Labrusciano v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Court Docket Sheet

3:2017-cv-08027 (azd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 523 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
02/28/2017
PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 35, receipt number PHX182571 as to Howard D Olinsky. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (Text entry; no document attached.)
1
02/14/2017
COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-13918061 filed by Melissa Dionne Labrusciano. (submitted by Howard Olinsky)
1
Civil Cover Sheet
2
Letter
2 Attachments
2
02/14/2017
SUMMONS Submitted by Melissa Dionne Labrusciano. (submitted by Howard Olinsky)
1
Summons
2
Summons
2 Attachments
3
02/14/2017
Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-13918061. This case has been assigned to the Honorable G Murray Snow. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-17-08027-PCT-GMS. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached.
4
02/14/2017
Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General.
1
Summons
2
Summons
2 Attachments
5
02/15/2017
ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to terminate any or all Defendants in this matter, without further notice, that have not been served within the time required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) on 5/16/2017. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 2/15/2017.
6
02/15/2017
SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER: See Order for deadlines and details. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 2/15/2017.
7
02/21/2017
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Howard D. Olinsky by Melissa Dionne Labrusciano.
1
Letter to Clerk
1 Attachment
8
02/28/2017
ORDER pursuant to General Order 09-08 granting 7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. Counsel is advised that they are limited to two (2) additional e-mail addresses in their District of Arizona User Account. (BAS) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
9
03/21/2017
SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Melissa Dionne Labrusciano: Return of Service re: Summons, Complaint and Scheduling Order upon US Attorney's Office, Office of General Counsel, Attorney General on 3/13/2017.
10
04/19/2017
NOTICE of Appearance by Daphne Banay on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security Administration.
11
05/12/2017
ANSWER to [1] Complaint by Commissioner of Social Security Administration.
12
05/12/2017
NOTICE of Filing Certified Copy of Administrative Transcript re: [11] Answer to Complaint filed by Commissioner of Social Security Administration.
1
Certification Page
2
Court Transcript Index
3
Documents Related to Administrative Process Including Transcript of Oral Hearin
4
Payment Documents and Decisions
5
Jurisdictional Documents and Notices
6
Non Disability Related Development
7
Disability Related Development
8
Medical Records Part 1
9
Medical Records Part 2
10
Medical Records Part 3
10 Attachments
13
05/25/2017
CONSENT TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE TRIAL. Magistrate Judge Michelle H Burns added. Judge G Murray Snow no longer assigned to case. All further pleadings shall list the following case number: CV-17-8027-PCT-MHB. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 5/25/17.
14
07/11/2017
OPENING BRIEF by Melissa Dionne Labrusciano Social Security.
15
08/10/2017
RESPONSE BRIEF by Commissioner of Social Security Administration.
16
03/29/2018
ORDER: The Commissioner's decision is VACATED and this matter is REMANDED to the Commissioner for further administrative proceedings as set forth in this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED directing the Clerk of the Court to enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michelle H Burns on 3/29/2018.
17
03/29/2018
CLERK'S JUDGMENT - Pursuant to the Court's Order filed March 29, 2018, the decision of the Commissioner of Social Security is vacated, and this case is remanded to the Social Security Administration for further proceedings consistent with the Order.
18
06/26/2018
Attorney Fees
1
Text of Proposed Order
1 Attachment
19
06/26/2018
Affidavit in Support of Motion
1
Exhibit A All Professional Time
2
Exhibit B Attorney Time
3
Exhibit C Paralegal Time
4
Exhibit D Expenses
5
Exhibit E Costs
6
Exhibit F Affirmation and Waiver of Direct Payment of EAJA Fees
7
Memorandum in Support
8
Certificate of Service
9
Statement pursuant to Local Rule 54.2 (D) (1)
9 Attachments
20
06/28/2018
Response to Motion
21
07/18/2018
Order on Motion for Attorney Fees
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.