LaQuita Yvonne Odom
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2015-bk-00050 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
101
09/13/2018
Chapter 13 Trustees Final Report and Account
102
09/13/2018
Notice of Intent to Enter Chapter 13 Discharge
103
10/16/2018
Final Notice of Intent to Close Case Without Discharge - Ch 7, 11 & 13 (BNC Notice)
104
10/18/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate
105
10/18/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
106
10/19/2018
Discharging Debtor(s) (SA) (BNC Notice)
107
10/22/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order of Discharge
10/24/2018
Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case (Text entry; no document attached.)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.