Kvasnikoff v. United States of America
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2016-cv-00081 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
55
03/13/2018
ORDER: re Motions to Dismiss and Petition for Certification 28, 29,and 21. The caption is amended. The Government's shall file its answer to Ms. Kvasnikoff's Complaint within 14 days of the date of this order(see order for full details). Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 03/13/2018. (AEM, CHAMBERS STAFF)
63
10/23/2018
Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
64
10/23/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
65
11/06/2018
Witness List
66
11/06/2018
Witness List
67
11/16/2018
Stipulation
68
11/16/2018
Order on Stipulation
69
01/29/2019
Stipulation
01/31/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.