Knuth v. Paul Revere Life Insurance Company et al
Court Docket Sheet

4:2014-cv-02387 (azd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 455 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
09/30/2014
COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-10920207 filed by Randall Knuth.
1
Exhibit 1
2
Exhibit 2
3
https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/doc1/025113460671" onClick="goDLS{{'/doc1/025113460671','885354','9','','2','1','',''}};">3</a> Civil Cover Sheet)
3 Attachments
2
09/30/2014
SUMMONS Submitted by Randall Knuth.
1
Summons
2
https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/doc1/025113460712" onClick="goDLS{{'/doc1/025113460712','885354','11','','2','1','',''}};">2</a> Summons)
2 Attachments
3
09/30/2014
Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-10920207. This case has been assigned to the Honorable D Thomas Ferraro. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: 4:14-cv-02387-DTF. Magistrate Election form attached.
1
https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/doc1/025113460765" onClick="goDLS{{'/doc1/025113460765','885354','15','','2','1','',''}};">1</a> Consent Form Instructions)
1 Attachment
4
10/01/2014
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
1
Summons
2
https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/doc1/025113460885" onClick="goDLS{{'/doc1/025113460885','885354','17','','2','1','',''}};">2</a> Summons)
2 Attachments
5
10/09/2014
SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Randall Knuth: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, Consent to Magistrate Election and Instruction Sheet re UNUM GROUP upon Statutory Agent on 10/03/2014.
6
10/09/2014
SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Randall Knuth: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, Consent to Magistrate Election and Instruction Sheet upon Arizona Department of Insurance on behalf of Paul Revere Life Insurance Company on 10/03/2014.
7
10/09/2014
SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Randall Knuth: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, Consent to Magistrate Election and Instruction Sheet upon Arizona Department of Insurance on behalf of Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company on 10/03/2014.
8
10/15/2014
Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
9
10/15/2014
MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.8(a), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. Case reassigned by random draw to Chief Judge Raner C Collins. All further pleadings should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV-14-02387-TUC-RCC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
10
10/22/2014
STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT (First Request).
1
Text of Proposed Order
1 Attachment
11
10/23/2014
ORDER granting 10 Stipulation For Extension of Time To Answer Complaint as to All Defendants. Answer due November 17, 2014. Signed by Chief Judge Raner C Collins on 10/22/14.
12
10/24/2014
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Richard H. Friedman by Randall Knuth.
1
List of Courts Admitted to Practice
2
Good Standing Cert for R. Friedman
2 Attachments
13
10/24/2014
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge D Thomas Ferraro for all pretrial proceedings and Report and Recommendation. All future filings in this case shall be designated: CV-14-02387-TUC-RCC(DTF). Signed by Chief Judge Raner C Collins on 10/23/14.
14
10/27/2014
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Jeffrey K Rubin on behalf of Randall Knuth.
10/27/2014
PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 35, receipt number PHX151730 as to Jeffrey K Rubin. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/27/2014
PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 35, receipt number PHX151729 as to Richard H Friedman. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (Text entry; no document attached.)
15
10/27/2014
ORDER pursuant to General Order 09-08 granting 12 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting 14 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. Counsel is advised that they are limited to two (2) additional e-mail addresses in their District of Arizona User Account. (BAS) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
16
10/30/2014
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Daniel W. Maguire by Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, Unum Group.
1
Certificate of Good Standing
2
Certificate of Service
2 Attachments
17
10/30/2014
NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen M Bressler on behalf of Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, Unum Group.
10/31/2014
PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 35, receipt number PHX151893 as to Daniel W Maguire. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (Text entry; no document attached.)
18
10/31/2014
ORDER pursuant to General Order 09-08 granting 16 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. Counsel is advised that they are limited to two (2) additional e-mail addresses in their District of Arizona User Account. (BAS) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
19
11/17/2014
ANSWER to Complaint by Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, Unum Group.
20
11/17/2014
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, Unum Group.
21
11/20/2014
ORDER, Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 1/7/2015 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge D Thomas Ferraro. Counsel are directed to confer at least 21 days prior to the Conference. The parties shall prepare a Joint Case Management Plan reflecting the results of their discussion and file it with the Court on or before December 31, 2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge D Thomas Ferraro on 11/19/14. (See attached PDF for complete information.)
22
12/17/2014
NOTICE re: Intent to Issue Subpoenas for Production by Paul Revere Life Insurance Company.
1
subpoena
2
subpoena
3
subpoena
4
subpoena
5
subpoena
6
subpoena
7
subpoena
8
subpoena
9
subpoena
10
subpoena
11
Exhibit
11 Attachments
23
12/19/2014
NOTICE re: Intent to Issue Subpoenas by Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, Unum Group.
1
subpoena
2
subpoena
3
Exhibit
3 Attachments
24
12/30/2014
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Randall Knuth.
25
01/07/2015
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge D Thomas Ferraro: Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference held on 1/7/2015. Scheduling Order to follow. Hearing held 9:31AM to 9:38AM.
26
01/07/2015
SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 9/28/2015. Dispositive motions due by 10/30/2015. Joint Proposed Pretrial Order due by 11/30/2015. If dispositive motions are filed, the proposed pretrial order shall be due 30 days following resolution of the motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge D Thomas Ferraro on 1/7/15. (See attached PDF for complete information.)
27
01/16/2015
NOTICE re: Intent to Issue Subpoenas for Production by Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, Unum Group.
1
subpoena
2
subpoena
3
Exhibit
3 Attachments
28
01/21/2015
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, Unum Group.
29
01/21/2015
NOTICE re: Service of Plaintiff's Initial Disclosure Statement by Randall Knuth.
30
01/22/2015
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Randall Knuth.
31
01/27/2015
NOTICE re: Intient to Issue Subpoenas for Production of Documents by Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, Unum Group.
1
subpoena
2
subpoena
3
subpoena
4
subpoena
5
subpoena
6
subpoena
7
subpoena
8
subpoena
9
subpoena
10
subpoena
11
Exhibit
11 Attachments
32
02/03/2015
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Randall Knuth.
33
02/19/2015
NOTICE re: Intent to Issue Subpoenas for Production by Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, Unum Group.
1
subpoena
2
Exhibit
3
subpoena
4
Exhibit
4 Attachments
34
02/20/2015
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Randall Knuth.
35
02/24/2015
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Randall Knuth.
36
02/24/2015
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, Unum Group.
37
03/09/2015
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, Unum Group.
38
03/10/2015
NOTICE re: of Service of Plaintiff's 1st All-Inclusive Supplemental Disclosure Statement by Randall Knuth.
39
03/13/2015
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, Unum Group.
40
03/16/2015
NOTICE re: Intent to Issue Subpoenas to Produce by Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, Unum Group.
1
subpoena
2
subpoena
3
subpoena
4
subpoena
5
subpoena
6
subpoena
7
subpoena
8
subpoena
9
Exhibit
9 Attachments
41
03/18/2015
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, Unum Group.
42
03/24/2015
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, Unum Group.
43
03/26/2015
NOTICE re: Intent to Issue Subpoena for Production by Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, Unum Group.
1
subpoena
2
Exhibit
2 Attachments
44
03/26/2015
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Unum Group.
45
03/27/2015
NOTICE re: of Service of Discovery by Randall Knuth.
46
03/30/2015
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, Unum Group.
47
04/02/2015
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Henry G Jones on behalf of Randall Knuth.
04/02/2015
PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 35, receipt number PHX157084 as to Henry G Jones. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (Text entry; no document attached.)
48
04/02/2015
ORDER pursuant to General Order 09-08 granting 47 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. Counsel is advised that they are limited to two (2) additional e-mail addresses in their District of Arizona User Account. (BAS) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
49
04/08/2015
NOTICE re: Intent to Issue Subpoena for Production by Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, Unum Group.
1
subpoena
2
Exhibit
2 Attachments
50
04/16/2015
NOTICE re: Intent to Issue Subpoena for Production of Documents by Randall Knuth.
1
Exhibit Subpoena Duces Tecum
1 Attachment
51
04/16/2015
NOTICE re: Intent to Issue Subpoena for Production of Documents (Amended) by Randall Knuth re: 50 Notice (Other).
1
Exhibit Subpoena Duces Tecum
1 Attachment
52
04/29/2015
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, Unum Group.
53
05/01/2015
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Randall Knuth.
54
05/08/2015
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge D Thomas Ferraro: Telephonic Hearing held on 5/8/2015. Hearing held 10:00 AM to 11:23 AM.
55
05/09/2015
NOTICE of Deposition, filed by Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, Unum Group.
56
05/15/2015
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Randall Knuth.
57
05/15/2015
MOTION to Compel Discovery by Randall Knuth.
1
Memorandum in Support
2
Declaration of Henry G. Jones
3
Exhibit 1
4
Exhibit 2
5
Exhibit 3
6
Exhibit 4
7
Exhibit 5
8
Exhibit 6
9
Exhibit 7
10
Exhibit 8
11
Exhibit 9
12
Exhibit 10
13
Exhibit 11
14
Exhibit 12
15
Exhibit 13
16
Exhibit 14
17
Exhibit 15
18
Exhibit 16
19
Exhibit 17
20
Exhibit 18
21
Exhibit 19
22
Exhibit 20
23
Exhibit 21
24
Exhibit 22
25
Exhibit 23
26
Text of Proposed Order
26 Attachments
58
05/21/2015
MOTION for Protective Order by Randall Knuth.
1
Memorandum in Support
2
Declaration of Henry G. Jones
3
Exhibit 1
4
Exhibit 2
5
Exhibit 3
6
Exhibit 4
7
Exhibit 5
8
Exhibit 6
9
Exhibit 7
10
Exhibit 8
11
Text of Proposed Order
11 Attachments
59
05/22/2015
MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery RE: Experts by Randall Knuth.
1
Text of Proposed Order
1 Attachment
60
06/01/2015
RESPONSE to Motion re: 57 MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, Unum Group.
1
Exhibit Declaration of William Obert
1 Attachment
61
06/01/2015
NOTICE of Deposition of Jerome Philbin, PhD, Robin Rose, Sara McKinnon, Diane Cahill, filed by Randall Knuth.
62
06/03/2015
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Randall Knuth.
63
06/03/2015
NOTICE of Deposition of Diane M. Cahill, filed by Randall Knuth.
64
06/03/2015
*AMENDED NOTICE of Deposition of Jerome Philbin, M.D., filed by Randall Knuth. *Modified to add amended, as reflected on document on 6/4/2015
65
06/03/2015
*AMENDED NOTICE of Deposition of Robin Rose, filed by Randall Knuth. *Modified to add amended, as reflected on document on 6/4/2015
66
06/03/2015
*AMENDED NOTICE of Deposition of Sara McKinnon, filed by Randall Knuth. *Modified to add amended, as reflected on document on 6/4/2015
67
06/04/2015
STIPULATION for Interim Continuation of Expert Disclosure Deadlines by Randall Knuth.
1
Exhibit Proposed Protective Order
1 Attachment
68
06/05/2015
RESPONSE in Opposition re: 58 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, Unum Group.
1
Exhibit 1-9
1 Attachment
69
06/05/2015
RESPONSE to Motion re: 59 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery RE: Experts filed by Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, Unum Group.
70
06/05/2015
NOTICE re: of Service of Partial Expert Disclosure by Randall Knuth.
71
06/05/2015
ORDER pursuant to 67 Stipulation for Continuation: IT IS ORDERED Plaintiff's 6/5/15 expert witness disclosure deadline shall be continued until 14 days after the Court rules on his Motion to Modify Rule 16 Scheduling Order to Continue Expert Disclosure Deadlines (Doc. 59, the "Motion"); Defendants' 7/17/15 expert disclosure deadline, and Plaintiff's 8/7/15 rebuttal expert disclosure deadline, shall be continued by an amount corresponding to the effective continuance of Plaintiff's expert disclosure deadline under Paragraph 1; and if the Court grants Plaintiff's Motion and sets different expert disclosure deadlines, those deadlines shall control. Signed by Magistrate Judge D Thomas Ferraro on 6/5/15.
72
06/11/2015
REPLY to Response to Motion re: 57 MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by Randall Knuth.
1
Declaration of Henry G. Jones
2
Exhibit 24
2 Attachments
73
06/15/2015
REPLY to Response to Motion re: 58 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Randall Knuth.
1
Text of Proposed Order
2
Declaration of Henry G. Jones
3
Exhibit 9
4
Exhibit 10
5
Exhibit 11
6
Exhibit 12
6 Attachments
74
06/15/2015
REPLY to Response to Motion re: 59 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery RE: Experts filed by Randall Knuth.
75
06/23/2015
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Randall Knuth.
1
Exhibit Subpoena Duces Tecum re: Knuth & McFarland
2
Exhibit Subpoena Duces Tecum re: Shawn McFarland, PLLC
2 Attachments
76
06/24/2015
MOTION to Strike 57 MOTION to Compel Discovery or Seal (Exhibits 3, 4, 5 and 22 only) by Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, Unum Group.
1
Exhibit 1-2
2
Exhibit 3-4
3
Exhibit 5-6
4
Text of Proposed Order
4 Attachments
77
06/24/2015
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Randall Knuth.
1
Exhibit Subpoena Duces Tecum re: Shawn McFarland, D.D.S., individually
1 Attachment
78
06/25/2015
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Randall Knuth.
79
06/30/2015
ORDER GRANTING 58 Plaintiffs Motion for Blanket Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge D Thomas Ferraro on 6/29/15.
80
07/01/2015
ORDER GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART Plaintiff's 57 Motion to Compel. IT IS ORDERED that Motion to Compel is GRANTED IN PART as to RFP No. 16 (as to 2013 and 2014 documents, for in camera review only) and RFP No. 20 and DENIED IN PART as to RFP Nos. 5-7, 11, 16 (for years other than 2013 and 2014), 19 (except as already agreed by Defendants), 32, 33, and 36 as setforth in this Order. Defendants shall produce in camera the documents requested in RFP No. 16 (for the years 2013 and 2014), on or before 7/31/15. The documents shall be indexed and Bates stamped for reference. Signed by Magistrate Judge D Thomas Ferraro on 7/1/15.
81
07/01/2015
ORDER GRANTING Platinff's 59 Motion Motion to Modify Scheduling Order. Plaintiff shall disclose any experts and their reports, including all disclosures required by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(a) (2), on or before 8/4/15. Defendants' expert disclosures, shall be completed by 9/15/15. Plaintiff's rebuttal expert disclosures shall be completed by 10/6/15. Written discovery shall be propounded on or before 8/14/15. All discovery shall be completed by 11/2/15; Dispositive motions shall be filed no later than 12/4/15; joint proposed pretrial order shall be lodged by 1/8/16. If dispositive motions are filed, the proposed pretrial order shall be due 30 days following resolution of the motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge D Thomas Ferraro on 7/1/15.
82
07/06/2015
NOTICE re: Intent to Issue Subpoenas for Production by Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, Unum Group.
1
Subpoena to Produce
2
Exhibit
3
Subpoena to Produce
4
Exhibit
4 Attachments
83
07/06/2015
NOTICE re: Intent to Issue Subpoena for Production by Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, Unum Group.
1
Subpoena to Produce
2
Exhibit
2 Attachments
84
07/07/2015
RESPONSE in Opposition re: 76 MOTION to Strike 57 MOTION to Compel Discovery or Seal (Exhibits 3, 4, 5 and 22 only) filed by Randall Knuth.
1
Declaration of H.G. Jones
2
Exhibit A
3
Exhibit B, part 1
4
Exhibit B, part 2
5
Exhibit C
6
Exhibit D
7
Exhibit E
8
Exhibit F
9
Exhibit G
10
Exhibit H
11
Exhibit I
11 Attachments
85
07/08/2015
NOTICE of Errata re: 84 Response in Opposition to Motion by Plaintiff Randall Knuth.
86
07/14/2015
NOTICE re: of Service of Plaintiff's 4th & 5th Supplemental Disclosure Statements by Randall Knuth.
87
07/14/2015
APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION TO DISTRICT COURT by Randall Knuth re: 79 Order on Motion for Protective Order.
1
Exhibit Hepp Order re: Sanctions
1 Attachment
88
07/15/2015
NOTICE of Deposition of Defendant Unum Group pursuant to F.R.C.P. 30(b)(6), filed by Randall Knuth.
1
Exhibit 1
2
Exhibit 2
3
Exhibit 3
4
Exhibit 4
5
Exhibit 5
5 Attachments
89
07/15/2015
APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION TO DISTRICT COURT by Randall Knuth re: 80 Order on Motion to Compel.
1
Exhibit RFP #27 & #28
1 Attachment
90
07/15/2015
NOTICE re: LODGING UNDER SEAL and CERTIFICATION OF COUNSEL by Randall Knuth re: 89 Appeal of Mag Judge Decision to Dist Court (Rule 72(a) Objection) Declaration of Lisa Ordonez, Ph.D.
91
07/15/2015
SEALED LODGED Proposed Declaration of Lisa Ordonez. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion or Stipulation to Seal is granted. Filed by Randall Knuth.
92
07/16/2015
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Randall Knuth.
93
07/17/2015
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Randall Knuth.
94
07/20/2015
REPLY to Response to Motion re: 76 MOTION to Strike 57 MOTION to Compel Discovery or Seal (Exhibits 3, 4, 5 and 22 only) filed by Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, Unum Group.
