Kristi Vaughn Jones
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

2:2018-bk-01715 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: 232 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
04/20/2018
Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual. Fee Amount $310 Filed by Kristi Vaughn Jones
2
04/20/2018
Chapter 13 Plan. Filed by Debtor Kristi Vaughn Jones.
3
04/20/2018
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 05/30/2018 at 09:30 AM at Creditor Meeting Room Birmingham. Confirmation hearing to be held on 07/12/2018 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham. Proof of Claim due by 06/29/2018. Government Proof of Claim due by 10/17/2018 Objection to Dischargeability of Certain Debts due by 07/30/2018.
5
04/20/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling for Debtor Filed by Debtor Kristi Vaughn Jones.
6
04/20/2018
Employee Income Records Filed by Debtor Kristi Vaughn Jones.
04/20/2018
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)(18-01715-13) [misc,volp13] (310.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 21984335. Fee Amount 310.00 (re:Doc# 1) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
7
04/20/2018
Tax Documents for the Year for 2017 Filed by Debtor Kristi Vaughn Jones.
8
04/21/2018
Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management (Admin adiuser)
9
04/21/2018
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Creditor PRA Receivables Management, LLC.
10
04/22/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 3 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 13)). Notice Date 04/22/2018.
04/23/2018
Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings for debtor Kristi Vaughn Jones Case Number 08-02152, Chapter 7 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 05/02/2008, Standard Discharge on 08/27/2008; Case Number 09-04597, Chapter 13 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 08/03/2009, Dismissed for Other Reason on 11/05/2009; Case Number 87-07379, Chapter 13 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 08/21/1987, Standard Discharge on 09/08/1988.(Admin) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11
04/25/2018
Trustee's Direction for Deduction. (Ch13troffice, sf)
12
04/25/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 8 Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management). Notice Date 04/25/2018.
13
04/25/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan filed by Debtor Kristi Vaughn Jones). Notice Date 04/25/2018.
14
05/30/2018
Meeting of Creditors Held 5/30/2018. (Ch13troffice, jc)
15
06/01/2018
Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Chapter 13 Plan, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss. (Ch13troffice, ul)
16
06/01/2018
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 15 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss). Hearing scheduled 7/12/2018 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham.
17
06/03/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 16 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 06/03/2018.
18
07/09/2018
Summary of Assets and Liabilities Schedules for Individual, Statistical Summary of Certain Liabilities, Amended Schedule J: Individual- Your Expenses Filed by Debtor Kristi Vaughn Jones.
19
07/09/2018
Amended Chapter 13 Plan. Filed by Debtor Kristi Vaughn Jones (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan. Filed by Debtor Kristi Vaughn Jones.).
20
07/13/2018
Order Rescheduling Hearing Signed on 7/13/2018 (RE: related document(s) 3 Confirmation Hearing), 15 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss). Hearing scheduled 8/2/2018 at 11:15 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham.
21
07/15/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 20 Order Rescheduling Hearing). Notice Date 07/15/2018.

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.