney Diana S Breaux for BP PLC added; per 50 Notice of Appearance. (Text entry; no document attached.)
52
06/14/2018
ORDER re 47 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Theodore V Wells, Jr for Defendant Exxon Mobil Corporation, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only. NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).
53
06/14/2018
ORDER re 48 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Jaren Janghorbani for Attorney Exxon Mobil Corporation, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only. NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).
54
06/14/2018
ORDER re 49 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Daniel J. Toal for Defendant Exxon Mobil Corporation by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only. NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).
55
06/14/2018
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Eric Tuttle on behalf of Defendant Royal Dutch Shell PLC.
56
06/14/2018
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Royal Dutch Shell PLC
57
06/14/2018
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Philip H. Curtis FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant BP PLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5357161
58
06/14/2018
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Matthew T. Heartney FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant BP PLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5357180
59
06/14/2018
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Jonathan W. Hughes FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant BP PLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5357197
60
06/14/2018
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY John D. Lombardo FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant BP PLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5357203
61
06/14/2018
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Nancy G. Milburn FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant BP PLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5357211
62
06/14/2018
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Rachael S. Shen FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant BP PLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5357221
63
06/14/2018
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Elizabeth S. St. John FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant BP PLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5357227
64
06/14/2018
ORDER re 57 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Philip H Curtis for Defendant BP PLC, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only. NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).
65
06/14/2018
ORDER re 58 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Matthew T Heartney for Defendant BP PLC, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only. NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).
66
06/14/2018
ORDER re 59 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Jonathan W. Hughes for Defendant BP PLC, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only. NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).
67
06/14/2018
ORDER re 60 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney John D Lombardo for Defendant BP PLC, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only. NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).
68
06/14/2018
ORDER re 61 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Nancy G Milburn for Defendant BP PLC, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only. NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).
69
06/14/2018
ORDER re 62 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Rachael S Shen for Defendant BP PLC, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only. NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).
70
06/14/2018
ORDER re 63 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Elizabeth S St. John for Defendant BP PLC, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only. NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).
71
06/14/2018
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Exxon Mobil Corporation
72
06/21/2018
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Erika Holsman on behalf of Defendant Royal Dutch Shell PLC.
73
06/21/2018
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY David K. Suska FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Royal Dutch Shell PLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5366815
74
06/21/2018
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Jerome C. Roth FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Royal Dutch Shell PLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5366871
75
06/21/2018
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Elizabeth A. Kim FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Royal Dutch Shell PLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5366878
76
06/21/2018
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY David C. Frederick FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Royal Dutch Shell PLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5366886
77
06/21/2018
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Brendan J. Crimmins FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Royal Dutch Shell PLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5366890
78
06/21/2018
Stipulated MOTION re Schedule for FRCP 26(a) Conf, etc, filed by Defendant Chevron Corporation. Noting Date 6/21/2018
1
Proposed Order
1 Attachment
79
06/22/2018
ORDER re 73 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney David K Suska for Royal Dutch Shell PLC, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only. NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).
80
06/22/2018
ORDER re 74 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Jerome C Roth for Royal Dutch Shell PLC, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only. NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).
81
06/22/2018
ORDER re 75 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Elizabeth A Kim for Royal Dutch Shell PLC, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only. NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).
82
06/22/2018
ORDER re 76 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney David C Frederick for Royal Dutch Shell PLC, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only. NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).
83
06/22/2018
ORDER re 77 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Brendan J Crimmins for Royal Dutch Shell PLC, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only. NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).
84
06/22/2018
NOTICE of Consent to Removal by Royal Dutch Shell plc and BP p.l.c. ; filed by Defendant Royal Dutch Shell PLC.
85
06/25/2018
ORDER granting parties' 78 Stipulated Motion; FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 7/11/2018, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 7/18/2018, Joint Status Report due by 7/25/2018, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.
86
06/27/2018
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Daniel P. Collins FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Royal Dutch Shell PLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5373945
87
06/27/2018
ORDER re 86 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Daniel P Collins for Defendant Royal Dutch Shell PLC, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only. NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).
88
06/28/2018
Stipulated MOTION Regarding Schedule for FRCP 26(a)(1) Conference, Initial Disclosures, and Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan, filed by Defendant Chevron Corporation. Noting Date 6/28/2018
1
Proposed Order
1 Attachment
89
06/29/2018
ORDER granting parties' 88 Stipulated Motion Regarding Schedule for FRCP 26(a)(1) Conference, Initial Disclosures, and Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan. The deadlines set by Court's June 13, 2018 Order (Dkt. No. 46) and June 25, 2018 Order granting the parties' Stipulated Motion (Dkt. No. 85) are vacated. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (TH) Modified on 7/2/2018 to edit docket text
90
07/11/2018
Stipulated MOTION Regarding Page Limits for Briefing of Defendants' Motions to Dismiss, filed by Defendant Chevron Corporation. Noting Date 7/11/2018
1
Proposed Order
1 Attachment
91
07/12/2018
ORDER granting parties' 90 Stipulated Motion Regarding Page Limits for Briefing on Defendants' Motions to Dismiss, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.