95
07/23/2015
ORDER DENYING Defendants' 76 Motion to Strike or Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge D Thomas Ferraro on 7/22/15.
96
07/24/2015
NOTICE of Errata re: 78 Notice of Service of Discovery by Plaintiff Randall Knuth.
97
07/24/2015
Pursuant to LRCiv 7.2(f) of the Rules of Practice of the United States District Court for the District of Arizona, IT IS ORDERED setting telephonic oral argument re: discovery dispute on 7/29/2015 at 03:30PM before Magistrate Judge D Thomas Ferraro. Ordered by Magistrate Judge D Thomas Ferraro. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.)
98
07/27/2015
NOTICE re: of Supplemental Authority by Randall Knuth re: 89 Appeal of Mag Judge Decision to Dist Court (Rule 72(a) Objection).
1
Supplement Order & Memorandum Opinion
1 Attachment
99
07/27/2015
NOTICE re: Submission of Material for In Camera Review by Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, Unum Group.
100
07/28/2015
NOTICE re: Disclosure of Expert Testimony re: Richard S. Randall, P.T. by Randall Knuth.
101
07/28/2015
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Randall Knuth.
102
07/28/2015
*AMENDED NOTICE of Deposition of 30(b)(6) Designee, filed by Randall Knuth. *Modified text to add amended as reflected on document on 7/29/2015
103
07/28/2015
NOTICE of Deposition of ANDREA L. CORRACIO, filed by Randall Knuth.
104
07/28/2015
NOTICE of Deposition of DIANE M. CAHILL, filed by Randall Knuth.
105
07/28/2015
NOTICE of Deposition of SARA MCKINNON, filed by Randall Knuth.
106
07/28/2015
NOTICE of Deposition of Dr. Suzanne Benson, filed by Randall Knuth.
107
07/29/2015
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, Unum Group.
108
07/29/2015
NOTICE re: PLAINTIFFS DISCLOSURE OF EXPERT TESTIMONY RE: KAREN LUNDA, M.S., P.T. AND ALAN K. ROGERS, M.D. (FRCP 26 (a)(2)(C)) by Randall Knuth.
109
07/29/2015
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge D Thomas Ferraro: Telephonic Hearing held on 7/29/2015. Hearing held 3:30 PM to 4:28 PM.
110
07/31/2015
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Randall Knuth.
111
07/31/2015
RESPONSE to Plaintiff's Objection to Protective Order by Defendants Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, Unum Group.
112
07/31/2015
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Randall Knuth.
113
08/03/2015
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Randall Knuth.
114
08/03/2015
RESPONSE re: 89 Appeal of Mag Judge Decision to Dist Court (Rule 72(a) Objection) by Defendants Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, Unum Group.
115
08/04/2015
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Randall Knuth.
116
08/04/2015
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Randall Knuth.
117
08/05/2015
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Randall Knuth.
118
08/10/2015
REPLY re: 87 Appeal of Mag Judge Decision to Dist Court (Rule 72(a) Objection), 111 Response, 79 Order on Motion for Protective Order by Plaintiff Randall Knuth.
119
08/12/2015
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Randall Knuth.
120
08/12/2015
*AMENDED NOTICE of Deposition of Dr. Suzanne Benson, filed by Randall Knuth. *Modified to add amended as reflected on this document on 8/13/2015
121
08/13/2015
REPLY re: 114 Response, 80 Order on Motion to Compel, 89 Appeal of Mag Judge Decision to Dist Court (Rule 72(a) Objection) PLAINTIFFS REPLY TO DEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS OBJECTION TO MAGISTRATES JULY 1, 2015 ORDER (DOC. NOS. 80, 89, 114) by Plaintiff Randall Knuth.
1
Exhibit Excerpts from Defendants' Initial Disclosure Statement
2
Exhibit No Document - Filed Under Seal
3
Exhibit Claim File Excerpts
4
Exhibit No Document - Filed Under Seal
5
Exhibit No Document - Filed Under Seal
6
Exhibit Misc. Emails
7
Exhibit Cahill Excerpts
8
Exhibit Exhibits 8-12 - No Document - Filed Under Seal
9
Exhibit Exhibit 13 - Saldi Depo Log
10
Exhibit Exhibit 14 - Defendants' Request for Production to Plaintiff
10 Attachments
122
08/13/2015
DECLARATION of JEFFREY K. RUBIN (28 U.S.C. §1746) IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS REPLY TO DEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS OBJECTION TO MAGISTRATES JULY 1, 2015 ORDER (DOC. NOS. 80, 89, 114) re: 121 Reply by Plaintiff Randall Knuth.
1
Exhibit
1 Attachment
123
08/13/2015
DECLARATION of Lisa Ordez, Ph.D. re: 121 Reply (Supplemental) by Plaintiff Randall Knuth.
124
08/13/2015
NOTICE re: OF LODGING UNDER SEAL and CERTIFICATION OF COUNSEL by Randall Knuth re: 121 Reply.
125
08/13/2015
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, Unum Group.
126
08/13/2015
SEALED LODGED Proposed Lodging Under Seal - With Sealed Exhibits. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion or Stipulation to Seal is granted. Filed by Randall Knuth.
1
Exhibit Robin Rose Deposition Excerpts
2
Exhibit Jerome Philbin, M.D. Deposition Excerpts
3
Exhibit Sara McKinnon Deposition Excerpts
4
Exhibit 2011 Long-Term Incentive Program
5
Exhibit 2013 PBI Total Compensation FAQs
6
Exhibit January 2014 PBI Total Compensation FAQs
7
Exhibit June 2014 PBI Total Compensation FAQs
8
Exhibit October 2014 PBI Total Compensation FAQs
8 Attachments
127
08/13/2015
NOTICE re: SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF LODGING UNDER SEAL by Randall Knuth re: 126 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document, 124 Notice (Other).
128
08/14/2015
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Randall Knuth.
129
08/14/2015
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Randall Knuth.
130
08/14/2015
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Randall Knuth.
131
08/17/2015
MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Confidentiality Designations by Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, Unum Group.
1
Appendix 1-6
2
Text of Proposed Order
2 Attachments
132
08/18/2015
NOTICE of Deposition of Randall Knuth (continued deposition), filed by Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, Unum Group.
133
08/18/2015
ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that Defendants shall produce the in camera material to Plaintiff on or before 9/1/15. Signed by Magistrate Judge D Thomas Ferraro on 8/17/15.
134
08/19/2015
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, Unum Group.
135
08/20/2015
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, Unum Group.
136
08/21/2015
*NOTICE of Appearance of Sander R. Dawson by Steven C Dawson on behalf of Randall Knuth. *Modified on 8/24/2015 to add attorney
137
08/26/2015
NOTICE re: re Intent to Issue Subpoenas for Production by Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, Unum Group.
1
Subpoena
2
Exhibit
3
Subpoena
4
Exhibit
5
Subpoena
6
Exhibit
7
Subpoena
8
Exhibit
9
Subpoena
10
Exhibit
11
Subpoena
12
Exhibit
13
Subpoena
14
Exhibit
15
Subpoena
16
Exhibit
17
Subpoena
18
Exhibit
19
Subpoena
20
Exhibit
21
Subpoena
22
Exhibit
23
Subpoena
24
Exhibit
24 Attachments
138
08/27/2015
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge D Thomas Ferraro: Telephonic Conference held on 8/27/2015. Hearing held 9:00 AM to 9:32 AM.
139
08/28/2015
NOTICE re: Independent Medical Examination by Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, Unum Group.
140
08/28/2015
*RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion re: 131 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Confidentiality Designations filed by Randall Knuth.
1
Exhibit Annual Incentive Plan
2
Exhibit Stock Incentive Plan of 2012
3
Exhibit Excerpts from Deposition of Sharon Haas
4
Exhibit Excerpts from Deposition of Maureen Griffin
5
Exhibit Unum 2012 Annual Report
6
Exhibit 2004 Eastern Claims Conference
7
Exhibit 2007 Eastern Claims Conference
8
Exhibit Filed Under Seal
9
Exhibit Filed Under Seal
10
Exhibit Filed Under Seal
11
Exhibit 2009 Eastern Claims Conference
12
Exhibit 2012 Eastern Claims Conference
13
Exhibit 2013 Eastern Claims Conference
14
Exhibit 2014 Eastern Claims Conference
15
Exhibit Sharon Rutledge Testimony Excerpts
16
https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/doc1/025114814305" onClick="goDLS{{'/doc1/025114814305','885354','354','','2','1','',''}};">16</a> Exhibit 2015 Eastern Claims Conference) *Modified on 8/31/2015 to correct event type
16 Attachments
141
08/28/2015
NOTICE re: LODGING UNDER SEAL and CERTIFICATION OF COUNSEL by Randall Knuth re: 140 Response to Motion, 131 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Confidentiality Designations.
142
08/28/2015
FILED PUBLICLY AT DOC. 216 PURSUANT TO DOC. 215 -- SEALED LODGED Proposed Notice of Lodging Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion or Stipulation to Seal is granted. Filed by Randall Knuth.
1
Exhibit Exhibit 8 Under Seal
2
Exhibit Exhibit 9 Under Seal
3
https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/doc1/025114814418" onClick="goDLS{{'/doc1/025114814418','885354','362','','2','1','',''}};">3</a> Exhibit Exhibit 10 Under Seal) Modified on 10/27/2015
3 Attachments
143
08/31/2015
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, Unum Group.
144
09/04/2015
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, Unum Group.
145
09/08/2015
REPLY to Response to Motion re: 131 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Confidentiality Designations Defendants' Reply in Support of Motion for Protective Order Regarding Confidentiality Designations filed by Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, Unum Group.
146
09/09/2015
NOTICE of Deposition of Jack McGarry, filed by Randall Knuth.
147
09/10/2015
NOTICE of Deposition of Julie Knuth, filed by Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, Unum Group.
148
09/10/2015
NOTICE of Deposition of Karen Lunda, filed by Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, Unum Group.
149
09/11/2015
NOTICE re: Service (discovery response) by Unum Group.
150
09/15/2015
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Randall Knuth.
151
09/15/2015
NOTICE re: Service (Expert Disclosures) by Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, Unum Group.
152
09/16/2015
NOTICE of Deposition of Mike Hannley, filed by Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, Unum Group.
153
09/16/2015
IT IS ORDERED that the Court will hear oral argument telephonically on the parties' discovery disputes on 9/30/2015, at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge D Thomas Ferraro. Ordered by Magistrate Judge D Thomas Ferraro. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.)
154
09/17/2015
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Randall Knuth.
155
09/17/2015
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, Unum Group.
156
09/23/2015
MOTION to Compel Requests for Production No. 62 and 63 by Randall Knuth.
1
Exhibit 1
2
Exhibit 2
3
Exhibit 3
4
Exhibit 4
5
Exhibit 5
6
Exhibit 6
7
Exhibit 7
8
Exhibit 8
9
Exhibit 9
10
Exhibit 10
11
Exhibit 11
12
Exhibit 12
13
Exhibit 13
14
Exhibit 14
15
Exhibit 15
16
Exhibit 16
17
Exhibit 17
18
Exhibit 18
19
Declaration of J. Rubin
20
Declaration of M. Fuller
21
Text of Proposed Order
21 Attachments
157
09/29/2015
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Randall Knuth.
158
09/29/2015
NOTICE re: INTENT TO ISSUE SUBPOENA TO TESTIFY AT A DEPOSITION IN A CIVIL ACTION by Randall Knuth.
1
Exhibit Subpoena re: John F. (&quot;Jack&quot;) McGarry
1 Attachment
159
09/29/2015
MOTION to Compel Production of Settlement Agreement by Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, Unum Group.
1
Text of Proposed Order
1 Attachment
160
09/29/2015
MOTION PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR EXCEPTIONAL RELIEF FROM SCHEDULING ORDER AND TO SET REASONABLE FEE FOR EXPERT WITNESS DEPOSITION RE: DR. BERGHAUSEN by Randall Knuth.
1
Exhibit Exhibit 1
2
Exhibit Exhibit 2
3
Exhibit Exhibit 3
4
Exhibit Exhibit 4
5
Exhibit Exhibit 5
6
Exhibit Exhibit 6
7
Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
7 Attachments
161
09/29/2015
DECLARATION of Jeffrey K. Rubin re: 160 MOTION PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR EXCEPTIONAL RELIEF FROM SCHEDULING ORDER AND TO SET REASONABLE FEE FOR EXPERT WITNESS DEPOSITION RE: DR. BERGHAUSEN by Plaintiff Randall Knuth.
162
09/29/2015
SUPPLEMENT PLAINTIFFS SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL DOC. 57 AND APPEAL OF RULING AT DOC. 89 re: 89 Appeal of Mag Judge Decision to Dist Court (Rule 72(a) Objection) by Plaintiff Randall Knuth.
1
Exhibit Defendants' Expert Disclosure
2
Exhibit Excerpt from Dr. Philbin Deposition
3
Exhibit Exhibit 3 Lodged Under Seal
4
Exhibit Exhibit 4 Lodged Under Seal
5
Exhibit Exhibit 5 Lodged Under Seal
5 Attachments
163
09/29/2015
MOTION to Seal Document 162 Supplement by Randall Knuth.
1
Text of Proposed Order
1 Attachment
164
09/29/2015
FILED AT DOC. 452 --SEALED LODGED Proposed Notice of Lodging Under Seal With Proposed Sealed Exhibits re: 163 MOTION to Seal Document 162 Supplement. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion or Stipulation to Seal is granted. Filed by Randall Knuth.
1
Exhibit Supplemental Exhibit #3
2
Exhibit Supplemental Exhibit #4
3
https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/doc1/025114945203" onClick="goDLS{{'/doc1/025114945203','885354','412','','2','1','',''}};">3</a> Exhibit Supplemental Exhibit #5) Modified on 6/14/2016
3 Attachments
165
09/30/2015
NOTICE of Deposition of Richard Randall, filed by Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, Unum Group.
166
09/30/2015
ORDER GRANTING Defendant's 159 Motion to Compel. Plaintiff shall produce to Defendants his settlement agreement with Dr. Shawn McFarland and the settlement agreement shall be subject to the previously issued protective order at Doc. 79. Signed by Magistrate Judge D Thomas Ferraro on 9/29/15.
167
09/30/2015
TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Randall Knuth for proceedings held on 09/30/2015, Magistrate Judge D Thomas Ferraro hearing judge(s).
168
09/30/2015
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge D Thomas Ferraro: Telephonic Hearing held on 9/30/2015. Oral argument held on discovery matters. The parties make their arguments to the Court. Formal order to follow. (Recorded by COURTSMART.) Hearing held 10:37 AM to 12:28 PM.
169
10/01/2015
ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff's Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(a)(1)(A)(iv) request is GRANTED. On or before 10/16/15, Defendants shall produce to Plaintiff for inspection and copying their primary and first-layer excess insurance policies. Plaintiff's request for further compensation documents is DENIED. Plaintiff's request for the results of a 35-term search of Sara McKinnon's emails is GRANTED IN PART. Plaintiff's request for underwriting documents is DENIED. On or before 10/16/15, Defendants shall bring before the Court their opposition to the deposition of Jack McGarry. The written discovery deadline is extended. Plaintiff's request for training materials and logs is GRANTED. Plaintiff's request for additional scorecards is DENIED. (See attached PDF for complete information). Signed by Magistrate Judge D Thomas Ferraro on 9/30/15.
170
10/05/2015
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Randall Knuth.
171
10/05/2015
TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, Unum Group for proceedings held on 09/30/2015, Magistrate Judge D Thomas Ferraro hearing judge(s).
172
10/06/2015
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Randall Knuth.
173
10/07/2015
TRANSCRIPT of ORAL ARGUMENT held on 09/30/2015, before Judge D. THOMAS FERRARO. Court Reporter Cindy J. Shearman. The ordering party will have electronic access to the transcript immediately. All others may view the transcript at the court public terminal or it may be purchased through the Court Reporter by filing a Transcript Order Form on the docket before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/28/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/9/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/5/2016.
174
10/07/2015
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Randall Knuth.
1
Exhibit Subpoena Duces Tecum
1 Attachment
175
10/08/2015
NOTICE of Deposition of Mary Fuller, filed by Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, Unum Group.
176
10/08/2015
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Randall Knuth.
177
10/08/2015
MOTION to Quash Subpoena Duces Tecum by Randall Knuth.
1
Exhibit Exhibit 1
2
Exhibit Exhibit 2
3
Exhibit Exhibit 3
4
Exhibit Exhibit 4
5
Exhibit Exhibit 5
6
Exhibit Exhibit 6
7
Exhibit Exhibit 7
8
Text of Proposed Order
8 Attachments
178
10/08/2015
DECLARATION of Counsel (Jeffrey K. Rubin) re: 177 MOTION to Quash Subpoena Duces Tecum by Plaintiff Randall Knuth.
179
10/08/2015
DECLARATION of Randall Knuth, DDS re: 177 MOTION to Quash Subpoena Duces Tecum by Plaintiff Randall Knuth.
180
10/08/2015
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Randall Knuth.
181
10/08/2015
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Randall Knuth.
182
10/09/2015
NOTICE of Deposition of EDWARD J. BERGHAUSEN, M.D., filed by Randall Knuth.
