King v. Berryhill
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cv-00007 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 16 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
01/10/2018
COMPLAINT against Nancy A. Berryhill, filed by Marcus Loyd King.
1
Exhibit A
1 Attachment
2
01/10/2018
Civil Cover Sheet.
3
01/10/2018
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Marcus Loyd King.
4
01/11/2018
Unissued summons re Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill
1
Unissued Summons re Defendant U.S. Attorney General
2
Unissued Summons re Defendant U.S. Attorney
2 Attachments
5
01/12/2018
MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident) Attorney Edward A. Wicklund. (Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $150.00 paid. Receipt number 097--2452237.) by Marcus Loyd King.
1
Certificate of Good Standing
1 Attachment
6
01/24/2018
ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE AND RESPONSE; granting 3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. service to be completed within 90 days. Clerk to issue summons and sent to counsel. Answer due within 60 days. Signed by Judge Timothy M. Burgess on 1/23/18.
01/24/2018
Summons Issued as to Nancy A. Berryhill, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Text entry; no document attached.)
7
03/06/2018
NOTICE of Appearance by Richard L. Pomeroy on behalf of Nancy A. Berryhill
8
03/21/2018
SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER: agency record due 60 days after defendant's initial appearance, opening brief due 30 days, response due 30 days, reply brief due 14 days. Signed by Judge Timothy M. Burgess on 3/21/18.
03/21/2018
Docket Annotation: For the purpose of tracking the briefing as ordered at docket 8, when filing the Opening Brief the attorney shall file the document using the event Motion Miscellaneous Relief and text in the relief being sought. Responsive filings should be filed using the event Response in Opposition to Motion or Response to Motion (Non-Opposition). The reply, if any, shall be filed using the event Reply to Response to Motion. (Text entry; no document attached.)
9
03/21/2018
TMB TEXT ORDER GRANTING 5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident) Attorney. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the application to appear pro hac vice by Edward A. Wicklund at docket 5 is authorized under D. Ak. L.R. 83.1(d). (JDS, CHAMBERS STAFF)
10
03/22/2018
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Marcus Loyd King. Nancy A. Berryhill served on 3/5/2018, answer due 5/4/2018.
11
03/29/2018
NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan Ta Lu on behalf of Nancy A. Berryhill
12
05/04/2018
ANSWER to 1 Complaint by Nancy A. Berryhill.
13
05/04/2018
Notice of Lodging Administrative Record
1
001 Certification Page
2
002 Court Transcript Index
3
003 Documents Related to Administrative Process Including Transcript of Oral Hearing, if applicable
4
004 Payment Documents and Decisions
5
005 Jurisdictional Documents and Notices
6
006 Non Disability Related Development
7
007 Disability Related Development
8
008 Medical Records Part 1
9
009 Medical Records Part 2
10
010 Medical Records Part 3
11
011 Medical Records Part 4
12
012 Medical Records Part 5
13
013 Medical Records Part 6
14
014 Medical Records Part 7
14 Attachments
14
06/04/2018
MEMORANDUM of Law in Support of Social Security Appeal by Marcus Loyd King.
06/12/2018
Docket Annotation re 14 Memorandum : Parties are advised the filing at docket 14 was filed using the incorrect event and should disregard. The attorney shall refile using the correct motion event. (Text entry; no document attached.)
15
06/12/2018
MOTION Reversal of agency decision and remand for calculation of benefits or, alternatively, further administrative proceedings with Memorandum in support thereof and Certificate of Service by Marcus Loyd King.
06/12/2018
Docket Annotation (Text entry; no document attached.)
16
07/12/2018
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 15 MOTION Reversal of agency decision and remand for calculation of benefits or, alternatively, further administrative proceedings with Memorandum in support thereof and Certificate of Service Unopposed by Nancy A. Berryhill.
1
Proposed Order
1 Attachment
17
07/12/2018
DECLARATION of Ryan Lu re 16 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 15 MOTION Reversal of agency decision and remand for calculation of benefits or, alternatively, further administrative proceedings with Memorandum in support thereof and Certif by Nancy A. Berryhill.
07/19/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply (Text entry; no document attached.)
18
07/19/2018
TMB TEXT ORDER GRANTING 16 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 15 Motion Reversal of Agency Decision and Remand. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant shall have up to and including August 3, 2018 to file their response, and Plaintiff shall have up to and including August 17, 2018 to file a reply. (JDS, CHAMBERS STAFF)
19
08/03/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
20
08/17/2018
Appellants Reply Brief
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.