92
07/18/2018
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Adam Rosenberg on behalf of Defendant ConocoPhillips.
93
07/18/2018
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: Attorney Marshall L Ferguson for Defendant ConocoPhillips.
94
07/18/2018
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Tracie J. Renfroe FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE by Defendant ConocoPhillips Receipt No. 0981-5353869
95
07/18/2018
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Sean C. Grimsley FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE by Defendant ConocoPhillips Receipt No. 0981-5350223
96
07/18/2018
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Carol M. Wood FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE by Defendant ConocoPhillips Receipt No. 0981-5353847
97
07/18/2018
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Jameson Reece Jones FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE by Defendant ConocoPhillips Receipt No. 0981-5350219
98
07/18/2018
ORDER re 94 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Tracie J Renfroe for Conoco Phillips. by Clerk William M McCool. **Application submitted due to new local counsel Adam Rosenberg**No document associated with this docket entry, text only. NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).
99
07/18/2018
ORDER re 95 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Sean C. Grimsley for ConocoPhillips by Clerk William M McCool. **Application submitted due to new local counsel Adam Rosenberg**No document associated with this docket entry, text only. NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA) Modified on 7/18/2018 to add represented party name
100
07/18/2018
ORDER re 96 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Carol M. Wood for ConocoPhillips by Clerk William M McCool. **Application submitted due to new local counsel Adam Rosenberg**No document associated with this docket entry, text only. NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).
101
07/18/2018
ORDER re 97 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Jameson Reece Jones for ConocoPhillips by Clerk William M McCool. **Application submitted due to new local counsel Adam Rosenberg**No document associated with this docket entry, text only. NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).
102
07/23/2018
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Steven M. Shepard FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Chevron Corporation (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5404980
103
07/23/2018
ORDER re 102 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Steven M Shepard for Defendant Chevron Corporation, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only. NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).
104
07/24/2018
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Alex J. Harris FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE by Defendant ConocoPhillips Receipt No. 0981-5407698
105
07/25/2018
ORDER re 104 Application. The Court ADMITS Attorney Alex J Harris for Defendant ConocoPhillips, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only. NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).
106
07/27/2018
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, filed by Defendant BP PLC. Oral Argument Requested. Noting Date 10/5/2018
1
Proposed Order
1 Attachment
107
07/27/2018
MOTION (Request) for Judicial Notice re 106 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, filed by Defendant BP PLC. Oral Argument Requested. Noting Date 10/5/2018
1
Proposed Order
1 Attachment
108
07/27/2018
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, filed by Defendant Exxon Mobil Corporation. Oral Argument Requested. Noting Date 10/5/2018
1
Proposed Order
1 Attachment
109
07/27/2018
MOTION to Dismiss, filed by Defendant ConocoPhillips. Oral Argument Requested. Noting Date 10/5/2018
1
Proposed Order
1 Attachment
110
07/27/2018
MOTION to Dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction, filed by Defendant Royal Dutch Shell PLC. Oral Argument Requested. Noting Date 10/5/2018
1
Proposed Order
2
Exhibit A
2 Attachments
111
07/27/2018
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM, filed by Defendant Chevron Corporation. Oral Argument Requested. Noting Date 10/5/2018
1
Proposed Order
1 Attachment
112
07/27/2018
MOTION to Dismiss For Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, filed by Defendant Chevron Corporation. Oral Argument Requested. Noting Date 10/5/2018
1
Proposed Order
1 Attachment
1 Attachment
114
08/28/2018
Stipulated MOTION re Briefing Schedule for Defendants' Motions to Dismiss, filed by Defendants BP PLC, Chevron Corporation, ConocoPhillips, Exxon Mobil Corporation, Royal Dutch Shell PLC. Noting Date 8/28/2018
1
Proposed Order
1 Attachment
1
Proposed Order
1 Attachment
1
Proposed Order
1 Attachment
1
Proposed Order
1 Attachment
1
Proposed Order
1 Attachment
1
Proposed Order
1 Attachment
1
Proposed Order
1 Attachment
121
09/04/2018
ORDER granting parties' 114 Stipulated Motion Regarding Briefing Schedule for Defendants' Motions to Dismiss: Defendants will file response to First Amended Complaint by 9/11/2018, Plaintiff to serve responses to motions to dismiss by 10/11/2018, defendants to serve reply briefs by 11/1/2018. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.