183
10/09/2015
RESPONSE to Motion re: 156 MOTION to Compel Requests for Production No. 62 and 63 filed by Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, Unum Group.
184
10/09/2015
NOTICE re: Intent to Issue Subpoenas for Production of Documents by Randall Knuth.
1
Exhibit Subpoena Duces Tecum
2
Exhibit Subpoena Duces Tecum
2 Attachments
185
10/13/2015
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Melissa M. Cowan by Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, Unum Group.
1
Certificate of Good Standing
2
Certificate of Service
2 Attachments
10/14/2015
PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 35, receipt number PHX163846 as to Melissa M Cowan. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (Text entry; no document attached.)
186
10/14/2015
ORDER pursuant to General Order 09-08 granting 185 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. Counsel is advised that they are limited to two (2) additional e-mail addresses in their District of Arizona User Account. (BAS) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
187
10/15/2015
NOTICE of Deposition of Lisa Ordonez, filed by Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, Unum Group.
188
10/16/2015
REPLY to Response to Motion re: 156 MOTION to Compel Requests for Production No. 62 and 63 filed by Randall Knuth.
1
Exhibit Ex. 19 - Benson Deposition Excerpts
2
Exhibit Ex. 20 - Filed Under Seal
3
Exhibit Ex. 21 - Philbin Deposition Excerpts
4
Exhibit Ex. 22 - McKinnon Email
4 Attachments
189
10/16/2015
NOTICE re: LODGING UNDER SEAL and CERTIFICATION OF COUNSEL by Randall Knuth re: 188 Reply to Response to Motion.
190
10/16/2015
Filed at Doc. 425 --SEALED LODGED Proposed Excerpt from Deposition of Suzanne Benson, M.D. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion or Stipulation to Seal is granted. Filed by Randall Knuth.
1
https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/doc1/025115019369" onClick="goDLS{{'/doc1/025115019369','885354','476','','2','1','',''}};">1</a> Exhibit Ex. 20 - Page 152 of Benson Deposition) Modified on 5/13/2016
1 Attachment
191
10/16/2015
MOTION for Protective Order by Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, Unum Group.
1
Exhibit Declaration
2
Text of Proposed Order
2 Attachments
192
10/16/2015
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Unum Group.
193
10/16/2015
Response in Opposition to 160 MOTION PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR EXCEPTIONAL RELIEF FROM SCHEDULING ORDER AND TO SET REASONABLE FEE FOR EXPERT WITNESS DEPOSITION RE: DR. BERGHAUSEN (Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Exceptional Relief from Scheduling Order and to Set Reasonable Fee for Expert Witness Deposition of Dr. Berghausen) filed by Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, Unum Group., changed event from affidavit to response to motion.
1
Declaration of Stephen M. Bressler
2
Exhibit A to Stephen M. Bressler Declaration
3
https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/doc1/025115021153" onClick="goDLS{{'/doc1/025115021153','885354','482','','2','1','',''}};">3</a> Declaration of Pamela McMillian) Modified on 10/19/2015
3 Attachments
194
10/16/2015
MOTION to Quash Subpoena Served on Third-Party Witness and Designated Defense Expert Edward J. Berghausen, M.D.; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof by Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, Unum Group.
1
Declaration of Stephen M. Bressler
2
Exhibit A to Stephen M. Bressler Declaration
3
Declaration of Pamela McMillian
4
Text of Proposed Order
4 Attachments
195
10/16/2015
RESPONSE to Plaintiff's Supplemental Memorandum by Defendants Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, Unum Group.
1
Declaration
2
Exhibit
3
Declaration
3 Attachments
196
10/19/2015
NOTICE re: re: SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS OBJECTION TO CONFIDENTIALITY DESIGNATION by Randall Knuth.
197
10/20/2015
NOTICE of Deposition of Randall Prust, MD, filed by Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, Unum Group.
198
10/21/2015
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Randall Knuth.
199
10/21/2015
NOTICE re: of Service of Defendants' First Supplemental Disclosure Statement by Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, Unum Group.
200
10/26/2015
*MOTION RULE 26(b)(5)(B) MOTION FOR DETERMINATION AS TO PRIVILEGE (Redacted) by Randall Knuth.
1
Exhibit Ex. 1 - Claim File Excerpts
2
Exhibit Ex. 2 - Filed Under Seal
3
Exhibit Ex. 3 - Communication between Counsel
4
Exhibit Ex. 4 - Unum Claims Manual Excerpts
5
Exhibit Ex. 5 - Filed Under Seal
6
Exhibit Ex. 6 - Privilege Log
7
Exhibit Ex. 7 - Unum Claims Manual Excerpts
8
https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/doc1/025115058071" onClick="goDLS{{'/doc1/025115058071','885354','501','','2','1','',''}};">8</a> Text of Proposed Order) *Modified restriction to seal for attchment #1 on 10/26/2015
8 Attachments
201
10/26/2015
DECLARATION of Jeffrey K. Rubin re: 200 MOTION RULE 26(b)(5)(B) MOTION FOR DETERMINATION AS TO PRIVILEGE (Redacted) by Plaintiff Randall Knuth.
202
10/26/2015
NOTICE of Confidential Doc. Designation Lodging & Certification of Counsel pursuant to LRCiv.5.6.d.
203
10/26/2015
(Filed at 316)-SEALED LODGED Proposed Un-redacted Motion & Exhibits Filed Under Seal re: 200 MOTION RULE 26(b)(5)(B) MOTION FOR DETERMINATION AS TO PRIVILEGE (Redacted) re: 256 Motion to Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion or Stipulation to Seal is granted. Filed by Randall Knuth.
1
Exhibit Attachment 1 - Un-redacted Motion for Determination as to Privilege
2
Exhibit Ex. 2 to Motion
3
https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/doc1/025115058115" onClick="goDLS{{'/doc1/025115058115','885354','508','','2','1','',''}};">3</a> Exhibit Ex. 5 to Motion) *Modified to add link to motion to seal on 11/13/2015 (CEI). Modified on 12/14/2015
3 Attachments
204
10/26/2015
Third MOTION to Compel Further Deposition Testimony by Randall Knuth.
1
Exhibit Ex. 1 - Robin Rose Deposition Excerpts
2
Exhibit Ex. 2 - Diane Cahill Deposition Excerpts
3
Exhibit Ex. 3 - Claim File Excerpts
4
Exhibit Ex. 4 - Jerome Philbin, M.D., Deposition Excerpts
5
Exhibit Ex. 5 - Rubin letter to Bressler & Maguire
6
Text of Proposed Order
6 Attachments
205
10/26/2015
DECLARATION of Jeffrey K. Rubin re: 204 Third MOTION to Compel Further Deposition Testimony by Plaintiff Randall Knuth.
206
10/26/2015
RESPONSE in Opposition re: 177 MOTION to Quash Subpoena Duces Tecum to (1) Health Care Consulting and Accounting, PLLC and (2) Metzger, Klawon & Fox, PLC filed by Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, Unum Group.
1
Declaration of Daniel W. Maguire
2
Exhibit A to Declaration of Daniel W. Maguire
3
Exhibit B to Declaration of Daniel W. Maguire
3 Attachments
207
10/26/2015
Fourth MOTION to Compel (TO ENFORCE COURT ORDER, DOC. 169) AND SUPPORTING MEMORANDUM AND REQUEST FOR EXPEDITED RULING by Randall Knuth.
1
Exhibit Ex. 1 - Discovery Response Excerpts
2
Errata Ex. 2 - Filed Under Seal
3
Exhibit Ex. 3 - Filed Under Seal
4
Text of Proposed Order
4 Attachments
208
10/26/2015
DECLARATION of Jeffrey K. Rubin re: 207 Fourth MOTION to Compel (TO ENFORCE COURT ORDER, DOC. 169) AND SUPPORTING MEMORANDUM AND REQUEST FOR EXPEDITED RULING by Plaintiff Randall Knuth.
209
10/26/2015
NOTICE of Confidential Doc. Designation Lodging & Certification of Counsel pursuant to LRCiv.5.6.d.
210
10/26/2015
(Filed at 317)-SEALED LODGED Proposed Notice of Lodging Under Seal With Proposed Sealed Exhibits re: 207 Fourth MOTION to Compel (TO ENFORCE COURT ORDER, DOC. 169) AND SUPPORTING MEMORANDUM AND REQUEST FOR EXPEDITED RULING re: 248 Motion to Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion or Stipulation to Seal is granted. Filed by Randall Knuth.
1
Exhibit Un-Redacted Motion to Compel
2
Exhibit Ex. 2 to Motion - Learning Logs
3
https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/doc1/025115060045" onClick="goDLS{{'/doc1/025115060045','885354','527','','2','1','',''}};">3</a> Exhibit Ex. 3 to Motion - Letter to Defense Counsel) *Modified to add link to motion to seal on 11/13/2015 (CEI). Modified on 12/14/2015
3 Attachments
211
10/26/2015
MOTION to Seal Document 200 MOTION RULE 26(b)(5)(B) MOTION FOR DETERMINATION AS TO PRIVILEGE (Redacted) by Randall Knuth.
1
Text of Proposed Order
1 Attachment
212
10/26/2015
NOTICE of Errata re: 200 MOTION RULE 26(b)(5)(B) MOTION FOR DETERMINATION AS TO PRIVILEGE (Redacted) by Plaintiff Randall Knuth.
1
Exhibit Ex. 1 - Redacted
1 Attachment
213
10/26/2015
ORDER granting 131 Motion for Protective Order Regarding Confidentiality Designations. Signed by Magistrate Judge D Thomas Ferraro on 10/26/2015. (See attached Order for complete information)
214
10/26/2015
REPLY to Response to Motion re: 194 MOTION to Quash Subpoena Served on Third-Party Witness and Designated Defense Expert Edward J. Berghausen, M.D.; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof, 160 MOTION PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR EXCEPTIONAL RELIEF FROM SCHEDULING ORDER AND TO SET REASONABLE FEE FOR EXPERT WITNESS DEPOSITION RE: DR. BERGHAUSEN PLAINTIFFS REPLY TO DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR EXCEPTIONAL RELIEF FROM SCHEDULING ORDER AND TO SET REASONABLE FEE FOR EXPERT WITNESS DEPOSITION OF DR. BERGHAUSEN filed by Randall Knuth.
215
10/27/2015
ORDER that the Clerk of Court shall file on the public record Exhibits 8, 9, and 10 to Plaintiff's Response in Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Protective Order Re Confidentiality Designations (Doc. 140), which were lodged at Doc. 142. Signed by Magistrate Judge D Thomas Ferraro on 10/26/2015.
216
10/27/2015
Additional Attachments to Main Document re: Exhibits 8, 9, and 10 to 140 Response to Motion by Plaintiff Randall Knuth.
1
Exhibit 9
2
https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/doc1/025115063009" onClick="goDLS{{'/doc1/025115063009','885354','545','','2','1','',''}};">2</a> Exhibit 10)
2 Attachments
217
10/28/2015
NOTICE of Deposition of Michael F. Hannley, filed by Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, Unum Group.
218
10/30/2015
Fifth MOTION to Compel Documents pursuant to Discovery Requests by Randall Knuth.
1
Exhibit 1
2
Exhibit 2
3
Exhibit 3
4
Exhibit 4
5
Exhibit 5
6
Exhibit 6
7
Exhibit 7
8
Proposed Order
8 Attachments
219
10/31/2015
Sixth MOTION to Compel REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION NOS. 116-122, 125-131, 133, 138, 142, 143, 144, 145-151, 152, 155, 165, 167-68 by Randall Knuth.
1
Exhibit Exhibit 1
2
Exhibit Exhibit 2
3
Exhibit Exhibit 3
4
Exhibit Exhibit 4 - Lodged Under Seal
5
Exhibit Exhibit 5 - Lodged Under Seal
6
Exhibit Exhibit 6 - Lodged Under Seal
7
Exhibit Exhibit 7 - Lodged Under Seal
8
Exhibit Exhibit 8 - Lodged Under Seal
9
Exhibit Exhibit 9 - Lodged Under Seal
10
Exhibit Exhibit 10 - Lodged Under Seal
11
Exhibit Exhibit 11
12
Exhibit Exhibit 12 - Lodged Under Seal
13
Exhibit Exhibit 13
14
Exhibit Exhibit 14
15
Exhibit Exhibit 15
16
Exhibit Exhibit 16
17
Exhibit Exhibit 17 - Lodged Under Seal
18
Exhibit Exhibit 18
19
Exhibit Exhibit 19 - Lodged Under Seal
20
Exhibit Exhibit 20
21
Exhibit Exhibit 21
22
Exhibit Exhibit 22
23
Exhibit Exhibit 23
24
Exhibit Exhibit 24
25
Exhibit Exhibit 25
26
Exhibit Exhibit 26
27
Exhibit Exhibit 27
28
Exhibit Exhibit 28
29
Exhibit Exhibit 29
30
Exhibit Exhibit 30
31
Exhibit Exhibit 31
32
Exhibit Exhibit 32
33
Text of Proposed Order
33 Attachments
220
10/31/2015
DECLARATION of Jeffrey K. Rubin in Support of Plaintiff's 6th Motion to Compel re: 219 Sixth MOTION to Compel REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION NOS. 116-122, 125-131, 133, 138, 142, 143, 144, 145-151, 152, 155, 165, 167-68 by Plaintiff Randall Knuth.
221
10/31/2015
NOTICE re: LODGING UNDER SEAL and CERTIFICATION OF COUNSEL re: PLAINTIFF'S 6th MOTION TO COMPEL by Randall Knuth re: 219 Sixth MOTION to Compel REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION NOS. 116-122, 125-131, 133, 138, 142, 143, 144, 145-151, 152, 155, 165, 167-68.
222
10/31/2015
Filed in part at 318 ; Filed in part at 336 - SEALED LODGED Proposed Notice of Lodging Under Seal With Proposed Sealed Exhibits re: 219 Sixth MOTION to Compel REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION NOS. 116-122, 125-131, 133, 138, 142, 143, 144, 145-151, 152, 155, 165, 167-68. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion or Stipulation to Seal is granted. Filed by Randall Knuth.
1
Exhibit Un-redacted 6th Motion to Compel
2
Exhibit Exhibit 4
3
Exhibit Exhibit 5
4
Exhibit Exhibit 6
5
Exhibit Exhibit 7
6
Exhibit Exhibit 8
7
Exhibit Exhibit 9
8
Exhibit Exhibit 10
9
Exhibit Exhibit 12
10
Exhibit Exhibit 17
11
https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/doc1/025115085391" onClick="goDLS{{'/doc1/025115085391','885354','560','','2','1','',''}};">11</a> Exhibit Exhibit 19) Modified on 12/15/2015 (CEI). Modified on 12/18/2015
11 Attachments
223
11/02/2015
NOTICE of Deposition of Scott Styrmoe, filed by Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, Unum Group.
1
Subpoena to Testify
1 Attachment
224
11/02/2015
RESPONSE in Opposition re: 194 MOTION to Quash Subpoena Served on Third-Party Witness and Designated Defense Expert Edward J. Berghausen, M.D.; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Randall Knuth.
1
Exhibit 1
2
Exhibit 2
3
Exhibit 3
4
Exhibit 4
5
Exhibit 5
6
Exhibit 6
7
Exhibit 7
8
Exhibit 8
9
Exhibit 9
10
Exhibit 10
11
Exhibit 11
12
Exhibit 12
13
Exhibit 13
14
Exhibit 14
14 Attachments
225
11/02/2015
DECLARATION of Jeffrey K. Rubin re: 224 Response in Opposition to Motion to Quash Subpoena Served on Third-Party Witness and Designated Defense Expert Edward J. Berghausen, M.D. filed by Randall Knuth.
226
11/02/2015
Seventh MOTION to Compel RFPS 172, 178, 179, 181, 183-186 and Supporting Memorandum by Randall Knuth.
1
Exhibit Exhibit 1
2
Exhibit Exhibit 2
3
Exhibit Exhibit 3
4
Exhibit Exhibit 4
5
Exhibit Exhibit 5 Lodged Under Seal
6
Exhibit Exhibit 6 Lodged Under Seal
7
Exhibit Exhibit 7 Lodged Under Seal
8
Exhibit Exhibit 8 Lodged Under Seal
9
Exhibit Exhibit 9
10
Exhibit Exhibit 10 Lodged Under Seal
11
Exhibit Exhibit 11
12
Exhibit Exhibit 12
13
Exhibit Exhibit 13
14
Exhibit Exhibit 14
15
Exhibit Exhibit 15
16
Text of Proposed Order
16 Attachments
227
11/02/2015
DECLARATION of Jeffrey K. Rubin in Support of Plaintiff's 7th Motion to Compel re: 226 Seventh MOTION to Compel RFPS 172, 178, 179, 181, 183-186 and Supporting Memorandum by Plaintiff Randall Knuth.
228
11/02/2015
NOTICE re: Notice of Lodging Under Seal & Certification of Counsel by Randall Knuth re: 226 Seventh MOTION to Compel RFPS 172, 178, 179, 181, 183-186 and Supporting Memorandum, 227 Declaration.
