Kurt s Fischer and Monica n Fischer
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

2:2018-bk-00013 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
View docket sheet
Last full docket sheet refresh: 104 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
01/03/2018
Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual. Receipt Number O, Fee Amount $310 Filed by Kurt S Fischer, Monica N Fischer
2
01/03/2018
Chapter 13 Plan, and Request for Valuation of Security. Filed by Debtor Kurt S Fischer, Joint Debtor Monica N Fischer.
3
01/03/2018
Application to Pay Filing Fee in Installments Through the Chapter 13 Trustee Assigned to the Case Filed by Debtor Kurt S Fischer, Joint Debtor Monica N Fischer
5
01/03/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling for Debtor and Joint Debtor Filed by Debtor Kurt S Fischer, Joint Debtor Monica N Fischer.
6
01/03/2018
Employee Income Records Filed by Debtor Kurt S Fischer, Joint Debtor Monica N Fischer.
7
01/03/2018
Notice of Intent to Pay Chapter 13 Case Filing Fee through Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Debtor Kurt S Fischer, Joint Debtor Monica N Fischer.
8
01/03/2018
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 01/31/2018 at 09:30 AM at Creditor Meeting Room Birmingham. Confirmation hearing to be held on 03/06/2018 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham. Proof of Claim due by 03/14/2018. Government Proof of Claim due by 07/02/2018 Objection to Dischargeability of Certain Debts due by 04/02/2018.
9
01/04/2018
Order Approving Application for Payment of Filing Fees In Installments: IT IS ORDERED that the Debtor may pay the filing fee in installments as proposed in the application. A discharge shall not be granted until the filing fee has been paid in full. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all installments of the filing fee must be paid in full before the Debtor or Trustee may make further payments to an attorney or any other person who renders services to the Debtor in connection with the case. (Fee Amount $310.00) (RE: related document(s) 3 Application to Pay Filing Fees in Installments filed by Debtor Kurt S Fischer, Joint Debtor Monica N Fischer).
10
01/04/2018
Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management. (Admin)
11
01/05/2018
Trustee's Direction for Deduction. (Ch13troffice, sf)
12
01/05/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 8 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 13)). Notice Date 01/05/2018.
13
01/06/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan filed by Debtor Kurt S Fischer, Joint Debtor Monica N Fischer). Notice Date 01/06/2018.
14
01/06/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 10 Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management). Notice Date 01/06/2018.
15
01/18/2018
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Joshua B. White Filed by Creditor CENLAR FSB AS SERVICER FOR MATRIX FINANCIAL SERVICES CORPORATION.
16
02/01/2018
Meeting of Creditors Held 1/31/2018. (Ch13troffice, bc)
17
02/07/2018
Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Chapter 13 Plan, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss. (Ch13troffice, km)
18
02/07/2018
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 17 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss). Hearing scheduled 3/14/2018 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
19
02/07/2018
Amended Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 17 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss). Hearing scheduled 3/6/2018 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
20
02/09/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 19 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 02/09/2018.
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.