Kon v. State of Alaska
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cv-00109 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
5
06/11/2018
~Util - Set Deadlines
6
06/13/2018
Notice of Appearance
7
06/13/2018
Notice of Appearance
8
06/25/2018
Notice of Appearance
9
07/02/2018
Returned/Undeliverable Mail
10
08/10/2018
Extension of Time to File Document
08/13/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/13/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/13/2018
~Util - Set Deadlines (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/16/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
13
11/09/2018
Notice (Other)
11/19/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/19/2018
Docket Annotation re 28:2254 Merit Briefing (Text entry; no document attached.)
15
11/28/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
12/06/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/06/2018
~Util - Set Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
17
12/11/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
12/12/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/13/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
20
02/08/2019
Merit Briefing re 28:2254
02/13/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/13/2019
~Util - Set Deadlines (Text entry; no document attached.)
22
03/12/2019
Leave to File Document
23
03/12/2019
Response to Order
03/13/2019
Order on Motion for Leave to File (Text entry; no document attached.)
25
03/15/2019
Notice of Lodging State Court Document(s)
26
03/15/2019
Merit Briefing re 28:2254
03/18/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
28
03/18/2019
Errata
29
04/15/2019
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
04/16/2019
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply (Text entry; no document attached.)
31
05/06/2019
Extension of Time to File Document
05/07/2019
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.