229
11/02/2015
Filed at Doc. 319 --SEALED LODGED Proposed Notice of Lodging Under Seal With Proposed Sealed Exhibits re: 226 Seventh MOTION to Compel RFPS 172, 178, 179, 181, 183-186 and Supporting Memorandum. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion or Stipulation to Seal is granted. Filed by Randall Knuth.
1
Exhibit Un-redacted Motion to Compel
2
Exhibit Exhibit 5 Under Seal
3
Exhibit Exhibit 6 Under Seal
4
Exhibit Exhibit 7 Under Seal
5
Exhibit Exhibit 8 Under Seal
6
https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/doc1/025115087827" onClick="goDLS{{'/doc1/025115087827','885354','581','','2','1','',''}};">6</a> Exhibit Exhibit 10 Under Seal) Modified on 12/15/2015
6 Attachments
230
11/02/2015
Eighth MOTION to Compel REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION 192, 193, 196 and SUPPORTING MEMORANDUM by Randall Knuth.
1
Exhibit
2
Exhibit
3
Exhibit
4
Exhibit
5
Exhibit
6
Text of Proposed Order
6 Attachments
231
11/02/2015
DECLARATION of Jeffrey K. Rubin in Support of Plaintiff's 8th Motion to Compel re: 230 Eighth MOTION to Compel REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION 192, 193, 196 and SUPPORTING MEMORANDUM by Plaintiff Randall Knuth.
232
11/02/2015
NOTICE re: Notice of Lodging Under Seal & Certification of Counsel by Randall Knuth re: 230 Eighth MOTION to Compel REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION 192, 193, 196 and SUPPORTING MEMORANDUM, 231 Declaration.
233
11/02/2015
Filed in part at 320 ; filed in part at 337 - SEALED LODGED Proposed Notice of Lodging Under Seal With Proposed Sealed Exhibits re: 230 Eighth MOTION to Compel REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION 192, 193, 196 and SUPPORTING MEMORANDUM. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion or Stipulation to Seal is granted. Filed by Randall Knuth.
1
Exhibit Un-Redacted Motion to Compel
2
Exhibit Exhibit 1 - with highlights
3
Exhibit Exhibit 2 - with highlights
4
Exhibit Exhibit 3 - with highlights
5
https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/doc1/025115088053" onClick="goDLS{{'/doc1/025115088053','885354','593','','2','1','',''}};">5</a> Exhibit Exhibit 5 Lodged Under Seal) Modified on 12/15/2015 (CEI). Modified on 12/18/2015
5 Attachments
234
11/02/2015
Ninth MOTION to Compel PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO DEEM REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ADMITTED OR COMPEL AUTHENTICATION OF DOCUMENTS by Randall Knuth.
1
Exhibit 1
2
Exhibit 2
3
Exhibit 3
4
Exhibit 4
5
Exhibit 5
6
Text of Proposed Order
6 Attachments
235
11/02/2015
DECLARATION of Jeffrey K. Rubin re: 234 Ninth MOTION to Compel PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO DEEM REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ADMITTED OR COMPEL AUTHENTICATION OF DOCUMENTS by Plaintiff Randall Knuth.
236
11/02/2015
DECLARATION of Jeffrey K. Rubin re: 218 Fifth MOTION to Compel Documents pursuant to Discovery Requests by Plaintiff Randall Knuth.
237
11/02/2015
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, Unum Group.
238
11/02/2015
*RESPONSE to Motion re: 191 MOTION for Protective Order, Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Randall Knuth.
1
Exhibit
2
Exhibit
3
Exhibit
4
Exhibit
5
Exhibit
6
Exhibit
7
Exhibit
8
Exhibit
9
Exhibit
10
Exhibit
11
Exhibit
12
Exhibit Exhibit L - Filed Under Seal
13
Exhibit
14
https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/doc1/025115090892" onClick="goDLS{{'/doc1/025115090892','885354','606','','2','1','',''}};">14</a> Exhibit) *Modified to correct event type on 11/3/2015
14 Attachments
239
11/02/2015
*NOTICE re: of Filing Under Seal & Certification of Counsel by Randall Knuth re: 238 RESPONSE to Motion. *Modified to correct docket text for doc. 238 on 11/3/2015
240
11/02/2015
Filed at Doc. 321 --SEALED LODGED Proposed Lodging Under Seal - With Sealed Exhibit. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion or Stipulation to Seal is granted. Filed by Randall Knuth.
1
https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/doc1/025115090899" onClick="goDLS{{'/doc1/025115090899','885354','615','','2','1','',''}};">1</a> Exhibit Exhibit L - Under Seal) Modified on 12/15/2015
1 Attachment
241
11/05/2015
MOTION for Extension of Time Unopposed Motion to Extend Dispositive Motion Filing Deadline by Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, Unum Group.
1
Text of Proposed Order
1 Attachment
242
11/05/2015
NOTICE of Deposition of Scott Styrmoe (Amended), filed by Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, Unum Group.
243
11/05/2015
REPLY to Response to Motion re: 177 MOTION to Quash Subpoena Duces Tecum filed by Randall Knuth.
1
Exhibit 8 - Part 1
2
Exhibit 8 - Part 2
3
Exhibit 9
4
Exhibit 10
5
Exhibit 11
6
Exhibit 12
6 Attachments
244
11/05/2015
DECLARATION of Jeffrey K. Rubin re: 243 Reply to Response to Motion to Quash Subpoena Duces Tecum by Plaintiff Randall Knuth.
245
11/06/2015
NOTICE re: Service re: Plaintiff's Objection to Confidentiality Designations by Randall Knuth.
246
11/10/2015
NOTICE re: SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS OBJECTION TO CONFIDENTIALITY DESIGNATIONS by Randall Knuth re: Diane Cahill.
247
11/10/2015
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, Unum Group.
248
11/12/2015
*MOTION to Seal Document 210 Exhibits 2 and 3 by Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, Unum Group.
1
https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/doc1/025115125821" onClick="goDLS{{'/doc1/025115125821','885354','633','','2','1','',''}};">1</a> Text of Proposed Order) *Modified to correct document link and text on 11/13/2015
1 Attachment
249
11/12/2015
RESPONSE to Motion re: 207 Fourth MOTION to Compel (TO ENFORCE COURT ORDER, DOC. 169) AND SUPPORTING MEMORANDUM AND REQUEST FOR EXPEDITED RULING filed by Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, Unum Group.
250
11/12/2015
REPLY to Response to Motion re: 191 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, Unum Group.
1
Exhibit A
1 Attachment
251
11/12/2015
REPLY to Response to Motion re: 194 MOTION to Quash Subpoena Served on Third-Party Witness and Designated Defense Expert Edward J. Berghausen, M.D.; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, Unum Group.
252
11/12/2015
APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION TO DISTRICT COURT by Randall Knuth re: 213 Order on Motion for Protective Order.
253
11/12/2015
*RESPONSE to Motion re: 200 MOTION RULE 26(b)(5)(B) MOTION FOR DETERMINATION AS TO PRIVILEGE (Redacted) and CROSS MOTION TO DISQUALIFY PLANTIFF'S COUNSEL AND STRIKE UN-REDACTED BRIEF filed by Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, Unum Group.
1
https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/doc1/025115130972" onClick="goDLS{{'/doc1/025115130972','885354','649','','2','1','',''}};">1</a> Exhibit A-J) *Modified to correct event type on 11/13/2015
1 Attachment
254
11/12/2015
SEALED LODGED Proposed Exhibit to Doc. 253. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion or Stipulation to Seal is granted. Filed by Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, Unum Group.
1
Exhibit C
1 Attachment
255
11/12/2015
RESPONSE in Opposition re: 204 Third MOTION to Compel Further Deposition Testimony (Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Third Motion to Compel) filed by Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, Unum Group.
1
Declaration of Daniel W. Maguire In Support of Opposition to Plaintiff's Third Motion to Compel
2
Exhibit A to Declaration of Daniel W. Maguire
3
Exhibit B to Declaration of Daniel W. Maguire
3 Attachments
256
11/12/2015
MOTION to Seal Document 202 Notice of Confidential Doc. Designation Lodging (LRCiv 5.6.(d)) by Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, Unum Group.
1
Text of Proposed Order
1 Attachment
257
11/13/2015
ORDER Defendants' Motion to Extend (Doc. 241) is GRANTED. The dispositive motion filing deadline is extended to 1/4/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge D Thomas Ferraro on 11/12/2015.
258
11/16/2015
RESPONSE to Motion re: 218 Fifth MOTION to Compel Documents pursuant to Discovery Requests filed by Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, Unum Group.
259
11/18/2015
MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Portions of Sara McKinnon's Deposition Testimony by Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, Unum Group.
1
Exhibit A
2
Exhibit B
3
Text of Proposed Order
3 Attachments
260
11/19/2015
*MOTION to Seal Document 126 Exhibits by Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, Unum Group.
1
https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/doc1/025115157048" onClick="goDLS{{'/doc1/025115157048','885354','675','','2','1','',''}};">1</a> Text of Proposed Order) *Modified link on 11/20/2015
1 Attachment
261
11/19/2015
*MOTION to Seal Document 190 Exhibits by Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, Unum Group.
1
https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/doc1/025115157179" onClick="goDLS{{'/doc1/025115157179','885354','678','','2','1','',''}};">1</a> Text of Proposed Order) *Modified link on 11/20/2015
1 Attachment
262
11/19/2015
*MOTION to Seal Document 233 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document, 240 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document, 222 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document, 229 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document by Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, Unum Group.
1
https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/doc1/025115157439" onClick="goDLS{{'/doc1/025115157439','885354','681','','2','1','',''}};">1</a> Text of Proposed Order) *Modified link on 11/20/2015
1 Attachment
263
11/19/2015
RESPONSE to Motion re: 219 Sixth MOTION to Compel REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION NOS. 116-122, 125-131, 133, 138, 142, 143, 144, 145-151, 152, 155, 165, 167-68 filed by Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, Unum Group.
1
Exhibit
1 Attachment
264
11/19/2015
RESPONSE to Motion re: 234 Ninth MOTION to Compel PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO DEEM REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ADMITTED OR COMPEL AUTHENTICATION OF DOCUMENTS filed by Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, Unum Group.
1
Declaration of Susan Vautin
1 Attachment
265
11/19/2015
RESPONSE to Motion re: 226 Seventh MOTION to Compel RFPS 172, 178, 179, 181, 183-186 and Supporting Memorandum filed by Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, Unum Group.
1
Exhibit
1 Attachment
266
11/19/2015
*RESPONSE to Motion re: 230 Eighth MOTION to Compel REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION 192, 193, 196 and SUPPORTING MEMORANDUM (Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's 8th Motion to Compel Re: Requests for Production 192, 193 and 196 [Redacted]) filed by Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, Unum Group.
1
https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/doc1/025115159064" onClick="goDLS{{'/doc1/025115159064','885354','699','','2','1','',''}};">1</a> Declaration of Jennifer Bagley [Redacted]) * Document is not in compliance with L.R.Civ 7.1(c); attorney notified on 11/20/2015
1 Attachment
267
11/19/2015
Filed at Doc. 322 --SEALED LODGED Proposed [Unredacted] Defendants' Response to Plaintiff 8th Motion to Compel and Supporting Declaration. Document to be filed by Clerk if 268 Motion or Stipulation to Seal is granted. Filed by Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, Unum Group.
1
[Unredacted] Response (Doc. 266)
2
https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/doc1/025115160017" onClick="goDLS{{'/doc1/025115160017','885354','703','','2','1','',''}};">2</a> [Unredacted] Dec. of Jennifer Bagley (Doc. 266-1)) *Modified to link to Motion to Seal on 11/20/2015 (SCH). Modified on 12/15/2015
2 Attachments
268
11/19/2015
MOTION to Seal Document 267 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document by Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, Unum Group.
1
Declaration of Holly Crawford
2
Text of Proposed Order
2 Attachments
269
11/20/2015
NOTICE of Deposition of Scott Styrmoe (Second Amended), filed by Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, Unum Group.
270
11/23/2015
Pursuant to LRCiv 7.2(f) of the Rules of Practice of the United States District Court for the District of Arizona, IT IS ORDERED setting TELEPHONIC oral argument re: 177 MOTION to Quash Subpoena Duces Tecum filed by Randall Knuth, 194 MOTION to Quash Subpoena Served on Third-Party Witness and Designated Defense Expert Edward J. Berghausen, M.D. filed by Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Unum Group, Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, 160 MOTION FOR EXCEPTIONAL RELIEF FROM SCHEDULING ORDER AND TO SET REASONABLE FEE FOR EXPERT WITNESS DEPOSITION RE: DR. BERGHAUSEN filed by Randall Knuth, 204 Third MOTION to Compel Further Deposition Testimony filed by Randall Knuth, 191 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Unum Group, Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, 207 Fourth MOTION to Compel AND REQUEST FOR EXPEDITED RULING filed by Randall Knuth, 156 MOTION to Compel Requests for Production No. 62 and 63 filed by Randall Knuth. Motion Hearing set for 12/1/2015 at 03:30PM before Magistrate Judge D Thomas Ferraro. The Court will initiate the call. Ordered by Magistrate Judge D Thomas Ferraro. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.)
271
11/23/2015
REPLY to Response to Motion re: 207 Fourth MOTION to Compel (TO ENFORCE COURT ORDER, DOC. 169) AND SUPPORTING MEMORANDUM AND REQUEST FOR EXPEDITED RULING filed by Randall Knuth.
272
11/23/2015
DECLARATION of Jeffrey K. Rubin re: 271 Reply to Response to Motion re: 207 Fourth Motion to Compel. filed by Randall Knuth.
1
Exhibit 4
2
Exhibit 5, PART 1
3
Exhibit 5, PART 2
4
Exhibit 6
5
Exhibit 7
6
Exhibit 8
7
Exhibit 9
8
Exhibit 10
9
Exhibit 11
10
Exhibit 12
11
Exhibit 13
12
Exhibit 14
13
Exhibit 15
14
Exhibit 16
14 Attachments
273
11/23/2015
REPLY to Response to Motion re: 218 Fifth MOTION to Compel Documents pursuant to Discovery Requests filed by Randall Knuth.
274
11/23/2015
DECLARATION of Jeffrey K. Rubin re: 273 Reply to Response to Motion re: 218 Fifth Motion to Compel. filed by Randall Knuth.
275
11/23/2015
REPLY to Response to Motion re: 204 Third MOTION to Compel Further Deposition Testimony filed by Randall Knuth.
276
11/23/2015
DECLARATION of Jeffrey K. Rubin re: 275 Reply to Response to Motion re: 204 Third Motion to Compel. filed by Randall Knuth.
1
Exhibit 6
2
Exhibit 7
3
Exhibit 8
4
Exhibit 9
4 Attachments
277
11/23/2015
ORDER granting 211 Motion to Seal Document [200-1] Exhibit 1 to Plaintiff's RULE 26(b)(5)(B) MOTION FOR DETERMINATION AS TO PRIVILEGE (Redacted). Signed by Magistrate Judge D Thomas Ferraro on 11/23/2015.
278
11/23/2015
REPLY to Response to Motion re: 253 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel Motion for Determination of Privilege filed by Randall Knuth.
1
Exhibit Exhibit 9
2
Exhibit Exhibit 10
3
Exhibit Exhibit 11
3 Attachments
279
11/25/2015
STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Objection to Magistrate's October 26, 2015 Order (Doc. No. 213) by Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, Unum Group.
1
Text of Proposed Order
1 Attachment
280
11/25/2015
STIPULATION RESPONSE TO MOTION TO DISQUALIFY PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL (DOC. 253) by Randall Knuth.
1
Text of Proposed Order
1 Attachment
281
11/25/2015
REPLY to Response to Motion re: 219 Sixth MOTION to Compel REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION NOS. 116-122, 125-131, 133, 138, 142, 143, 144, 145-151, 152, 155, 165, 167-68 filed by Randall Knuth.
1
Exhibit 33
2
Exhibit 34
3
Exhibit 35
4
Exhibit 36
5
Exhibit 37 (Under Seal)
6
Exhibit 38
7
Exhibit 39
8
Exhibit 40
9
Exhibit 41
10
Exhibit 42
11
Exhibit 43 (Under Seal)
12
Exhibit 44 (Under Seal)
13
Exhibit 45
14
Exhibit 46 (Under Seal)
15
Exhibit 47 (Under Seal)
16
Exhibit 48
17
Exhibit 49
18
Exhibit 50
19
Exhibit 51
19 Attachments
282
11/25/2015
DECLARATION of Jeffrey K. Rubin re: 281 Reply to Response to Motion to Plaintiff's 6th Motion to Compel by Plaintiff Randall Knuth.
283
11/25/2015
NOTICE re: LODGING UNDER SEAL and CERTIFICATION OF COUNSEL by Randall Knuth re: 281 Reply to Response to Motion re: Plaintiff's 6th Motion to Compel.
284
11/25/2015
Filed at Doc. 426 --SEALED LODGED Proposed Notice of Lodging Under Seal With Proposed Sealed Exhibits re: 313 Motion to Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion or Stipulation to Seal is granted. Filed by Randall Knuth.
