Kurt J Denning
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00079 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/23/2018
Chapter 13 Plan Recommendation
05/29/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
doc
05/31/2018
Proceeding Memo
doc
06/01/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
22
06/29/2018
Continue / Reschedule Hearing
23
06/29/2018
Continue / Reschedule Hearing
24
07/02/2018
Amended Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN04)
25
07/03/2018
Notice of Modified Ch 13 Plan With Objection Deadline
26
07/03/2018
Certificate of Service
27
07/24/2018
Chapter 13 Plan Recommendation
28
08/01/2018
Proceeding Memo
29
08/03/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
30
08/07/2018
Chapter 13 Plan Recommendation
31
08/07/2018
Confirming Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN01) (SA)
32
08/08/2018
Notice of Requirement RE: Financial Management Course - Ch 7, 11 & 13 (BNC Notice)
33
08/10/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
34
08/10/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
35
08/16/2018
Notice of Postpetition Mortgage Fees, Expenses, and Charges (Form 410S2)
36
09/10/2018
Relief from Stay (Fee) (CM03)
37
09/10/2018
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
38
09/10/2018
Certificate of Service
09/10/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/28/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
39
10/10/2018
Certificate of No Objection
40
10/10/2018
Certificate of Service
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.