King v. Tuskegee University
Court Docket Sheet

Middle District of Alabama

3:1992-cv-01111 (almd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 635 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
09/03/1992
DEMAND for jury trial by Catherine King (dkt clerk)
09/03/1992
CASE REFERRED to Mag Judge Vanzetta P. McPherson (dkt clerk) (Text entry; no document attached.)
2
09/04/1992
SUMMONS issued for Tuskegee University; summons and complaint mailed cmrrr to named defendant. (dkt clerk)
09/04/1992
File referred to Judge De Ment. (dkt clerk) (Text entry; no document attached.)
3
09/10/1992
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Tuskegee University 9/8/92 Answer due on 9/28/92 for Tuskegee University
4
09/23/1992
MOTION by Tuskegee University to Dismiss, or, in the alternative for Summary Judgment (Exhibits A and B attached), referred to Judge Ira De Ment (dkt clerk)
5
10/01/1992
ORDER [4-2] motion for Summary Judgment by Tuskegee University set for submission on 10/30/92, set defendant's Brief deadline to 10/16/92, brief in opposition due by 10/30/92 for Catherine King (signed by Judge Ira De Ment), copies mailed to counsel. (dkt clerk)
6
10/16/1992
MEMORANDUM by Tuskegee University in support of [4-2] motion for Summary Judgment by Tuskegee University, referred to Judge De Ment. (dkt clerk)
7
10/30/1992
RESPONSE (additional exhibits) by Tuskegee University in support of [4-2] motion for Summary Judgment by Tuskegee University (Exhibits D, E and transcript of deposition of Catherine King attached, transcript maintained in seperate binder with file), referred to Judge De Ment. (dkt clerk)
8
10/30/1992
BRIEF IN OPPOSITION to [4-2] motion for Summary Judgment by Catherine King, referred to Judge De Ment. (dkt clerk)
9
10/30/1992
RESPONSE (matters) by Catherine King in opposition to [4-2] motion for Summary Judgment by Tuskegee University (Exhibits A-I attached), referred to Judge De Ment. (dkt clerk)
10
12/09/1992
SCHEDULING ORDER setting Pretrial Conference for 9/20/93 ; Motion Filing deadline on 2/22/93 ; Discovery cutoff 9/6/93 ; jury trial set for 11/8/93 ; (signed by Judge Ira De Ment), copies mailed to counsel, furnished to MT and RL. (dkt clerk)
11
01/20/1993
Plaintiff's letter re: Good Faith Settlement Letter
12
07/15/1993
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying [4-1] motion to Dismiss (signed by Judge Ira De Ment), copies mailed to counsel; furnished to Ridge.
13
07/20/1993
ANSWER to Complaint by Tuskegee University (Attorney Ernestine Sapp), referred to Judge De Ment. (dkt clerk)
07/20/1993
AO FORM 85 mailed to counsel for defendant. (dkt clerk) (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/28/1993
Stamped ORDER denying [14-1] motion for Reconsideration of [12-1] order (by Judge Ira De Ment), copies mailed to counsel; furnished to RL. (dkt clerk) (Text entry; no document attached.)
15
07/28/1993
BRIEF IN OPPOSITION to [14-1] motion for Reconsideration of [12-1] order by Catherine King, referred to Judge De Ment. (dkt clerk)
16
08/16/1993
ORDER, set Scheduling Order Deadlines: Jury Trial set for 11/8/93 ; Pretrial Conference for 3:00 9/23/93 ; Proposed Pretrial Order due 9/16/93 ; (signed by Judge Ira De Ment), copies mailed to counsel; furnished to MT & RL. (dkt clerk)
17
09/08/1993
Witness list by Catherine King, referred to Judge De Ment. (dkt clerk)
18
09/10/1993
Witness list by Tuskegee University, referred to Judge De Ment. (dkt clerk)
19
09/14/1993
Amendment to Witness list by Tuskegee University, referred to Judge De Ment. (dkt clerk)
20
09/14/1993
AMENDMENT TO ANSWER to Complaint by Tuskegee University : amends [13-1] answer by Tuskegee University, referred to Judge De Ment. (dkt clerk)
21
09/15/1993
MOTION by Tuskegee University to Continue pretrial referred to Judge Ira De Ment (dkt clerk)
22
09/16/1993
ORDER, reset Scheduling Order Deadlines: Pretrial Conference for 1:00 9/21/93 ; (signed by Judge Ira De Ment), copies mailed to counsel; furnished to MT and RL. (dkt clerk)
09/21/1993
Pre-Trial Conference held (dkt clerk) (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/22/1993
Stamped ORDER (rendered 9/22/93) granting [23-1] motion to Amend [13-1] answer by Tuskegee University (by Judge Ira De Ment), copies mailed to counsel; furnished to RL. (dkt clerk) (Text entry; no document attached.)
24
09/27/1993
ORDER, removing this case from the 11/8/93 trial docket; terminated deadlines ; that the parties file a joint stipulation of dismissal by 10/12/93; set Advise Court of Settlement deadline to 10/12/93 (signed by Judge Ira De Ment), copies mailed to counsel; furnished to RL and MT. (dkt clerk)
25
09/27/1993
PRETRIAL ORDER filed (signed by Judge Ira De Ment), copies mailed to counsel; furnished to RL. (dkt clerk)
26
10/14/1993
Parties' joint STIPULATION of dismissal. (dkt clerk)
27
10/14/1993
ORDER dismissing this cause with prejudice with each party to bear his or its own costs, (signed by Judge Ira De Ment), copies mailed to counsel; furnished to RL. (dkt clerk)
10/14/1993
Case closed (dkt clerk) (Text entry; no document attached.)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.