1
Exhibit Un-redacted Reply
2
Exhibit 37 - Under Seal
3
Exhibit 43 - Under Seal
4
Exhibit 44 - Under Seal
5
Exhibit 46 - Under Seal
6
https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/doc1/025115183245" onClick="goDLS{{'/doc1/025115183245','885354','760','','2','1','',''}};">6</a> Exhibit 47 - Under Seal) *Modified to add link to motion to seal on 12/15/2015 (CEI). Modified on 5/13/2016
6 Attachments
285
11/25/2015
ORDER pursuant to 279 Stipulation : Defendants The Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, and Unum Group may have up to, and including, Monday, December 7, 2015 to file their response to Plaintiff's Objection to Magistrate's October 26, 2015 Order (Doc. No. 252). Signed by Chief Judge Raner C Collins on 11/25/2015.
286
11/25/2015
ORDER that the 280 Stipulation is GRANTED. Plaintiff's response to the cross-motion filed at Doc. 253 shall be filed on or before December 7,2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge D Thomas Ferraro on 11/25/2015.
287
11/30/2015
REPLY to Response to Motion re: 226 Seventh MOTION to Compel RFPS 172, 178, 179, 181, 183-186 and Supporting Memorandum filed by Randall Knuth.
1
Exhibit 16 - McKinnon Deposition Excerpts
2
Exhibit 17 - Filed Under Seal
3
Exhibit 18 - Filed Under Seal
3 Attachments
288
11/30/2015
DECLARATION of Jeffrey K. Rubin re: 287 Reply to Response to Motion to Compel (#7) by Plaintiff Randall Knuth.
289
11/30/2015
NOTICE re: LODGING UNDER SEAL and CERTIFICATION OF COUNSEL (IN CONNECTION WITH PLAINTIFFS REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS 7TH MOTION TO COMPEL) by Randall Knuth re: 287 Reply to Response to Motion.
290
11/30/2015
Filed at Doc. 428 --SEALED LODGED Proposed Notice of Lodging Under Seal With Proposed Sealed Exhibits re: 226 Seventh MOTION to Compel RFPS 172, 178, 179, 181, 183-186 and Supporting Memorandum. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion or Stipulation to Seal is granted. Filed by Randall Knuth.
1
Exhibit Un-Redacted Reply
2
Exhibit Exhibit 17 - Filed Under Seal
3
https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/doc1/025115187892" onClick="goDLS{{'/doc1/025115187892','885354','779','','2','1','',''}};">3</a> Exhibit Exhibit 18 - Filed Under Seal) Modified on 5/13/2016
3 Attachments
291
11/30/2015
REPLY to Response to Motion re: 230 Eighth MOTION to Compel REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION 192, 193, 196 and SUPPORTING MEMORANDUM (Redacted) filed by Randall Knuth.
292
11/30/2015
NOTICE re: LODGING UNDER SEAL and CERTIFICATION OF COUNSEL re: PLAINTIFF's 8th MOTION TO COMPEL by Randall Knuth re: 291 Reply to Response to Motion.
293
11/30/2015
Filed at Doc. 393 --SEALED LODGED Proposed Lodging Under Seal - With Sealed Exhibit re: 230 Eighth MOTION to Compel REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION 192, 193, 196 and SUPPORTING MEMORANDUM. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion or Stipulation to Seal is granted. Filed by Randall Knuth.
1
https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/doc1/025115188023" onClick="goDLS{{'/doc1/025115188023','885354','788','','2','1','',''}};">1</a> Exhibit Un-redacted Reply) Modified on 4/4/2016
1 Attachment
294
11/30/2015
REPLY to Response to Motion re: 234 Ninth MOTION to Compel PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO DEEM REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ADMITTED OR COMPEL AUTHENTICATION OF DOCUMENTS filed by Randall Knuth.
295
11/30/2015
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Randall Knuth.
296
12/01/2015
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge D Thomas Ferraro: Telephonic Hearing held on 12/1/2015. Oral argument held on discovery matters. The parties make their arguments to the Court. Formal order to follow. (Recorded by COURTSMART.) Hearing held 3:40 PM to 5:15 PM.
297
12/02/2015
TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, Unum Group for proceedings held on 12/01/2015, Magistrate Judge D Thomas Ferraro hearing judge(s).
298
12/02/2015
TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Randall Knuth for proceedings held on 12/01/2015, Magistrate Judge D Thomas Ferraro hearing judge(s).
299
12/02/2015
ORDER Plaintiff's 156 Motion to Compel Re: RFPs No. 62 and 63 is GRANTED. Plaintiff's 160 Motion for Exceptional Relief from Scheduling Order and to Set Reasonable Fee for Expert Witness Deposition re: Dr. Berghausen is DENIED as moot regarding the Courts schedule and subpoena, and DENIED without prejudice as to Dr. Berghausen's fee. Defendants' 194 Motion to Quash Subpoena Served on Third-Party Witness and Designated Defense Expert Edward J. Berghausen, M.D. is GRANTED. Plaintiff's 177 Motion to Quash Subpoenas Duces Tecum is GRANTED. Defendants' 191 Motion for Protective Order is DENIED. Plaintiff's 207 Fourth Motion to Compel is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge D Thomas Ferraro on 12/1/2015. (See attached Order for details)
300
12/04/2015
MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Portions of Suzanne Benson's Deposition Testimony by Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, Unum Group.
1
Text of Proposed Order
1 Attachment
301
12/04/2015
REQUEST for Judicial Notice in Support of Defendants' Motion for Protective Order Regarding Portions of Suzanne Benson's Deposition Testimony by Defendants Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, Unum Group.
302
12/07/2015
RESPONSE re: 252 Appeal of Mag Judge Decision to Dist Court (Rule 72(a) Objection) by Defendants Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, Unum Group.
303
12/07/2015
RESPONSE in Opposition re: 259 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Portions of Sara McKinnon's Deposition Testimony filed by Randall Knuth.
1
Exhibit Defendants' Confidential Designations
2
Exhibit McKinnon Deposition Excerpts
3
Exhibit McKinnon Deposition Exhibit 5
4
Exhibit Cahill Email
4 Attachments
304
12/07/2015
Filed at Doc. 430 --SEALED LODGED Proposed Notice of Lodging Under Seal With Proposed Sealed Exhibit re: 259 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Portions of Sara McKinnon's Deposition Testimony. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion or Stipulation to Seal is granted. Filed by Randall Knuth.
1
https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/doc1/025115221174" onClick="goDLS{{'/doc1/025115221174','885354','816','','2','1','',''}};">1</a> Exhibit Deposition Excerpts Filed Under Seal) Modified on 5/13/2016
1 Attachment
305
12/07/2015
RESPONSE in Opposition re: 253 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel filed by Randall Knuth.
1
Exhibit 9 - Defendants' Initial Disclosure Statement
2
Exhibit 10 - Mauer - Haas Exhibits
3
Exhibit 11 - Various Deposition Excerpts
3 Attachments
306
12/07/2015
DECLARATION of Patrick W. Mause re: 305 Response in Opposition to Motion Defendants' Cross-Motion for Disqualification by Plaintiff Randall Knuth.
1
Exhibit 1
2
Exhibit 2
3
Exhibit 3
4
Exhibit 4
5
Exhibit 5
6
Exhibit 6
6 Attachments
307
12/07/2015
DECLARATION of Lynda C. Shely re: 305 Response in Opposition to Motion Defendants' Cross-Motion for Disqualification by Plaintiff Randall Knuth.
308
12/07/2015
DECLARATION of Steven C. Dawson re: 305 Response in Opposition to Motion Defendants' Cross-Motion for Disqualification by Plaintiff Randall Knuth.
1
Exhibit A
1 Attachment
309
12/07/2015
Filed at Doc. 429 --SEALED LODGED Proposed Notice of Lodging Under Seal with Un-redacted Plaintiffs Response to Defendants Cross-Motion for Disqualification. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion or Stipulation to Seal is granted. Filed by Randall Knuth.
1
https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/doc1/025115221307" onClick="goDLS{{'/doc1/025115221307','885354','832','','2','1','',''}};">1</a> Exhibit Un-redacted Response) Modified on 5/13/2016
1 Attachment
310
12/08/2015
TRANSCRIPT of ORAL ARGUMENT held on 12/01/2015, before Judge D. THOMAS FERRARO. Transcriber Cindy J. Shearman. The ordering party will have electronic access to the transcript immediately. All others may view the transcript at the court public terminal or it may be purchased through the Transcriber by filing a Transcript Order Form on the docket before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/29/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/8/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/7/2016.
311
12/10/2015
MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Portions of Diane Cahill's Deposition Testimony by Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, Unum Group.
1
Text of Proposed Order
1 Attachment
312
12/14/2015
NOTICE re: SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS OBJECTION TO CONFIDENTIALITY DESIGNATIONS by Randall Knuth (re: Mary Fuller).
313
12/14/2015
MOTION to Seal Document - Unredacted Reply and Exhibits Filed Under Seal at Doc. 284 by Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, Unum Group.
1
Text of Proposed Order
1 Attachment
314
12/14/2015
RESPONSE in Opposition re: 311 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Portions of Diane Cahill's Deposition Testimony filed by Randall Knuth.
1
Exhibit Flynn Email
2
Exhibit Flynn Email
3
Exhibit Beltran Email
4
Exhibit Confidential Designations
4 Attachments
315
12/14/2015
ORDER granting Motions to Seal (Docs. 248, 256, 262, 268. The Clerk of Court shall SEAL Plaintiffs Rule 26(b)(5)(B) Motion for Determination as to Privilege (unredacted), and Exhibits 2 and 5; Plaintiffs 4th Motion to Compel (unredacted) and Exhibits 2 and 3; Plaintiffs 6th Motion to Compel (unredacted) and Exhibits 4, 5, 6 and 12; Plaintiffs 7th Motion to Compel (unredacted) and Exhibits 5, 6, 7, 8, and 10; Plaintiffs 8th Motion to Compel (unredacted) and Exhibit 5; Plaintiffs Response to Defendants Motion for Protective Order, Exhibit L; and Defendants Response to Plaintiffs 8th Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge D Thomas Ferraro on 12/11/2015.
316
12/14/2015
SEALED MOTION for Rule 26(b)(5)(B) Motion for Determination as to Privilege (Redacted) by Randall Knuth.
1
Exhibit 2 to Motion
2
https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/doc1/025115249725" onClick="goDLS{{'/doc1/025115249725','885354','851','','2','1','',''}};">2</a> Exhibit 5 to Motion)
2 Attachments
317
12/14/2015
SEALED Fourth MOTION to Compel (to Enforce Court Order, Doc. 169) and Supporting Memorandum and Request for Expedited Ruling by Randall Knuth.
1
Exhibit 2 to Motion - Learning Logs
2
https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/doc1/025115249775" onClick="goDLS{{'/doc1/025115249775','885354','853','','2','1','',''}};">2</a> Exhibit 3 to Motion - Letter to Defense Counsel)
2 Attachments
318
12/14/2015
SEALED (Unredacted) Sixth MOTION to Compel: Requests for Production Nos. 116-122, 125-131, 133, 138, 142, 143, 144, 145-151, 152, 155, 165, 167-68 and Supporting Memorandum by Randall Knuth.
1
Exhibit 4
2
Exhibit 5
3
Exhibit 6
4
https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/doc1/025115251409" onClick="goDLS{{'/doc1/025115251409','885354','858','','2','1','',''}};">4</a> Exhibit 12)
4 Attachments
319
12/14/2015
SEALED (Unredacted) Seventh MOTION to Compel - RFPS 172, 178, 179, 181, 183-186 - and Supporting Memorandum by Randall Knuth.
1
Exhibit 5
2
Exhibit 6
3
Exhibit 7
4
Exhibit 8
5
https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/doc1/025115251446" onClick="goDLS{{'/doc1/025115251446','885354','860','','2','1','',''}};">5</a> Exhibit 10)
5 Attachments
320
12/14/2015
SEALED (Unredacted) Eighth MOTION to Compel Re: Requests for Production 192, 193, 196 and Supporting Memorandum by Randall Knuth.
1
https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/doc1/025115251497" onClick="goDLS{{'/doc1/025115251497','885354','862','','2','1','',''}};">1</a> Exhibit 5)
1 Attachment
321
12/14/2015
Sealed Document: Exhibit L to 238 RESPONSE to Motion re: 191 MOTION for Protective Order, Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Randall Knuth.
322
12/14/2015
(Unredacted) RESPONSE to Motion re: 230 Eighth MOTION to Compel REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION 192, 193, 196 and SUPPORTING MEMORANDUM filed by Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, Unum Group.
1
https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/doc1/025115251712" onClick="goDLS{{'/doc1/025115251712','885354','866','','2','1','',''}};">1</a> Declaration of Jennifer Bagley)
1 Attachment
323
12/15/2015
RESPONSE to Motion re: 300 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Portions of Suzanne Benson's Deposition Testimony filed by Randall Knuth.
324
12/15/2015
Joint MOTION to Seal Document - Substitute Documents Lodged Under Seal (Docs. 124 and 228) by Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, Unum Group.
1
Text of Proposed Order
1 Attachment
325
12/15/2015
NOTICE re: Lodging Under Seal (in Connection with Joint Motion to Substitute Documents Lodged Under Seal) by Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, Unum Group.
326
12/15/2015
FILED AT DOC. 449 --SEALED LODGED Proposed Substitute Exhibit 5 to Plaintiff's Seventh Motion to Compel (Doc. 228). Document to be filed by Clerk if 324 Motion or Stipulation to Seal is granted. Filed by Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, Unum Group. *Modified to link to Motion to Seal on 12/16/2015 (SCH). Modified on 6/14/2016
327
12/15/2015
FILED AT DOC. 450 --SEALED LODGED Proposed Substitute Exhibit 8 to Plaintiff's Reply to Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Objection to Magistrate's July 1, 2015 Order (Doc. 124). Document to be filed by Clerk if 324 Motion or Stipulation to Seal is granted. Filed by Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, Unum Group. *Modified to link to Motion to Seal on 12/16/2015 (SCH). Modified on 6/14/2016
328
12/16/2015
REPLY re: 302 Response re Plaintiff's Reply In Support of Objection to Magistrate's October 26, 2015 Order (Protective Order, Doc. 213) by Plaintiff Randall Knuth.
329
12/16/2015
OBJECTION re: 299 Order, Terminate Motions Defendants' Objection to Magistrate Judge's Order at Doc. 299 by Defendants Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, Unum Group.
330
12/16/2015
DECLARATION re: 329 Objection Declaration of David Harvey by Defendants Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, Unum Group.
331
12/17/2015
REPLY to Response to Motion re: 253 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel filed by Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, Unum Group.
332
12/17/2015
REPLY to Response to Motion re: 259 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Portions of Sara McKinnon's Deposition Testimony filed by Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, Unum Group.
333
12/17/2015
MOTION to Seal Document (Un-Redacted Reply and Exhibits Filed Under Seal at Doc. 290) by Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, Unum Group.
1
Text of Proposed Order
1 Attachment
334
12/17/2015
MOTION to Seal Document (Un-Redacted Reply Filed Under Seal at Doc. 293) by Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, Unum Group.
1
Text of Proposed Order
1 Attachment
335
12/18/2015
ORDER that the Clerk of Court shall file on the public record Exhibits 7-10, 17 and 19 to Plaintiff's 6th Motion to Compel (lodged at Doc. 222), and Exhibits 1-3 (unredacted) to Plaintiff's 8th Motion to Compel (lodged at Doc. 233). Signed by Magistrate Judge D Thomas Ferraro on 12/18/2015.
336
12/18/2015
Additional Attachments to Main Document re: 319 SEALED (Unredacted) Sixth MOTION to Compel: Requests for Production Nos. 116-122, 125-131, 133, 138, 142, 143, 144, 145-151, 152, 155, 165, 167-68 and Supporting Memorandum by Plaintiff Randall Knuth.
1
Exhibit 8
2
Exhibit 9
3
Exhibit 10
4
Exhibit 17
5
https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/doc1/025115269588" onClick="goDLS{{'/doc1/025115269588','885354','905','','2','1','',''}};">5</a> Exhibit 19)
5 Attachments
337
12/18/2015
Additional Attachments to Main Document re: 320 SEALED (Unredacted) Eighth MOTION to Compel Re: Requests for Production 192, 193, 196 and Supporting Memorandum by Plaintiff Randall Knuth.
1
Exhibit 2
2
https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/doc1/025115269618" onClick="goDLS{{'/doc1/025115269618','885354','908','','2','1','',''}};">2</a> Exhibit 3)
2 Attachments
338
12/21/2015
REPLY to Response to Motion re: 311 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Portions of Diane Cahill's Deposition Testimony filed by Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, Unum Group.
339
12/21/2015
REPLY to Response to Motion re: 300 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Portions of Suzanne Benson's Deposition Testimony filed by Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, Unum Group.
340
12/21/2015
NOTICE re: of Service of Plaintiff's Objection to Confidentiality Designations re: Lisa D. Ordonez, Ph.D. by Randall Knuth.
341
12/22/2015
MOTION to Seal Document 309 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document, 304 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document by Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, Unum Group.
1
Text of Proposed Order
1 Attachment
342
12/23/2015
NOTICE of Deposition of Jack McGarry, filed by Randall Knuth.
343
12/23/2015
MOTION for Extension of Time Extension of Rule 56 Filing Deadline Pending District Court's Ruling on Defendants' Appeal of Magistrate Judge's Order by Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, Unum Group.
