LIVING THE DREAM ALASKA, LLC v. MERCEDES-BENZ USA, LLC
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cv-00235 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
10/05/2018
Notice of Removal
2
10/05/2018
Civil Cover Sheet
3
10/05/2018
Order to Petitioner Subsequent to Removal
4
10/15/2018
Notice of Service List
5
10/16/2018
Order
6
10/25/2018
Notice of Lodging State Court Document(s)
7
10/30/2018
Initial Case Status Report Order
8
11/05/2018
Corporate Disclosure Statement
9
11/14/2018
Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting
10
11/20/2018
Scheduling Order
11
01/28/2019
Protective Order
12
01/28/2019
Affidavit
13
02/11/2019
Response in Opposition to Motion
14
02/11/2019
Declaration
15
02/15/2019
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
16
02/23/2019
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
17
02/25/2019
Reply to Response to Motion
18
03/22/2019
Protective Order
19
03/24/2019
Order on Motion for Protective Order
20
03/27/2019
Compel
21
03/27/2019
Declaration
22
04/05/2019
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
23
04/09/2019
Notice (Other)
24
04/09/2019
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
25
04/10/2019
Response in Opposition to Motion
26
04/10/2019
Declaration
27
04/17/2019
Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney
28
04/17/2019
Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney
29
04/17/2019
Receipt For Non-Resident Attorney Fee
30
04/17/2019
Receipt For Non-Resident Attorney Fee
31
04/17/2019
Order
04/18/2019
Clerks Notice Approving Non-Resident Attorney Application (Text entry; no document attached.)
33
04/19/2019
Notice (Other)
34
04/20/2019
Notice (Other)
04/29/2019
Order on Motion for Protective Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/29/2019
Order on Motion to Compel (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/01/2019
Clerks Notice Approving Non-Resident Attorney Application (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.