Kirsteatter v. Strommer, N.P.P.C.P.
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2014-cv-00195 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
49
06/05/2018
Certificate of Service
50
06/29/2018
Notice (Other)
51
07/06/2018
Returned/Undeliverable Mail
52
11/15/2018
Notice (Other)
53
11/20/2018
Returned/Undeliverable Mail

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.