1
Text of Proposed Order
1 Attachment
344
12/29/2015
ORDER granting 343 Motion for Extension of Time Deadline. The dispositive motion filing deadline is extended to February 12, 2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge D Thomas Ferraro on 12/28/2015.
345
12/31/2015
RESPONSE in Opposition re: 313 MOTION to Seal Document - Unredacted Reply and Exhibits Filed Under Seal at Doc. 284 filed by Randall Knuth.
346
01/04/2016
RESPONSE re: 329 Objection TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ORDER AT DOC. 299 (DOC. 329) by Plaintiff Randall Knuth.
347
01/04/2016
NOTICE re: Service of Plaintiffs Objection to Confidentiality Designations Re: Edwin A. Locke, Ph.D. by Randall Knuth.
348
01/04/2016
RESPONSE to Motion re: 333 MOTION to Seal Document (Un-Redacted Reply and Exhibits Filed Under Seal at Doc. 290) filed by Randall Knuth.
349
01/07/2016
NOTICE of Errata re: 303 Response in Opposition to Motion for Protective Order Regarding Portions of Sara McKinnon's Deposition Testimony (Doc. 259) by Plaintiff Randall Knuth.
350
01/07/2016
*RESPONSE in Opposition re: 341 MOTION to Seal Document 309 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document, 304 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document filed by Randall Knuth. *Modified to correct event type on 1/8/2016
351
01/11/2016
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY'S CHANGE OF ADDRESS/FIRM NAME by Stephen M Bressler.
352
01/11/2016
REPLY to Response to Motion re: 313 MOTION to Seal Document - Unredacted Reply and Exhibits Filed Under Seal at Doc. 284 filed by Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, Unum Group.
353
01/12/2016
MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Portions of Mary Fuller's Deposition Testimony by Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, Unum Group.
1
Text of Proposed Order
1 Attachment
354
01/12/2016
DECLARATION of Melissa M. Cowan re: 353 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Portions of Mary Fuller's Deposition Testimony. filed by Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, Unum Group.
1
Exhibit 1
1 Attachment
355
01/12/2016
REQUEST for Judicial Notice in Support of Defendants' Motion for Protective Order Regarding Portions of Mary Fullert's Deposition Transcript by Defendants Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, Unum Group.
1
Declaration of Kelly Croce
1 Attachment
356
01/13/2016
REPLY to Response to Motion re: 333 MOTION to Seal Document (Un-Redacted Reply and Exhibits Filed Under Seal at Doc. 290) filed by Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, Unum Group.
357
01/14/2016
REPLY re: 329 Objection Defendants' Reply in Support of Objection to Magistrate Judge's Order at Doc. 299 by Defendants Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, Unum Group.
358
01/19/2016
REPLY to Response to Motion re: 341 MOTION to Seal Document 309 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document, 304 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document filed by Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, Unum Group.
359
01/19/2016
MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Portions of Lisa D. Ordonez's Deposition Testimony by Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, Unum Group.
1
Text of Proposed Order
1 Attachment
360
01/19/2016
REQUEST re: for Judicial Notice ISO Defendants' Motion for Protective Order Re Portions of Lisa D. Ordonez's Deposition Transcript by Defendants Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, Unum Group.
1
Declaration of Kelly Croce
2
Declaration of Rhonda Rigsby
2 Attachments
361
01/19/2016
MOTION for Extension of Time Defendants' Partially Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadline for McGarry Deposition by Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, Unum Group.
1
Text of Proposed Order
1 Attachment
362
01/19/2016
DECLARATION re: 361 MOTION for Extension of Time Defendants' Partially Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadline for McGarry Deposition Declaration of Daniel W. Maguire in Support of Defendants' Partially Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadline for McGarry Deposition by Defendants Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, Unum Group.
1
Exhibit A
1 Attachment
363
01/21/2016
ORDER granting 361 Defendants' Motion to Extend Deadline. The deadline to complete the deposition of Unum Group's Chief Financial Officer, John ("Jack") McGarry is extended until a date 45 days following the District Court's ruling on Defendants' pending Objection to Magistrate Judge's Order at Doc. 299. Signed by Magistrate Judge D Thomas Ferraro on 1/21/2016.
364
01/25/2016
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Randall Knuth.
365
01/26/2016
RESPONSE to Motion re: 353 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Portions of Mary Fuller's Deposition Testimony filed by Randall Knuth.
1
Exhibit
2
Exhibit
2 Attachments
366
01/26/2016
DECLARATION of Jeffrey K. Rubin re: 365 Response to Motion for Protective Order re: Portions of Mary Fuller's Deposition by Plaintiff Randall Knuth.
367
01/28/2016
MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Portions of Edwin A. Locke, Ph.D.'s Deposition Testimony by Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, Unum Group.
1
Text of Proposed Order
1 Attachment
368
01/28/2016
REQUEST re: for Judicial Notice ISO Defendants' Motion for Protective Order Re Portions of Edwin A. Locke, Ph.D.'s Deposition Transcript by Defendants Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, Unum Group.
1
Declaration of Kelly Croce
2
Declaration of Rhonda Rigsby
2 Attachments
369
01/29/2016
RESPONSE to Motion re: 359 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Portions of Lisa D. Ordonez's Deposition Testimony filed by Randall Knuth.
370
02/02/2016
REPLY to Response to Motion re: 353 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Portions of Mary Fuller's Deposition Testimony filed by Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, Unum Group.
1
Exhibit A - Declaration of Kelly Croce
1 Attachment
371
02/05/2016
*REPLY to Response to Motion re: 353 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Portions of Lisa A. Ordonez's Deposition Testimony filed by Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, Unum Group. *Modified to reflect proper name in docket text (clerk informed by attorney) on 2/5/2016
372
02/05/2016
*DECLARATION of Melissa M. Cowan re: 371 Reply to Response to Motion for Protective Order Regarding Portions of Lisa D. Ordonez's Deposition Testimony. filed by Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, Unum Group.
1
https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/doc1/025115451509" onClick="goDLS{{'/doc1/025115451509','885354','1007','','2','1','',''}};">1</a> Exhibit 1) *Modified to reflect proper name in docket text (clerk informed by attorney) on 2/5/2016
1 Attachment
373
02/05/2016
MOTION for Extension of Time Defendants' Motion to Extend February 12 Dispositive Motion Filing Deadline by Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, Unum Group.
1
Text of Proposed Order
1 Attachment
374
02/08/2016
RESPONSE in Opposition re: 373 MOTION for Extension of Time Defendants' Motion to Extend February 12 Dispositive Motion Filing Deadline - Third Request filed by Randall Knuth.
375
02/08/2016
ORDER granting 373 Defendants' Motion to extend Dispositive Motion Filing Deadline. The dispositive motion filing deadline is set to 60 days following the District Court's ruling on Defendants' pending objection to Magistrate Judge's Order at Doc. 299. Signed by Magistrate Judge D Thomas Ferraro on 2/8/2016.
376
02/12/2016
RESPONSE to Motion re: 367 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Portions of Edwin A. Locke, Ph.D.'s Deposition Testimony filed by Randall Knuth.
1
Exhibit
1 Attachment
377
02/17/2016
MOTION to Strike ERRATA SHEETS OF ROBIN ROSE AND DR. BERGAUSEN by Randall Knuth.
1
Exhibit Rose Deposition Excerpts
2
Exhibit Rose Corrections
3
Exhibit Berghausen Deposition Excerpts
4
Exhibit Berghausen Corrections
5
Exhibit Termination Letter
6
Exhibit Berghausen - Waller Deposition
7
Text of Proposed Order
7 Attachments
378
02/17/2016
DECLARATION of Steven C. Dawson re: 377 MOTION to Strike ERRATA SHEETS OF ROBIN ROSE AND DR. BERGAUSEN by Plaintiff Randall Knuth.
1
Exhibit A - Rose Exhibit
2
Exhibit B - Berghausen Exhibit
3
Exhibit C - Berghausen CV
4
Exhibit D - Berghausen - Waller
4 Attachments
379
02/19/2016
REPLY to Response to Motion re: 367 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Portions of Edwin A. Locke, Ph.D.'s Deposition Testimony Defendants' Reply in Support of Motion for Protective Order Regarding Portions of Edwin A. Locke, Ph.D's Deposition Testimony (Doc. 367) filed by Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, Unum Group.
380
02/19/2016
DECLARATION of Melissa M. Cowan re: 379 Reply to Response to Motion Declaration of Melissa M. Cowan in Support of Defendants' Reply for Motion for Protective Order Regarding Portions of Edwin A. Locke, Ph.D's Deposition Testimony (Doc. 367). filed by Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, Unum Group.
1
Exhibit 1
1 Attachment
381
03/01/2016
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Randall Knuth.
382
03/02/2016
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Randall Knuth.
383
03/07/2016
RESPONSE in Opposition re: 377 MOTION to Strike ERRATA SHEETS OF ROBIN ROSE AND DR. BERGAUSEN Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Errata Sheets of Robin Rose and Dr. Berghausen(Doc. 377) filed by Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, Unum Group.
1
Appendix to Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Errata Sheets of Robin Rose and Dr. Berghausen
1 Attachment
384
03/07/2016
DECLARATION of Stephen M. Bressler re: 383 Response in Opposition to Motion to Strike Errata Sheets of Robin Rose and Dr. Berghausen. filed by Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, Unum Group.
1
Appendix 1
2
Appendix 2
2 Attachments
385
03/07/2016
SUPPLEMENT Notice of Supplemental Authority re: 200 MOTION RULE 26(b)(5)(B) MOTION FOR DETERMINATION AS TO PRIVILEGE (Redacted), 278 Reply to Response to Motion, 204 Third MOTION to Compel Further Deposition Testimony, 275 Reply to Response to Motion, 305 Response in Opposition to Motion by Plaintiff Randall Knuth.
1
Errata
1 Attachment
386
03/10/2016
RESPONSE re: 385 Supplement Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Notice of Supplemental Authority Regarding: Motion for Determination as to Privilege (Doc. 200); Response to Defendants' Cross-Motion for Disqualification (Doc. 305); and Plaintiff's Third Motion to Compel (Doc. 204) by Defendants Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, Unum Group.
387
03/10/2016
*DECLARATION of Nancy J. Smith re: 386 Response Declaration of Nancy J. Smith in support of Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Notice of Supplemental Authority by Defendants Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, Unum Group. *Document is not in compliance with L.R.Civ 7.1(c); attorney notified on 3/11/2016
388
03/16/2016
NOTICE of Deposition of 30(b)(6) Designee - 2nd Amended Notice, filed by Randall Knuth.
389
03/16/2016
REPLY to Response to Motion re: 377 MOTION to Strike ERRATA SHEETS OF ROBIN ROSE AND DR. BERGAUSEN filed by Randall Knuth.
390
03/23/2016
NOTICE re: Notice of Supplemental Authority by Randall Knuth.
1
Exhibit 1
1 Attachment
391
03/25/2016
ORDER setting an oral argument on April 20, 2016, at 9:30 AM on the following motions: Plaintiff's Rule 26(b)(5)(B) Motion for Determination of Privilege (Doc. 200); Defendants' Cross-motion to Disqualify Plaintiff's Counsel and Strike Un-redacted Brief (Doc. 253); Plaintiff's Third Motion to Compel (Doc. 204); Plaintiff's Sixth Motion to Compel (Doc. 219); Plaintiff's Seventh Motion to Compel (Doc. 226); and Plaintiff's Motion to Deem Request for Admissions Admitted or Compel Authentication of Documents (Doc. 234). Signed by Magistrate Judge D Thomas Ferraro on 3/25/2016.
392
04/01/2016
ORDER that Plaintiff's 5th Motion to Compel (Doc. 218) is GRANTED. It is further Ordered that Plaintiff's 8th Motion to Compel (Docs. 230, 320) is DENIED as MOOT. It is further Ordered that the Court finds good cause to GRANT Defendants' unopposed Motion to Seal Plaintiff's un-redacted Reply in Support of Eighth Motion to Compel (Doc. 334). The Clerk of Court shall SEAL Plaintiff's un-redacted Reply in Support of Eighth Motion to Compel (lodged at Doc. 293). Signed by Magistrate Judge D Thomas Ferraro on 4/1/2016.
393
04/01/2016
(Unredacted) REPLY to Response to Motion re: 230 Eighth MOTION to Compel REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION 192, 193, 196 and SUPPORTING MEMORANDUM by Randall Knuth.
394
04/08/2016
ORDER the hearing set on 4/20/2016, is VACATED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, on 4/27/2016, at 9:30 AM, the Court will hearing telephonic argument on the following motions: Plaintiff's Sixth Motion to Compel (Doc. 219); Plaintiff's Seventh Motion to Compel (Doc. 226); and Plaintiff's Motion to Deem Request for Admissions Admitted or Compel Authentication of Documents (Doc. 234). The Court will initiate the call. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, on 5/19/2016, at 9:30 AM, the Court will hear argument in-person on the following motions: Plaintiff's Rule 26(b)(5)(B) Motion for Determination of Privilege (Doc. 200); Defendants' Cross-motion to Disqualify Plaintiff's Counsel and Strike Un-redacted Brief (Doc. 253); and Plaintiff's Third Motion to Compel (Doc. 204). Signed by Magistrate Judge D Thomas Ferraro on 4/7/2016.
395
04/12/2016
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, Unum Group.
396
04/13/2016
ORDER on Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court. IT IS ORDERED Plaintiff's 87 Objection to Magistrate's 6/30/15 Order is DENIED, and all other requests for relief included in Plaintiff's Objection are DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge Raner C Collins on 4/12/16.
397
04/15/2016
ORDER: IT IS ORDERED THAT, on or before 4/22/16, Defendants shall file in camera or under seal pages 163-67 of Fuller's deposition. Portions of these pages that are designated confidential shall be so marked. Signed by Magistrate Judge D Thomas Ferraro on 4/14/16.
398
04/18/2016
ORDER: IT IS ORDERED Plaintiff's 89 Objection to Magistrate's 7/1/15 Order, and all requests for relief contained therein are DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge Raner C Collins on 4/15/16.
399
04/18/2016
NOTICE re: Notice of Service of Defendant Unum Group's Objections to Requests for Production Attached to Plaintiff's Second Amended Notice of Deposition Pursuant to FRCP 30(b)(6) by Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, Unum Group.
400
04/21/2016
NOTICE re: Submission of Documents for in camera review by Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, Unum Group.
1
Exhibit
1 Attachment
401
04/25/2016
ORDER: IT IS ORDERED, Plaintiff's 252 Objection to Magistrate's 10/26/15 Order, and all requests for relief contained therein are DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge Raner C Collins on 4/25/16.
402
04/25/2016
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Randall Knuth.
403
04/26/2016
NOTICE of Errata re: 234 Ninth MOTION to Compel PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO DEEM REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ADMITTED OR COMPEL AUTHENTICATION OF DOCUMENTS Re: Exhibit 3 by Plaintiff Randall Knuth.
1
Exhibit Corrected Exhibit 234-3
1 Attachment
404
04/27/2016
TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, Unum Group for proceedings held on 04/27/2016, Magistrate Judge D Thomas Ferraro hearing judge(s).
405
04/27/2016
TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Randall Knuth for proceedings held on 04/27/2016, Magistrate Judge D Thomas Ferraro hearing judge(s).
406
04/29/2016
TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Randall Knuth for proceedings held on August 27, 2015, Magistrate Judge D Thomas Ferraro hearing judge(s).
407
04/29/2016
NOTICE re: Service of Defendants' Third Supplemental Disclosure Statement by Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, Unum Group.
408
04/27/2016
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge D Thomas Ferraro: Motion Hearing held on 4/27/2016. Oral argument held on discovery motions 219 & 226. Continued Telephonic Hearing on motions 219, 226 and 234 set for May 5, 2016 at 9:30AM before Judge Ferraro. (Recorded by COURTSMART.) Hearing held 9:39 AM to 11:46 AM.
409
04/29/2016
NOTICE re: WITHDRAWAL OF TRANSCRIPT REQUEST [DOC. 406] by Randall Knuth re: 406 Transcript Request.
410
05/04/2016
SUPPLEMENT PLAINTIFFS SUPPLEMENTAL FILING IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS (1) RULE 26(b)(5)(B) MOTION; (2) THIRD MOTION TO COMPEL; AND (3) RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS CROSS MOTION FOR DIQUALIFICATION (DOCS. 200, 204, 275, 278, & 305) WITH NOTICE OF LODGING UNDER SEAL AND CERTIFICATION OF COUNSEL re: 200 MOTION RULE 26(b)(5)(B) MOTION FOR DETERMINATION AS TO PRIVILEGE (Redacted), 278 Reply to Response to Motion, 204 Third MOTION to Compel Further Deposition Testimony, 275 Reply to Response to Motion, 305 Response in Opposition to Motion by Plaintiff Randall Knuth.
1
Exhibit Exhibit A - Filed Under Seal
1 Attachment
411
05/04/2016
SEALED LODGED Proposed Notice of Lodging Under Seal With Proposed Sealed Exhibit. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion or Stipulation to Seal is granted. Filed by Randall Knuth.
1
Exhibit Exhibit A - Under Seal
1 Attachment
412
05/05/2016
TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, Unum Group for proceedings held on 05/05/2016, Magistrate Judge D Thomas Ferraro hearing judge(s).
