King, et al v. Ghaemi
Court Docket Sheet

2017-01260 (ca10)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 320 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
07/27/2017
[10485861] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 07/27/2017. Docketing statement due 08/10/2017 for Dennis W. King. Transcript order form due 08/10/2017 for Dennis W. King. Notice of appearance due on 08/10/2017 for Saied Ghaemi and Dennis W. King [17-1260] [Entered: 07/27/2017 03:13 PM]
08/08/2017
[10488760] Notice of appearance submitted by Jenny M.F. Fujii and Lee M. Kutner for Appellee Saied Ghaemi for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 08/08/2017. Manner of Service: email, US mail. [17-1260] [Edited to remove PDF as pleading has been filed-- Edited 08/08/2017 by NA] JMF [Entered: 08/08/2017 03:51 PM] (Text entry; no document attached.)
doc
08/08/2017
[10488762] Notice of appearance filed by Mr. Lee M. Kutner, Jenny M.F. Fujii for Saied Ghaemi. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 08/08/2017. Manner of Service: US mail, email [17-1260] --[Edited 08/17/2017 by AT to add entry or appearance that correct appellee.] [Entered: 08/08/2017 03:55 PM]
08/08/2017
[10488781] Notice of appearance submitted by David V. Wadsworth for Appellant Mr. Dennis W. King for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 08/08/2017. Manner of Service: US mail. [17-1260]--[Edited 08/09/2017 by DD. Removed PDF as pleading filed 8/9/17] DVW [Entered: 08/08/2017 04:58 PM] (Text entry; no document attached.)
doc
08/09/2017
[10488810] Notice of appearance filed by David V. Wadsworth for Dennis W. King. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 08/08/2017. Manner of Service: US mail [17-1260] [Entered: 08/09/2017 07:52 AM]
doc
08/10/2017
[10489309] Docketing statement filed by Mr. Dennis W. King. Served on 08/10/2017. Manner of Service: US mail. [17-1260] DVW [Entered: 08/10/2017 12:06 PM]
doc
08/10/2017
[10489313] Notice that the transcript is already on file in District Court. Served on: 08/10/2017. Manner of Service: US mail. [17-1260]--[Edited 08/10/2017 by LG to correct event code] DVW [Entered: 08/10/2017 12:15 PM]
08/10/2017
[10489330] Minute order filed - Notice due that record is complete by 09/05/2017 for Jeffrey P. Colwell, Clerk of Court. (Text Only - No Attachment) [17-1260] [Entered: 08/10/2017 12:37 PM] (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/10/2017
[10489424] Filed notice record is complete. Served on 08/10/2017. Appellant's brief and appendix due on 09/19/2017 for Dennis W. King. [17-1260] [Entered: 08/10/2017 02:48 PM] (Text entry; no document attached.)
doc
08/15/2017
[10490361] Notice of Mediation Conference filed by the Tenth Circuit Mediation Office. Case is referred for mediation conferencing; conference scheduled for 08/29/2017 at 2:00 PM (MDT). Please review the attached Notice for additional information. [17-1260] [Entered: 08/15/2017 11:13 AM]
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.