Lacey Mae Johnson
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00075 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/28/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate
1
03/12/2018
Chapter 7 Bankruptcy Petition of Lacey mae Johnson
16
06/19/2018
Discharging Debtor(s) (SA) (BNC Notice)
17
06/21/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order of Discharge
06/25/2018
Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.