09/04/2018
Noting Date Set re pending motions to dismiss, Dkts. 106, 118, 108, 110, 115, 112, 117, 120, 116, 111, 109, 119 : Noting Date 11/2/2018, per 121 Stipulation and Order. (Text entry; no document attached.)
122
09/07/2018
NOTICE of Mootness re 110 MOTION to Dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction, 111 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM, 109 MOTION to Dismiss, 108 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, 112 MOTION to Dismiss For Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, 106 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, 107 MOTION (Request) for Judicial Notice re 106 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction ; filed by Defendants BP PLC, Chevron Corporation, ConocoPhillips, Exxon Mobil Corporation, Royal Dutch Shell PLC.
09/07/2018
***Motions terminated per parties' Notice of Mootness (dkt. 122): Motions to Dismiss Original Complaint. (Dkts. 106 - 112) (Text entry; no document attached.)
123
09/11/2018
MOTION (Request) for Judicial Notice Accompanying Defendant BP p.l.c.'s Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, filed by Defendant BP PLC. Noting Date 11/1/2018
1
Proposed Order
1 Attachment
124
09/11/2018
PRAECIPE by Defendant BP PLC re 119 Motion to Dismiss Complaint.
1
Exhibit A (Defendant BP p.l.c.'s Corrected Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction)) Modified to create docket entry relationship on 9/12/2018 (SWT
1 Attachment
1 Attachment
126
09/14/2018
RESPONSE, by Defendants BP PLC, Chevron Corporation, to 125 MOTION to Stay Partially Unopposed Motion to Stay Proceedings.
127
09/19/2018
REPLY, filed by Plaintiff King County, TO RESPONSE to 125 MOTION to Stay Partially Unopposed Motion to Stay Proceedings
130
09/27/2018
MOTION for Extension of Time Partially Unopposed Motion for Two-Week Extension of Deadline to Respond to Motions to Dismiss, filed by Plaintiff King County. Noting Date 10/5/2018
1
Proposed Order
1 Attachment
132
10/03/2018
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Tom Fisher FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Amicus Non-Party States (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5494738
133
10/03/2018
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Kian Hudson FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Amicus Non-Party States (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5494751
134
10/03/2018
MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief In Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint, filed by Amicus Non-Party States. Noting Date 10/19/2018
2
Proposed Order
2 Attachments
135
10/03/2018
ORDER re 132 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Thomas M Fisher for Amicus Non-Party States, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only. NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).
136
10/03/2018
ORDER re 133 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Kian J Hudson for Amicus Non-Party States, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only. NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).
137
10/05/2018
ORDER granting plaintiff's 130 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Motions to Dismiss, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.
138
10/17/2018
ORDER granting plaintiff's 125 Motion to Stay Proceedings. Parties shall inform Court by letter on how to proceed based on out come of the appeal. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.
139
10/29/2018
NOTICE of Firm Name Change ; filed by Defendant ConocoPhillips. Changed Firm Name to Bartlit Beck LLP on 10/30/2018
140
12/03/2018
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Casey T Clausen on behalf of Defendant Royal Dutch Shell PLC.
141
12/03/2018
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: Attorney Diana S Breaux for Defendant BP PLC.
142
12/03/2018
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Elizabeth S. Weinstein Ralph H Palumbo on behalf of Defendant BP PLC. Modified on 12/4/2018 to correct name of attorney appearing
12/03/2018
Attorney Elizabeth Simson Weinstein for BP PLC added; per 142 Notice of Appearance. NOTICE of Docket Text Modification: Modified docket text to correct name of attorney appearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/04/2018
Add and Terminate Attorneys (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/04/2018
Notice of Docket Text Modification (Text entry; no document attached.)
145
04/08/2019
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Grace W. Knofczynski FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Royal Dutch Shell PLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5719256
146
04/09/2019
ORDER re 145 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Grace W Knofczynski for Defendant Royal Dutch Shell PLC, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only. NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).
04/09/2019
Order on Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Text entry; no document attached.)
147
04/12/2019
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: Attorney David K Suska for Defendant Royal Dutch Shell PLC.
148
04/18/2019
NOTICE of Change of Address/Change of Name of Attorney Ralph H Palumbo. Filed by Defendant BP PLC. Modified Firm Name on 4/19/2019
149
05/09/2019
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: Attorney Adam Nolan Tabor for Defendant Chevron Corporation.

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.