413
05/05/2016
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge D Thomas Ferraro: Matter comes before the Court for a telephonic hearing re: discovery motions held on 5/5/2016. Oral argument held on discovery motions 219, 226 and 234.On or before May 10, 2016, the parties shall file a document representing all agreements they have reached as to these motions. The Court takes motions 219, 226 & 234 under advisement. APPEARANCES: Telephonic appearance by Jeffrey Rubin & Steven Dawson for Plaintiff: Randall Knuth. Telephonic appearance by Stephen Bressler for Defendants: Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company & Unum Group. (Recorded by COURTSMART.) Hearing held 9:31 AM to 10:28 AM This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
414
05/05/2016
TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Randall Knuth for proceedings held on 05/05/2016, Magistrate Judge D Thomas Ferraro hearing judge(s).
415
05/05/2016
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: AO 435 Item 18 - ORDER: (CATEGORY) A box under ORIGINAL + 1 was incorrectly checked. The original has been previously ordered. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile with the appropriate box checked under FIRST COPY. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
416
05/05/2016
AMENDED TRANSCRIPT REQUEST pursuant to 415 Notice of Deficiency by Randall Knuth for proceedings held on 05/05/2016, Magistrate Judge D Thomas Ferraro hearing judge(s).
417
05/06/2016
ORDER GRANTING in part and DENYING in part 259 Defendants' Motion for Protective Order Regarding Portions of Sara McKinnon's Deposition Testimony; GRANTING 300 Defendants' Motion for Protective Order Regarding Portions of Suzanne Benson's Deposition Testimony; GRANTING Defendants' Motion for Protective Order Regarding Portions of Diane Cahill's Deposition Testimony; GRANTING in part and DENYING in part 353 Defendants' Motion for Protective Order Regarding Portions of Mary Fuller's Deposition Testimony; GRANTING 359 Defendants' Motion for Protective Order Regarding Portions of Lisa D. Ordonez, Ph.D.'s Deposition Testimony; GRANTING 367 Defendants' Motion for Protective Order Regarding Portions of Edwin A. Locke, Ph.D.'s Deposition Testimony; GRANTING 377 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Errata Sheets and the Court strikes the errata sheets of Robin Rose and Dr. Berghausen. Signed by Magistrate Judge D Thomas Ferraro on 5/5/2016. (See Order for details)
418
05/10/2016
RESPONSE re: 413 Order on Motion to Compel, In-Court Hearing, Terminate Deadlines and Hearings, Common Prompts (Text Only) by Plaintiff Randall Knuth.
419
05/10/2016
OBJECTION re: 418 Response by Defendants Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, Unum Group.
420
05/10/2016
ORDERED, 329 Plaintiff's Objection to Magistrate Judge's Order at Doc. 299 and all requests for relief contained therein are DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge Raner C Collins on 5/10/2016. (See Order for details)
421
05/12/2016
MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment RE: CURRENT DISABILITY STATUS by Randall Knuth.
422
05/12/2016
STATEMENT OF FACTS re: 421 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment RE: CURRENT DISABILITY STATUS by Plaintiff Randall Knuth.
1
Exhibit Index of Exhibits
2
Exhibit Knuth Deposition Excerpts
3
Exhibit Thompson Report
4
Exhibit Claim File Excerpts
5
Exhibit Knuth Declaration
6
Exhibit Philbin Deposition Excerpts
7
Exhibit Rose Deposition Excerpts
8
Exhibit Rogers Deposition Excerpts
9
Exhibit Corracio Deposition Excerpts
10
Exhibit Benson Deposition Excerpts
11
Exhibit Prust Deposition Excerpts
12
Exhibit McKinnon Deposition Excerpts
13
Exhibit RSA Amendment Excerpts
14
Exhibit Plaintiff's 3rd Supplemental Disclosure Excerpts, with Exhibit
15
Exhibit Masny (30(b)(6)) Deposition Excerpts, with Exhibits
16
Exhibit Cahill Deposition Excerpts, with Exhibit
17
Exhibit Lunda Deposition Excerpts
18
Exhibit Lunda FCE
19
Exhibit Berghausen Deposition Excerpts
20
Exhibit Joyce Rosenthal Report
21
Exhibit Joyce Rosenthal Affidavit
21 Attachments
423
05/13/2016
ORDER that Plaintiff's 6th and 7th Motions to Compel (Docs. 219, 226, 318, 319) are GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. It is further Ordered that Plaintiff's Motion to Deem Request for Admissions Admitted or Compel Authentication of Documents (Doc. 234) is GRANTED in part, to the extent it seeks to compel authentication, and DENIED in part, to the extent it requests the requests be deemed admitted (see attached Order for complete details). Signed by Magistrate Judge D Thomas Ferraro on 5/12/2016.
424
05/13/2016
ORDER that Defendants' Motion to Seal (Doc. 261) is GRANTED as unopposed. The Clerk of Court shall SEAL Exhibit 20 to Doc. 188 (lodged at Doc. 190). It is further Ordered that Defendants' Motions to Seal (Docs. 313, 333) are GRANTED. The Clerk of Court shall SEAL Plaintiff's Reply to Plaintiff's 6th Motion to Compel (un-redacted) and Exhibits 43, 44, 46, and 47 (lodged at Doc. 284); and Plaintiff's Reply to Plaintiff's 7th Motion to Compel (un- redacted) and Exhibits 17 and 18 (lodged at Doc. 290). It is further Ordered that the Clerk of Court shall file on the public record Exhibit 37 to Plaintiff's Reply to Plaintiff's 6th Motion to Compel (lodged at Doc. 284). It is further Ordered that Defendants' Motion to Seal (Doc. 341) is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. The Clerk of Court shall SEAL Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Cross-Motion on for Disqualification (un- redacted) (lodged at Doc. 309). The Clerk of Court shall file on the public record Exhibit 1 to Plaintiff's Response in Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Protective Order Regarding Portions of Sara McKinnon's Deposition Testimony (lodged at Doc. 304). Signed by Magistrate Judge D Thomas Ferraro on 5/13/2016.
425
05/13/2016
Sealed Document: Exhibit 20 re: 188 Plaintiff's Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Compel RE: RFP's Nos. 62 and 63 by Randall Knuth.
426
05/13/2016
SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re: 219 Sixth MOTION to Compel REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION NOS. 116-122, 125-131, 133, 138, 142, 143, 144, 145-151, 152, 155, 165, 167-68 by Randall Knuth.
1
Exhibit 43
2
Exhibit 44
3
Exhibit 46
4
https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/doc1/025115868330" onClick="goDLS{{'/doc1/025115868330','885354','1193','','2','1','',''}};">4</a> Exhibit 47)
4 Attachments
427
05/13/2016
Additional Attachments to Main Document Exhibit 37 re: 426 Reply to Response to Motion by Plaintiff Randall Knuth.
428
05/13/2016
SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re: 226 Seventh MOTION to Compel RFPS 172, 178, 179, 181, 183-186 and Supporting Memorandum by Randall Knuth.
1
Exhibit 17
2
https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/doc1/025115868475" onClick="goDLS{{'/doc1/025115868475','885354','1199','','2','1','',''}};">2</a> Exhibit 18)
2 Attachments
429
05/13/2016
SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re: 253 Defendant's Cross-MOTION for Disqualification by Randall Knuth.
430
05/13/2016
Additional Attachments to Main Document Exhibit 1 re: 238 Response to Motion by Plaintiff Randall Knuth.
431
05/19/2016
TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, Unum Group for proceedings held on 05/19/2016, Magistrate Judge D Thomas Ferraro hearing judge(s).
432
05/19/2016
TRANSCRIPT REQUEST (AMENDED) by Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, Unum Group for proceedings held on 05/19/2016, Magistrate Judge D Thomas Ferraro hearing judge(s).
433
05/19/2016
TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Randall Knuth for proceedings held on 5/19/2016, Magistrate Judge D Thomas Ferraro hearing judge(s).
434
05/20/2016
TRANSCRIPT of ORAL ARGUMENT held on 05/05/2016, before Judge D. THOMAS FERRARO. Transcriber Cindy J. Shearman. The ordering party will have electronic access to the transcript immediately. All others may view the transcript at the court public terminal or it may be purchased through the Transcriber by filing a Transcript Order Form on the docket before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/10/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/20/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/18/2016.
435
05/19/2016
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge D Thomas Ferraro: Oral Argument held on 5/19/2016 on Knuth v. Paul Revere Life Insurance. Court hears arguments. Formal order to follow. (Recorded by COURTSMART.) Hearing held 9:35 to 11:45.
436
05/20/2016
TRANSCRIPT of TELEPHONIC HEARING ON ORAL ARGUMENT held on 04/27/2016, before Judge D. THOMAS FERRARO. Transcriber Erica R. McQuillen. The ordering party will have electronic access to the transcript immediately. All others may view the transcript at the court public terminal or it may be purchased through the Transcriber by filing a Transcript Order Form on the docket before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/10/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/20/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/18/2016.
437
05/23/2016
ORDER that the Clerk of Court shall file on the public record the Declaration of Lisa Ordez. Ph.D., which was lodged as Doc. 91. Signed by Chief Judge Raner C Collins on 5/20/2016.
438
05/23/2016
DECLARATION of Lisa Ordonez, Ph.D. re: 89 Appeal of Mag Judge Decision to Dist Court (Rule 72(a) Objection) by Plaintiff Randall Knuth.
439
05/24/2016
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, Unum Group.
440
05/24/2016
NOTICE of Deposition of Jack McGarry, filed by Randall Knuth.
441
05/26/2016
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Randall Knuth.
442
05/31/2016
ORDER that Plaintiff's Rule 26(b)(5)(B) Motion for Determination as to Privilege (Docs. 200 and 316) is granted. It is further Ordered Plaintiff's Third Motion to Compel and Memorandum in Support (Doc. 204) is denied. It is further Ordered Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Motion for a Determination of Privilege and Cross-Motion to Disqualify Plaintiff's Counsel and Strike Un-Redacted Brief (Doc. 253) is denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge D Thomas Ferraro on 5/26/2016.
443
06/06/2016
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, Unum Group.
444
06/07/2016
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Randall Knuth.
445
06/08/2016
ORDER that Defendants' Motion to Seal Exhibits 8-12 to Plaintiff's Reply to Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Objection to the Magistrate's July 1, 2015 Order (Doc. 260) is GRANTED as unopposed. The Clerk of Court shall SEAL exhibits 8-12 of Plaintiff's Reply to Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Objection to the Magistrate's July 1, 2015 Order (Lodged at Docs. 126 -4, 126 -5, 126 -6, 126 -7 and 126 -8). It is further Ordered that the Clerk of Court shall file on the public record Exhibits 2, 4, and 5 to Plaintiff's Reply to Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Objection to the Magistrate's July 1, 2015 Order (Lodged at Docs. 126 -1, 126 -2, and 126 -3]. Signed by Chief Judge Raner C Collins on 6/7/2016.
446
06/08/2016
Additional Attachments to Main Document: Exhibits 2, 4, and 5 re: 121 Reply to Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Objection to the Magistrate's July 1, 2015 Order by Plaintiff Randall Knuth.
1
Exhibit 4
2
https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/doc1/025115972917" onClick="goDLS{{'/doc1/025115972917','885354','1248','','2','1','',''}};">2</a> Exhibit 5)
2 Attachments
447
06/08/2016
Sealed Document: Exhibits 8-12 re: 121 Reply to Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Objection to the Magistrate's July 1, 2015 Order by Randall Knuth.
1
Exhibit 9
2
Exhibit 10
3
Exhibit 11
4
https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/doc1/025115973441" onClick="goDLS{{'/doc1/025115973441','885354','1251','','2','1','',''}};">4</a> Exhibit 12)
4 Attachments
448
06/14/2016
ORDER that the parties' Joint Motion to Substitute (Doc. 324) is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court shall FILE UNDER SEAL (1) Substitute Exhibit 5 to Plaintiff's Seventh Motion to Compel (lodged at Doc. 326) as an amended version of Exhibit 5 to Plaintiff's Seventh Motion to Compel (filed UNDER SEAL at Doc. 319 -1); and (2) Substitute Exhibit 8 to Plaintiff's Objection to Magistrate's July 1, 2015 Order (lodged at Doc. 327) as an amended version of Exhibit 8 to Plaintiff's Objection to Magistrate's July 1, 2015 Order (filed UNDER SEAL at Doc. 447). Signed by Magistrate Judge D Thomas Ferraro on 6/13/2016.
449
06/14/2016
Sealed Document: Amended Version of Exhibit 5 to 319 (Unredacted) Seventh MOTION to Compel by Randall Knuth.
450
06/14/2016
Sealed Document: Amended Version of Exhibit 8 re: 447 Sealed Document: Exhibits 8-12 re: 121 Reply to Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Objection to the Magistrate's July 1, 2015 by Randall Knuth.
451
06/14/2016
ORDER that Plaintiff's Motion to Lodge Under Seal (Doc. 163) is GRANTED as unopposed. The Clerk of the Court shall SEAL exhibits 3, 4, and 5 to Plaintiff's Supplemental Memorandum in Support of Motion to Compel Doc. 57 and Appeal of Ruling at Doc. 89 (Lodged at Docs. 164 -1, 164 -2 and 164 -3). Signed by Chief Judge Raner C Collins on 6/13/2016.
452
06/14/2016
Sealed Document: Exhibits 3, 4 and 5 to 162 Plaintiff's Supplemental Memorandum in Support of Motion to Compel Doc. 57 and Appeal of Ruling at Doc. 89 by Randall Knuth.
1
Exhibit 4
2
https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/doc1/025115999676" onClick="goDLS{{'/doc1/025115999676','885354','1264','','2','1','',''}};">2</a> Exhibit 5)
2 Attachments
453
06/16/2016
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, Unum Group.
454
06/17/2016
TRANSCRIPT of ORAL ARGUMENT held on 5/19/2016, before Judge D. THOMAS FERRARO. Transcriber Cindy J. Shearman. The ordering party will have electronic access to the transcript immediately. All others may view the transcript at the court public terminal or it may be purchased through the Transcriber by filing a Transcript Order Form on the docket before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 7/8/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/18/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/15/2016.
455
06/21/2016
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Randall Knuth.
456
07/08/2016
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, Unum Group.
457
07/11/2016
STIPULATION re Dispositive Motion deadlines by Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, Unum Group.
1
Text of Proposed Order
1 Attachment
458
07/13/2016
Pursuant to the parties' 457 Stipulation to Extend Dispositive Motion Deadlines: IT IS ORDERED that Defendants shall file and serve their motion for summary judgment and their opposition to Plaintiff's 421 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on or before 8/1/16. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file any opposition to Defendants' motion for summary judgment and his reply in support of his motion for partial summary judgment within 30 days of service of Defendants' motion for summary judgment. Defendants shall file any reply in support of their motion for summary judgment within 22 days of service of Plaintiff's opposition. Signed by Magistrate Judge D Thomas Ferraro on 7/12/16.
459
07/20/2016
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Randall Knuth.
460
07/22/2016
NOTICE re: SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS OBJECTIONS TO CONFIDENTIALITY DESIGNATIONS RE: DEPOSITION OF JOHN MCGARRY by Randall Knuth.
461
08/01/2016
*MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, Unum Group.
1
https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/doc1/025116201964" onClick="goDLS{{'/doc1/025116201964','885354','1283','','2','1','',''}};">1</a> Text of Proposed Order) *Modified restriction from public to sealed on 8/1/2016
1 Attachment
462
08/01/2016
STRICKEN BY DOC. 476 --*STATEMENT OF FACTS re: 461 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Defendants Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, Unum Group.
1
Exhibit
2
Exhibit
3
Exhibit
4
https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/doc1/025116202163" onClick="goDLS{{'/doc1/025116202163','885354','1285','','2','1','',''}};">4</a> Exhibit) *Modified restriction from public to sealed on 8/1/2016 (CEI). Modified on 8/5/2016
4 Attachments
463
08/01/2016
*RESPONSE in Opposition re: 421 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment RE: CURRENT DISABILITY STATUS filed by Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, Unum Group.
1
https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/doc1/025116202248" onClick="goDLS{{'/doc1/025116202248','885354','1288','','2','1','',''}};">1</a> Text of Proposed Order) *Modified restriction from public to sealed on 8/1/2016
1 Attachment
464
08/01/2016
STRICKEN BY DOC. 476 --*STATEMENT OF FACTS re: 463 Response in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment by Defendants Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, Unum Group.
1
https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/doc1/025116202321" onClick="goDLS{{'/doc1/025116202321','885354','1292','','2','1','',''}};">1</a> Exhibit) *Modified restriction from public to sealed on 8/1/2016 (CEI). Modified on 8/5/2016
1 Attachment
465
08/03/2016
MOTION to Strike 462 Statement of Facts, 464 Statement of Facts by Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, Unum Group.
1
Text of Proposed Order
1 Attachment
466
08/03/2016
STATEMENT OF FACTS re: 422 Statement of Facts by Defendants Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, Unum Group.
1
Exhibit
2
Exhibit
2 Attachments
467
08/03/2016
MOTION to Seal Document Exhibit 9 to Defendants Controverting Statement of Facts by Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, Unum Group.
1
Text of Proposed Order
1 Attachment
468
08/03/2016
Filed at Doc. 474 --SEALED LODGED Proposed Exhibit 9 to Defendants' Controverting Statement of Facts re: 467 MOTION to Seal Document Exhibit 9 to Defendants Controverting Statement of Facts. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion or Stipulation to Seal is granted. Filed by Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, Unum Group.
1
https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/doc1/025116214505" onClick="goDLS{{'/doc1/025116214505','885354','1304','','2','1','',''}};">1</a> Exhibit) Modified on 8/5/2016
1 Attachment
469
08/03/2016
STATEMENT OF FACTS re: 461 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Defendants Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, Unum Group.
1
https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/doc1/025116214558" onClick="goDLS{{'/doc1/025116214558','885354','1307','','2','1','',''}};">1</a> Exhibit) Modified on 2/6/2017
559
#
2 Attachments
470
08/03/2016
MOTION to Seal Document Exhibit 16 to Defendants' Statement of Facts by Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, Unum Group.
1
Text of Proposed Order
1 Attachment
471
08/03/2016
Filed at Doc. 475 --SEALED LODGED Proposed Exhibit 16 to Defendants' Statement of Facts re: 470 MOTION to Seal Document Exhibit 16 to Defendants' Statement of Facts. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion or Stipulation to Seal is granted. Filed by Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, Unum Group.
1
https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/doc1/025116214609" onClick="goDLS{{'/doc1/025116214609','885354','1312','','2','1','',''}};">1</a> Exhibit) Modified on 8/5/2016
1 Attachment
472
08/04/2016
REQUEST re: for Oral Argument by Defendants Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, Unum Group.
473
08/05/2016
ORDER that Defendants' motions (Docs. 467 and 470) are granted. It is further Ordered that the Clerk of the Court shall file under seal Exhibit 9 to Defendants' Controverting Statement of Facts lodged at Doc. 468 and Exhibit 16 to Defendants' Statement of Facts in Support of Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment lodged at Doc. 471. Signed by Magistrate Judge D Thomas Ferraro on 8/3/2016.
474
08/05/2016
Sealed Document: Exhibit 9 re: 466 STATEMENT OF FACTS re: 422 Statement of Facts by Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, Unum Group.
475
08/05/2016
Sealed Document: Exhibit 16 re: 469 STATEMENT OF FACTS re: 461 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, Unum Group.
476
08/05/2016
ORDER granting 465 Motion to Strike. It is further Ordered that the Clerk of the Court shall strike from the docket and seal (1) the Statement of Facts in Support of Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment at Doc. 462 and (2) the Controverting Statement of Facts re Plaintiff's Statement of Facts; and Additional Statement of Facts Creating a Genuine Issue of Material Fact Precluding Summary Judgment at Doc. 464. Signed by Magistrate Judge D Thomas Ferraro on 8/5/2016.
477
08/09/2016
STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEADLINES FOR RESPONSE AND REPLIES TO DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS by Randall Knuth.
1
Text of Proposed Order
1 Attachment
478
08/10/2016
ORDER pursuant to 477 Stipulation to Extend Deadlines for Response and Replies to Dispositive Motions : that Plaintiff shall file his response to Defendants' motion for partial summary judgment and his reply in support of his motion for partial summary judgment on or before September 14, 2016 and that Defendants shall file their reply in support of their motion for partial summary judgment within 22 days of service of Plaintiff's response to Defendants' motion for partial summary judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge D Thomas Ferraro on 8/10/2016.
479
08/17/2016
MOTION for Protective Order Regarding a Portion of John McGarry's Deposition Testimony by Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, Unum Group.
1
Exhibit Bressler Declaration
2
Text of Proposed Order
2 Attachments
480
08/17/2016
MOTION to Seal Document 479 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding a Portion of John McGarry's Deposition Testimony by Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, Unum Group.
1
Text of Proposed Order
1 Attachment
481
08/17/2016
Filed at Doc. 488 --SEALED LODGED Proposed Notice of Lodging Under Seal an Excerpt from Deposition of John McGarry re: 480 MOTION to Seal Document 479 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding a Portion of John McGarry's Deposition Testimony. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion or Stipulation to Seal is granted. Filed by Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, Unum Group.
1
https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/doc1/025116270445" onClick="goDLS{{'/doc1/025116270445','885354','1342','','2','1','',''}};">1</a> Exhibit Deposition Excerpt to be Sealed) Modified on 9/2/2016
1 Attachment
482
08/23/2016
RESPONSE in Opposition re: 479 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding a Portion of John McGarry's Deposition Testimony filed by Randall Knuth.
1
Exhibit Ex. 1 - Unum 2012 Annual Report
2
Exhibit Ex. 2 - Unum 2010 Annual Report
3
Exhibit Ex. 3 - Unum 2014 Annual Report
4
Exhibit Ex. 4 - 2012 10-K
5
Exhibit Ex. 5 - 2014 10-K
6
Exhibit Ex. 6 - 2nd Qtr 2014 Report
7
Exhibit Ex. 7 - 3rd Qtr 2014 Report
8
Exhibit Ex. 8 - SEC Filings
9
Exhibit Ex. 9 - McGarry Errata Sheet
9 Attachments
483
08/23/2016
DECLARATION of Jeffrey K. Rubin re: 482 Response in Opposition to Motion by Plaintiff Randall Knuth.
484
08/29/2016
WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT re: 479 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding a Portion of John McGarry's Deposition Testimony by Defendants Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, Unum Group.
485
08/29/2016
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Randall Knuth.
486
09/02/2016
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Randall Knuth.
487
09/02/2016
ORDER granting 480 Motion to Seal Document and the Clerk of the Court is directed to file under seal Exhibit 1 lodged at docket entry no. 481. Signed by Magistrate Judge D Thomas Ferraro on 9/1/2016.
488
09/02/2016
Sealed Document: Excerpt from Deposition of John McGarry re: 479 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding a Portion of John McGarry's Deposition Testimony by Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, Unum Group.
489
09/12/2016
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Randall Knuth.
490
09/13/2016
Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply & to Exceed Page Limit; Expedited Relief Requested by Randall Knuth.
1
Text of Proposed Order
1 Attachment
491
09/14/2016
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 490 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply & to Exceed Page Limit; Expedited Relief Requested. Plaintiff's response to Defendant's motion for partial summary judgment shall be filed on or before 9/21/2016 and shall not exceed the page limit set forth in LRCiv 7.2(e)(1). Signed by Magistrate Judge D Thomas Ferraro on 9/13/2016.
492
09/14/2016
REPLY to Response to Motion re: 421 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment RE: CURRENT DISABILITY STATUS filed by Randall Knuth.
1
Supplement Index of Exhibits
2
Exhibit Ex. 1 - Masny Depo Excerpts
3
Exhibit Ex. 2 - Thompson Depo Excerpts
4
Exhibit Ex. 3 - Corracio Depo Excerpts
5
Exhibit Ex. 4 - Philbin Depo Excerpts
6
Exhibit Ex. 5 - Benson Depo Excerpts
7
Exhibit Ex. 6 - Berghausen Depo Excerpts
8
Exhibit Ex. 7 - McGarry Depo Excerpts
9
Exhibit Ex. 8 - Rose Depo Excerpts
10
Exhibit Ex. 9 - Claim File Excerpts
10 Attachments
493
09/15/2016
MOTION for Reconsideration re: 491 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Re: Exceeding Page Limit) by Randall Knuth.
1
Exhibit Exhibit 1 - 2016-09-12 Email
2
Exhibit Exhibit 2 - 2016-09-15 Email
3
Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
3 Attachments
494
09/16/2016
ORDER granting 493 Motion for Reconsideration. Plaintiff's response to Defendants' motion for partial summary judgment may (but not must) exceed the page limit by 4 pages. Signed by Magistrate Judge D Thomas Ferraro on 9/16/2016.
495
09/21/2016
MOTION to Strike Exhibit 12 to Defendants' Statement of Facts by Randall Knuth.
1
Exhibit Exhibits 1-3
2
Exhibit Exhibits 4-6
3
Exhibit Exhibits 7-9
4
Exhibit Exhibits 10-12
5
Text of Proposed Order
5 Attachments
496
09/21/2016
*RESPONSE to Motion re: 461 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Randall Knuth. *Modified to seal pursuant to Doc. 503 on 9/29/2016
497
09/21/2016
DECLARATION of JEFFREY K. RUBIN (28 U.S.C. §1746) IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT re: 496 Response to Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Randall Knuth.
1
Exhibit Ex. A
2
Exhibit Ex. B
3
Exhibit Ex. C
4
Exhibit Ex. D
5
Exhibit Ex. E
5 Attachments
498
09/21/2016
*STATEMENT OF FACTS re: 496 Response to Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Randall Knuth.
1
Supplement Index of Exhibits
2
Exhibit Ex. 1-4
3
Exhibit Ex. 5a
4
Exhibit Ex. 5b
5
Exhibit Ex. 6-10
6
Exhibit Ex. 11-15
7
Exhibit Ex. 16
8
Exhibit Ex. 17a
9
Exhibit Ex. 17b
10
Exhibit Ex. 17c
11
Exhibit Ex. 17d
12
Errata Ex. 17e
13
Exhibit Ex. 18-30
14
Exhibit Ex. 31-38
15
Exhibit Ex. 39-79
16
Exhibit Ex. 81-91
17
https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/doc1/025116423968" onClick="goDLS{{'/doc1/025116423968','885354','1399','','2','1','',''}};">17</a> Exhibit Ex. 92-113) *Modified to seal documents, awaiting Motion to Seal on 9/22/2016
17 Attachments
499
09/22/2016
SEALED LODGED Proposed Notice of Lodging Under Seal With Proposed Sealed Exhibits. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion or Stipulation to Seal is granted. Filed by Randall Knuth.
1
Exhibit Exhibits 3, 11 & 12, Under Seal
2
Exhibit Exhibits 13, 14 & 15, Under Seal
3
Exhibit Exhibits 18, 22 & 27, Under Seal
4
Exhibit Exhibits 40-46, Under Seal
5
Exhibit Exhibits 47-51, Under Seal
6
Exhibit Exhibits 52-58, Under Seal
7
Exhibit Exhibits 64-68, Under Seal
8
Exhibit Exhibits 70, 71, 73-75 & 80, Under Seal
9
Exhibit Exhibits 90, 95, 96, 98 & 99, Under Seal
10
Exhibit Exhibit 106, Under Seal
11
Exhibit Exhibits 107 & 108, Under Seal
12
Exhibit Exhibits 109 & 113, Under Seal
13
Exhibit Ex. 17, Under Seal
14
Exhibit Exhibit 6 to Exhibit 17, Under Seal
15
Exhibit Exhibit 7 to Exhibit 17, Under Seal
16
Exhibit Un-Redacted Response to Motion for Partial Summary Judgment
17
Exhibit Un-Redacted Statement of Facts
18
Exhibit Un-Redacted Declaration of Jeffrey K. Rubin
18 Attachments
500
09/22/2016
MOTION to Seal Document 498 Statement of Facts by Randall Knuth.
1
Text of Proposed Order
1 Attachment
501
09/26/2016
ORDER that Plaintiff's motion (Doc. 500) is granted and the Clerk of the Court is directed to seal the documents filed at docket number 498 and 498 - 1 through 498 -17. Signed by Magistrate Judge D Thomas Ferraro on 9/26/2016.
502
09/27/2016
MOTION to Seal Document 496 Response to Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by Randall Knuth.
1
Text of Proposed Order
1 Attachment
503
09/28/2016
ORDER that Plaintiff's motion (Doc. 502) is granted and the Clerk of the Court is directed to seal Plaintiff's response at document number 496. Signed by Magistrate Judge D Thomas Ferraro on 9/27/2016.
504
09/30/2016
*MOTION UNOPPOSED FOR LEAVE TO FILE CORRECTED RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT (DOC. 461), AND STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEADLINE FOR DEFENDANTS REPLY re: 496 Response to Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, 498 Statement of Facts by Randall Knuth.
1
https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/doc1/025116464646" onClick="goDLS{{'/doc1/025116464646','885354','1416','','2','1','',''}};">1</a> Text of Proposed Order) *Modified to correct motion type, add motion part and clarify docket text on 10/3/2016
1 Attachment
505
10/06/2016
ORDER granting 504 Unopposed Motion to File Corrected Response to Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Doc. 461), With Stipulation to Extend Deadline for Defendants' Reply. It is further Ordered that Plaintiff shall file his corrected Response, Controverting Statement of Facts, Separate Statement of Facts, and supporting exhibits no later than 10/14/2016; and that Defendants shall file their Reply to Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment within 22 days from 10/14/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge D Thomas Ferraro on 10/5/2016.
506
10/10/2016
RESPONSE to Motion re: 495 MOTION to Strike Exhibit 12 to Defendants' Statement of Facts filed by Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, Unum Group.
1
Appendix A
1 Attachment
507
10/14/2016
RESPONSE to Motion re: 461 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment CORRECTED RESPONSE - REDACTED filed by Randall Knuth.
508
10/14/2016
STATEMENT OF FACTS re: 507 Response to Motion for Partial Summary Judgment CORRECTED & REDACTED by Plaintiff Randall Knuth.
1
Supplement Index of Exhibits
2
Exhibit Exhibits 1 - 3a
3
Exhibit Exhibit 3b
4
Exhibit Exhibits 4 - 5
5
Exhibit Exhibits 6 - 15
6
Exhibit Exhibits 16 - 22
7
Exhibit Exhibits 23 - 41
8
Exhibit Exhibits 42 - 99
9
Exhibit Exhibits 100 - 119
9 Attachments
509
10/14/2016
DECLARATION of JEFFREY K. RUBIN (28 U.S.C. §1746) IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT re: 507 Response to Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, 508 Statement of Facts AMENDING & CORRECTING DOC. 497 by Plaintiff Randall Knuth.
1
Exhibit Exhibit F
1 Attachment
510
10/14/2016
DENIED BY ORDER DOC. 543 --- SEALED LODGED Proposed Notice of Lodging Under Seal With Proposed Sealed Exhibits. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion or Stipulation to Seal is granted. Filed by Randall Knuth.
1
Exhibit Un-redacted Corrected Response
2
Exhibit Un-redacted Corrected Controverting & Supplemental Statement of Facts
3
Exhibit Un-redacted Exhibits 6, 13, 14, 15 & 19
4
Exhibit Un-redacted Exhibit 20 - Part A
5
Exhibit Un-redacted Exhibit 20 - Part B
6
Exhibit Un-redacted Exhibit 24 - Part A
7
Exhibit Un-redacted Exhibit 24 - Part B
8
Exhibit Un-redacted Exhibits 28, 33, 34, 39, 44-50
9
Exhibit Un-redacted Exhibits 51 - 60
10
Exhibit Un-redacted Exhibits 61, 62, 64, 66, 67 & 68
11
Exhibit Un-redacted Exhibits 69 - 73, 75, 76, 78 & 79
12
Exhibit Un-redacted Exhibits 85, 96, 101 - 103
13
Exhibit Un-redacted Exhibits 105, 107 - 113
14
Exhibit Un-redacted Exhibits 114 & 115
15
Exhibit Un-redacted Exhibits 116 & 117
16
Exhibit Un-redacted Declaration of Jeffrey K. Rubin
17
https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/doc1/025116523285" onClick="goDLS{{'/doc1/025116523285','885354','1445','','2','1','',''}};">17</a> Exhibit Exhibit F to Un-Redacted Declaration of Jeffrey K. Rubin) Modified on 1/6/2017
17 Attachments
511
10/19/2016
REPLY to Response to Motion re: 495 MOTION to Strike Exhibit 12 to Defendants' Statement of Facts filed by Randall Knuth.
1
Exhibit Exhibit 13 - Unum RFP Response
2
Exhibit Exhibit 14 - JKR Deficiency Letter
3
Exhibit Exhibit 15 - 2006 Disability Claim
4
Exhibit Exhibit 16 - Rubin Declaration
5
Exhibit Exhibit 17 - Mause Declaration
6
Exhibit Exhibit 18 - Schubert Declaration
6 Attachments
512
10/20/2016
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Randall Knuth.
513
11/07/2016
REPLY to Response to Motion re: 461 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, Unum Group.
514
11/07/2016
*DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S CORRECTED re: 508 Statement of Facts by Defendants Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, Unum Group. *Modified to correct event type and reflect document title on 11/8/2016
515
11/07/2016
DECLARATION of Daniel W. Maguire re: 513 Reply to Response to Motion, 514 Statement of Facts by Defendants Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, Unum Group.
1
Exhibit 20-28
1 Attachment
516
11/07/2016
MOTION to Seal Document (Portions of Exhibits 27 and 28 to the Declaration of Daniel W. Maguire) by Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, Unum Group.
1
Text of Proposed Order
1 Attachment
517
11/07/2016
Filed at Doc. 520 --SEALED LODGED Proposed Portions of Exs. 27 and 28 to the Declaration of Daniel W. Maguire. Document to be filed by Clerk if 516 Motion or Stipulation to Seal is granted. Filed by Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, Unum Group.
1
https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/doc1/025116621979" onClick="goDLS{{'/doc1/025116621979','885354','1464','','2','1','',''}};">1</a> Exhibit) *Modified to link to Motion to Seal on 11/8/2016 (SCH). Modified on 11/8/2016
1 Attachment
518
11/08/2016
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Randall Knuth.